California Central District Court
Judge:Percy Anderson
Referred: David T Bristow
Case #: 5:23-cv-02209
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Oct 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 3:26 AM PDT
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Starbucks Corporation
Represented By
John S. Nielsen
Price Pelletier, LLP
contact info
Samuel S Baxter
Higg Fletcher And Mack LLP
contact info
Stephen T Pelletier
Price Pelletier, LLP
contact info
Mediator (ADR Panel)
Lindsey J Bayman
Represented By
Lindsey Bayman
Lindsey Bayman Mediation
contact info
Plaintiff
Kyler Russell
Represented By
Apemwoyah Kisob Alaric-Lorenzo
Kisob Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Friday, October 11, 2024
63 63 minutes Status Conference - optional html form Fri 10/11 3:21 PM
MINUTES OF STATUS CONFERENCE held before Judge Percy Anderson. Cause called; Court and counsel confer. Court Reporter: Amy Diaz. (aco)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
62 62 order Dismissing Case Fri 10/11 10:16 AM
ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by Judge Percy Anderson. Pursuant to the stipulation of the parties under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(ii), IT IS ORDERED THAT THIS ACTION BE, AND HEREBY IS, DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE as to all claims, causes of action, and parties, with each party bearing that party's own attorney's fees and costs. RE: Second STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(1)(ii)61 . (Case Terminated. Made JS-6.) (aco)
Related: [-]
61 61 stip Dismiss Case Thu 10/10 3:54 PM
Second STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Kyler Russell.(Kisob Alaric-Lorenzo, Apemwoyah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
60 60 stip Dismiss Case Thu 10/10 1:41 PM
STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to 41(a)(1)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Kyler Russell.(Kisob Alaric-Lorenzo, Apemwoyah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order