Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Laurie J Michelson
Referred: Curtis Ivy, Jr
Case #: 2:23-cv-12744
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 6:57 AM EDT
Defendant
Adduxi, Inc.
Plaintiff
Jon Jaroszewski
Represented By
Hasan Kaakarli
Akeel & Valentine, PLC
contact info
Daniel W. Cermak
Akeel & Valentine, PLC
contact info
Shereef H. Akeel
Akeel & Valentine, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Friday, November 03, 2023
6 6 order Dismissing Case Fri 11/03 2:29 PM
NOTICE AND ORDER OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL. Signed by District Judge Laurie J. Michelson. (EPar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/02 8:34 AM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Adduxi, Inc. served on 10/31/2023, answer due 11/21/2023. (Kaakarli, Hasan)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
4 4 notice Appearance Fri 10/27 1:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel W. Cermak on behalf of Jon Jaroszewski. (Cermak, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Appearance Fri 10/27 1:54 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Hasan Kaakarli on behalf of Jon Jaroszewski. (Kaakarli, Hasan)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Fri 10/27 1:47 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Adduxi, Inc.* (DPer)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Fri 10/27 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT filed by Jon Jaroszewski against Adduxi, Inc, a foreign profit corporation with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9542535 - Fee: $ 402. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Out of Country. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Akeel, Shereef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Fri 10/27 1:46 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (DPer)
Related: [-]