Colorado District Court
Judge:Philip A Brimmer
Referred: Susan Prose
Case #: 1:23-cv-02830
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Re-opened:May 02, 2024
Terminated:Feb 12, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 4:25 AM MDT
Defendant
Always Enterprises, Inc
Defendant
Andrew Baum
Defendant
Douglas County Public Trustee
Represented By
Andrew Carl Steers
Douglas County Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC
Represented By
Matthew Chudacoff
Coan Payton & Payne LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Chuck O. Egbune
4694 Briarglen Lane
Highlands Ranch, CO 80130

GPO Apr 01 2024
ORDER by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 4/1/2024, re: 9 Defendant Breckenridge Property Fund 2016 LLC's Motion to Dismiss Pursuant to Rule 12(b)(1) is GRANTED. ORDERED that Douglas County Public Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and Disclaimer of Interest [Docket No. 8] and the Verified Motion for Preliminary Injunction and a Request for a Forthwith Hearing of Same [Docket No. 2] are DENIED as moot. ORDERED that Mr. Egbune's claims against all defendants are DISMISSED without prejudice. ORDERED that Mr. Egbune may file an amended complaint on or before April 30, 2024. (dgumb, )
GPO Jan 22 2025
Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC, ECF No. 39, be DENIED as moot, by Magistrate Judge Susan Prose on 1/22/2025. (ccuen, )RECOMMENDATION OF UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE. That all claims against defendants Douglas County Public Trustee and Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC, be DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b). That all claims against the Unserved DefendantsAndrew Baum, Always Enterprises, Inc., and Larry Henningbe DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) and Rule 41(b). That the pending motions to dismiss filed by defendants Douglas County Public Trustee, ECF No. 30, and
GPO Feb 07 2025
ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/7/25. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge 64 is ACCEPTED. All claims against defendants Douglas County Public Trustee and Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b). All claims against the Unserved Defendants Andrew Baum, Always Enterprises, Inc., and Larry Henning are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) and Rule 41(b). Douglas County Public Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and Disclaimer of Interest 30 is DENIED as moot. Defendant Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Filed April 30, 2024 (Doc 28) 39 is DENIED as moot. This case is closed. (sgrim)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
66 66 order Judgment - Clerk Wed 02/12 8:40 AM
FINAL JUDGMENTre:65 Order, by Clerk on 2/12/25. (sgrim)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
65 65 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Fri 02/07 3:36 PM
ORDER Accepting Magistrate Judge's Recommendation by Chief Judge Philip A. Brimmer on 2/7/25. The Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge64 is ACCEPTED. All claims against defendants Douglas County Public Trustee and Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 41(b). All claims against the Unserved Defendants Andrew Baum, Always Enterprises, Inc., and Larry Henning are DISMISSED without prejudice pursuant to Rule 4(m) and Rule 41(b). Douglas County Public Trustee's Motion to Dismiss and Disclaimer of Interest30 is DENIED as moot. Defendant Breckenridge Property Fund 2016, LLC's Motion to Dismiss the First Amended Complaint Filed April 30, 2024 (Doc 28)39 is DENIED as moot. This case is closed. (sgrim)
Related: [-]