New Jersey District Court
Judge:Zahid N Quraishi
Referred: Rukhsanah L Singh
Case #: 3:23-cv-21563
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrim
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Re-opened:May 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 31, 2025
Case in other court:Superior Court of Mercer County, NJ, MER L 001743 23
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 7:07 AM EDT
Defendant
MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC
Represented By
BRIAN MATTHEW HAYES
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
LAWRENCE J. DEL ROSSI
Faegre Drinker Biddle & Reath LLP
contact info
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
Defendant
XYZ CORP 1-10
Mediator
SUSAN NARDONE
Represented By
SUSAN L. NARDONE
Gibbons P.C.
contact info
Notice Only
SEAN F. CROTTY
Notice Only
D'ANTAE D. GOODEN
Notice Only
nefmedtre
Plaintiff
BELAL SHAMMOUT
Represented By
MATTHEW JUSTIN VANCE
contact info
OMAR A LOPEZ
The Lopez Firm
contact info

GPO Mar 31 2025
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/31/2025. (jal, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
37 37 appeal USCA Order (Terms Appeal) Thu 05/08 2:35 PM
ORDER of USCA It is hereby ORDERED that the above matter is dismissed pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 42(b). A certified copy of this order is issued in lieu of a formal mandate. (Finance notified) (ca3tmm, )
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
36 36 appeal USCA Notice of Docketing (Case No & Mgr Assigned) Fri 05/02 4:45 PM
USCA Case Number 25-1846 for35 Notice of Appeal (USCA), filed by BELAL SHAMMOUT. USCA Case Manager Timothy McIntyre (Document Restricted - Court Only) (ca3tmm, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
35 35 appeal Notice of Appeal (USCA Philadelphia) Tue 04/29 8:42 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to34 Order on Motion for Attorney Fees,, Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration, by BELAL SHAMMOUT. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANJDC-16213659. The Clerk's Office hereby certifies the record and the docket sheet available through ECF to be the certified list in lieu of the record and/or the certified copy of the docket entries. (VANCE, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
34 34 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Order on Motion to Compel Arbitration Mon 03/31 12:06 PM
ORDER denying25 Motion for Attorney Fees; granting20 Motion to Compel Arbitration; this matter is hereby STAYED pending the arbitration; the Clerk is instructed to ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATE this matter pending arbitration. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/31/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
33 33 19 pgs order Opinion Mon 03/31 12:02 PM
OPINION filed. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 3/31/2025. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/31 12:08 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
32 32 respoth Brief Mon 10/07 11:43 PM
BRIEF (Plaintiff's sur-reply in opposition to Defendant's motion to compel arbitration and in further support of Plaintiff's cross-motion for fees) (VANCE, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Thu 10/03 2:11 PM
LETTER ORDER that the Court has reviewed this request and Defendant's objection (ECF No.30 ). Plaintiff is granted to file a sur-reply, limited to three pages (doubled spaced), no later than 10/7/2024. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 10/3/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
30 30 misc Letter Thu 09/26 7:08 PM
Letter from Defendant MSX International RNS, LLC ("MSX") re29 Letter. (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
29 29 misc Letter Thu 09/26 4:18 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's attorney requesting leave to file sur-reply re28 Reply to Response to Motion,. (VANCE, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 09/23 1:37 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion filed by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC re25 Cross MOTION for Attorney Fees & Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration ,20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Brian M. Hayes, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Hayes Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Hayes Declaration,
Att: 4 Certification Certificate of Service
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
27 27 order Text Order Tue 09/10 4:27 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court is in receipt of the letter dated September 6, 2024. (Doc. No.26 ). The request is hereby granted. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 9/10/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
26 26 misc Letter Fri 09/06 4:05 PM
Letter from Defendnats' Counsel re25 Cross MOTION for Attorney Fees & Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration ,24 Order,20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings . (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
25 25 motion Attorney Fees Wed 09/04 1:21 AM
Cross MOTION for Attorney Fees & Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration by BELAL SHAMMOUT.(VANCE, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Omar A. Lopez, Esq.,
Att: 2 Exhibit A to Lopez Cert. (Dispute Resolution Policy),
Att: 3 Exhibit B to Lopez Cert. (1993 AAA Rules),
Att: 4 Exhibit C to Lopez Cert. (Current AAA Employment Rules),
Att: 5 Exhibit D to Lopez Cert. (email colloquy with AAA re: 1993 AAA Rules),
Att: 6 Exhibit E to Lopez Cert. (Deposition Transcript of Marisa Shivers),
Att: 7 Exhibit F to Lopez Cert. (AAA Employment / Workplace Fee Schedule - Costs of Arbitration),
Att: 8 Declaration of Belal Shammout,
Att: 9 Exhibit A to Belal Declaration (2023 W-2),
Att: 10 Exhibit B to Belal Declaration (Mrs. Shammout's W-2),
Att: 11 Certification as to Facsimile Signature,
Att: 12 Brief (Unified Brief in Opposition to Motion to Compel, and in Support of Cross-Motion for Attorneys Fees),
Att: 13 Certificate of Service,
Att: 14 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 09/04 9:29 AM
Set Deadlines as to25 Cross MOTION for Attorney Fees & Brief in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration . Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jdg, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
24 24 2 pgs order Order Tue 08/20 9:14 AM
LETTER ORDER granting a one cycle extension of the20 Motion to Compel. Signed by Judge Zahid N. Quraishi on 8/20/2024. (kht)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/20 9:17 AM
Reset Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings . Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (kht)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
23 23 misc Letter Mon 08/19 7:38 PM
Letter from Plaintiff's counsel requesting (on consent) a one-cycle extension of the August 21st deadline for opposing Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration. (VANCE, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 08/08 11:14 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings . Motion set for 9/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
22 22 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 08/07 3:17 PM
Exhibit to20 Motion to Compel Arbitration, Amended Notice of Motion by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC. (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Amend/Correct Wed 08/07 2:58 PM
Amended MOTION to Amend/Correct20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC. (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Compel Arbitration Wed 08/07 1:46 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC.(DEL ROSSI, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration of Brian Hayes,
Att: 3 Exhibit A to Brian Hayes Declaration,
Att: 4 Exhibit B to Brian Hayes Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit C to Brian Hayes Declaration,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Certificate of Service
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 08/07 3:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The21 Amended Motion filed by Brian Hayes on 8/7/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT USING Event *Exhibit to Document* under Civil Events - Other Filings - Other Documents and linking it to the motion. The Clerk's office has terminated the calendar event created by this filing This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (kht)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/07 3:34 PM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Compel Arbitration and Stay Judicial Proceedings . Motion set for 9/3/2024 before Judge Zahid N. Quraishi. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (amv)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
19 19 misc Letter Fri 07/19 1:59 PM
Letter from Defendants on behalf of the parties re18 Order. (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order Thu 05/16 10:42 AM
LETTER ORDER granting proposed schedule request; The parties shall file a joint status letter to the Court by 7/19/2024; The Clerks Office is directed to reopen this matter. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 5/15/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
17 17 misc Letter Mon 05/13 9:01 PM
Letter from Plaintiff and Defendant regarding status of mediation pursuant to the Court's February 15, 2024 Order. (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/01 2:13 PM
LETTER ORDER that Susan L. Nardone will serve as the mediator in this action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/1/2024. (jdg)
Related: [-]
order Order Appointing Mediator Fri 03/01 3:49 PM
Order Appointing Mediator SUSAN NARDONE.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 3/1/2024. **There is no document attached to this entry, please see docket entry16 for Order. This has been docketed for statistical purposes only.(eaj, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
15 15 misc Status Report Wed 02/28 2:34 PM
STATUS REPORT (Joint Status Letter Regarding Selected Mediator) by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC. (DEL ROSSI, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
14 14 2 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediation Thu 02/15 9:14 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation; Counsel and the parties shall participate in mediation and shall cooperate with the mediator By no later than 2/28/2024. The Clerks office is directed to administratively terminate this action pending the mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 2/14/2024. (jal, )
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Thu 02/15 9:15 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
minutes Telephone Conference Wed 02/14 3:41 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Telephone Conference held on 2/14/2024. (mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 09, 2024
13 13 misc Status Report Fri 02/09 3:08 PM
STATUS REPORT Joint Status Letter by counsel for the parties by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC.(HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Joint Status Letter,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Joint Status Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Joint Status Letter
Thursday, December 07, 2023
12 12 order Scheduling Order Thu 12/07 11:31 AM
PRETRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER: Telephone Status Conference set for 2/14/2024 at 2:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 12/5/2023. (amv)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
minutes Pretrial Conference - Initial Tue 12/05 5:05 PM
Text Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh: Initial Pretrial Conference via Microsoft Teams held on 12/5/2023. (mm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 11/22 1:05 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, SEAN F. CROTTY and D'ANTAE D. GOODEN, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (jal, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
11 11 discov Joint Discovery Plan Tue 11/21 3:00 PM
Joint Discovery Plan by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC.(HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Tue 11/21 2:43 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice D'Antae D. Gooden to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Tue 11/21 2:40 PM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Sean F. Crotty to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 11/21 2:19 PM
Pro Hac Vice fee received as to SEAN F CROTTY AND D'ANAE D. GOODEN $ 300, receipt number TRE135731 (jal, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 11/15 3:35 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by BRIAN MATTHEW HAYES on behalf of MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC (HAYES, BRIAN)
Related: [-]
7 7 3 pgs order Order Wed 11/15 12:21 PM
ORDER granting pro hac vice admission as to Sean F. Crotty and D'Antae D. Gooden. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 11/15/2023. (kht)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
6 6 misc Letter Thu 11/09 3:22 PM
Letter from Lawrence J. Del Rossi.(DEL ROSSI, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification of Lawrence J. Del Rossi in support of Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 2 Certification of Sean F. Crotty in support of Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 3 Certification of D'Antae D. Gooden in support of Pro Hac Vice Admission,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, November 03, 2023
5 5 misc Letter Fri 11/03 9:39 AM
Letter from Lawrence J. Del Rossi requesting pre-motion conference. (DEL ROSSI, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
4 4 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Set/Clear Flags Mon 10/30 1:16 PM
ORDER Scheduling Conference set for 12/5/2023 at 3:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh in person at the Clarkson S. Fisher Bulding & U.S. Courthouse, 402 East State Street, Trenton NJ. Signed by Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh on 10/30/2023. (kht)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Mon 10/30 9:41 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC. (DEL ROSSI, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 10/30 9:38 AM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC. (DEL ROSSI, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Attorney Case Opening Mon 10/30 8:34 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed has been processed, however, the following deficiencies were found: The Plaintiffs and Defendants were not added to the docket. Make sure to add ALL PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS as found on the original state court complaint . The Clerk's Office has made the appropriate changes. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Disclosure Statement filed as an Attachment Mon 10/30 8:36 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Notice of Removal filed by LAWRENCE J. DEL ROSSI on 10/27/2023 was submitted with a Corporate Disclosure Statement as an attachment. PLEASE RESUBMIT the Corporate Disclosure Statement USING the event CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT found under Other Filings -> Other Documents. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 10/30 8:37 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (jjc, )
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Mon 10/30 9:47 AM
Judge Zahid N. Quraishi and Magistrate Judge Rukhsanah L. Singh added. (jdg)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Fri 10/27 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC from Superior Court of Mercer County, case number MER L 001743 23. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14826476), filed by MSX INTERNATIONAL RNS, LLC.(DEL ROSSI, LAWRENCE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Notice of Removal,
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Notice of Removal,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet DNJ Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement,
Att: 6 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service