Connecticut District Court
Judge:Michael P Shea
Referred: S Dave Vatti
Case #: 3:23-cv-01416
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Jun 10, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 6:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Group Voyagers, Inc.
Represented By
Alice Powers
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Jessica Kish Kennedy
O'Hagan Meyer
contact info
Plaintiff
Anny Carr
25 Francis St.
Southington, CT 06489


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, June 10, 2024
26 26 order Order Mon 06/10 9:24 AM
ORDER: The parties' joint stipulation of dismissal with prejudice (ECF No. 25) under Fed.R.Civ.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) is SO ORDERED. The Clerk is directed to close the case. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/10/24. (Constantine, A.)
Related: [-]
notice Judicial Evaluation Program Survey Tue 06/11 10:32 AM
JUDICIAL PROCEEDINGS SURVEY - FOR COUNSEL ONLY: The following link to the confidential survey requires you to log into CM/ECF for SECURITY purposes. Once in CM/ECF you will be prompted for the case number. Although you are receiving this survey through CM/ECF, it is hosted on an independent website called SurveyMonkey. Once in SurveyMonkey, the survey is located in a secure account. The survey is not docketed and it is not sent directly to the judge. To ensure anonymity, completed surveys are held up to 90 days before they are sent to the judge for review. We hope you will take this opportunity to participate, please click on this link: https://ecf.ctd.uscourts.gov/cgi-bin/Dispatch.pl?survey (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 07, 2024
25 25 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 06/07 3:31 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal of Dismissing Case WITH PREJUDICE by Group Voyagers, Inc.. (Powers, Alice)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
24 24 order Order Mon 06/03 12:27 PM
ORDER: The parties shall file a Joint Status Report by June 17, 2024. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 6/3/24. (Constantine, A.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 06/03 6:02 PM
Set Deadlines: Joint Status Report due by 6/17/2024 (Sichanh, C)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 05/07 5:20 PM
ORDER: The defendant has filed a Notice of Settlement in which it states that the parties have reached an "agreement-in-principle." ECF No. 22. The plaintiff may file a notice of dismissal under Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(a)(i) or the parties may file a joint stipulation of dismissal under Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). In the meantime, in light of the notice, the defendant's motions to dismiss (ECF Nos.19 ,20 ) are denied without prejudice. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 5/7/24. (Constantine, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Settlement Mon 05/06 5:18 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Group Voyagers, Inc. (Powers, Alice)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
order Order Tue 04/16 5:05 PM
ORDER: Defendant has filed a19 Motion to Dismiss. On or before May 6, 2024 , Plaintiff shall either file a response to the motion or file an amended complaint in which she pleads as many facts as possible, consistent with Rule 11, to address the alleged defects discussed in Defendant's memorandum of law. The Court will not allow further amendments after May 6, 2024 . If Plaintiff chooses to amend and if Defendant renews its motion to dismiss, Defendant may incorporate by reference any prior briefing. Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 4/16/24. (Constantine, A.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and Rcmd Ruling Deadlines/Hearings Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 04/17 9:15 AM
Set Deadlines as to19 MOTION to Dismiss Related [+], or ( Amended Complaint due by 5/6/2024) (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-] sponses due by 5/6/2024,
Monday, April 15, 2024
20 20 motion Dismiss Mon 04/15 7:49 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Group Voyagers, Inc..Responses due by 5/6/2024 (Powers, Alice)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Dismiss Mon 04/15 7:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by Group Voyagers, Inc..Responses due by 5/6/2024(Powers, Alice)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Notice to Self-Represented Litigant Concerning Motion to Dismiss
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 03/26 1:25 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Group Voyagers, Inc. waiver sent on 2/14/2024, answer due 4/14/2024 filed by Group Voyagers, Inc.. (Powers, Alice)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 03/26 1:19 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Alice Powers on behalf of Group Voyagers, Inc. (Powers, Alice)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 08, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 03/08 8:56 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Kish Kennedy on behalf of Group Voyagers, Inc. (Kennedy, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 06, 2024
order Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice Wed 03/06 11:07 AM
ORDER granting14 MOTION for Attorney Alice Conway Powers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice. Signed by Clerk on 3/6/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
14 14 motion Admission Pro Hac Vice Tue 03/05 3:49 PM
MOTION for Attorney(s) Alice Conway Powers to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice (paid $200 PHV fee; receipt number ACTDC-7671667) by Group Voyagers, Inc..(Kennedy, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
13 13 service Affidavit of Service Thu 02/22 3:19 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint, Notice and Waiver served on Group Voyagers, Inc. on 2/14/2024. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 05, 2024
service USM Service Papers Sent Mon 02/05 3:21 PM
USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service, Complaint, OPTD, Order granting IFP reviewed and sent to USM for service on defendant Group Voyagers, Inc. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
order Order Mon 01/22 10:16 AM
ORDER: The Clerk mailed the service packet to the Plaintiff on December 13, 2023, with instructions on how to complete the paperwork necessary to effectuate service and direction to return the paperwork to the Clerk once completed. ECF No. 11. To date, Plaintiff has not returned the service packet, rendering it impossible for the Clerk to effectuate service. The Plaintiff shall return the completed service by February 5, 2024. Failure to do so will result in the dismissal of this case without prejudice for failure to prosecute. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 1/22/24. (Constantine, A.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/23 9:36 AM
Set Deadlines: Dismissal due by 2/5/2024. (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 13, 2023
11 11 service USM Service Info to IFP Plaintiff Wed 12/13 12:37 PM
USM 285 forms together with Notice of Lawsuit/Request for Waiver of Service of Summons and all instructions mailed to IFP plaintiff to complete and return to Clerk's office. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
order Order Fri 12/01 10:26 AM
ORDER: Upon reconsideration, the court's order (ECF No. 9 ) is vacated and the plaintiff's motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.2 ) is granted. The Clerk of the Court shall send plaintiff a service packet. Signed by Judge Michael P Shea on 12/1/23. (Constantine, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 10/30 4:14 PM
ORDER: Ms. Carr's motion to proceed in forma pauperis (ECF No.2 ) is DENIED. "It is well settled that the decision to proceed in forma pauperis in civil cases is committed to the sound discretion of the district court. In exercising this discretion under section 1915(a), the district court must determine whether the burden of paying the fees for filing and service would either hamper the plaintiff's ability to obtain the necessities of life or force him to abandon the action." Hinton v. Pearson , 2021 WL 3036921, at *1 (D. Conn. July 19, 2021) (citations omitted). "Put differently, a 'sufficient' in forma pauperis application is one that demonstrates that the plaintiff 'cannot because of [her] poverty pay or give security for the costs and still be able to provide [her]self and [her] dependents with the necessities of life.'" Jessie C. v. Kijakazi , 2022 WL 2068993, at *1 (D. Conn. May 2, 2022) (citation omitted). Ms. Carr has represented that she has $725 in bank accounts, $2550 in monthly income from disability benefits, and $124,000 equity in her home. The Court finds that Ms. Carr has not shown an inability to pay the $402 filing fee. She is directed to pay the filing fee on or before November 30, 2023, or the case will be dismissed. If Ms. Carr pays the filing fee, she shall then perform service of process on the Defendant within 90 days or this case may be dismissed. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c), (m). Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/30/23. (Constantine, A.)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Wed 11/01 8:45 AM
Set Deadliness: Dismissal due by 11/30/2023. (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
8 8 notice Notice Mon 10/30 9:27 AM
Notice re Initial Discovery Protocols Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2023. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Initial Discovery Protocols Attachment
7 7 order Protective Order Mon 10/30 9:25 AM
STANDING PROTECTIVE ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/27/2023. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Electronic Filing Order Mon 10/30 9:24 AM
ELECTRONIC FILING ORDER FOR COUNSEL - PLEASE ENSURE COMPLIANCE WITH COURTESY COPY REQUIREMENTS IN THIS ORDER Signed by Judge Michael P. Shea on 10/27/2023. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
5 5 1 pgs order Order on Pretrial Deadlines Mon 10/30 9:24 AM
Order on Pretrial Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 12/26/2023. Discovery due by 4/27/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 6/1/2024. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2023. (Peterson, M)
Related: [-]
4 4 Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2023. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Consent to Electronic Notice Fri 10/27 3:52 PM
Consent to Electronic Notice, by Anny Carr. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/27 3:52 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Anny Carr. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 10/27 3:50 PM
COMPLAINT against Group Voyagers, Inc., filed by Anny Carr. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 10/27 4:14 PM
Judge Michael P. Shea and Judge S. Dave Vatti added. (Johnson, D.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice re: Disclosure Statement Fri 10/27 3:53 PM
Notice: Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, a disclosure statement must be filed with a party's first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court and must be supplemented if any required information changes during the case. Signed by Clerk on 10/27/2023. (Mendez, D)
Related: [-]