Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Brian J Davis
Referred: Monte C Richardson
Case #: 3:23-cv-01284
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Apr 23, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 6:39 AM EDT
Defendant
Mayo Clinic
Represented By
Jessica Theresa Travers
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Justin Otis Scott
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Carlos Burruezo
Represented By
Carlos J. Burruezo
Burruezo & Burruezo, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
DeAnna Adamson
605 5th Street North
Jacksonville Beach, FL 32250


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
41 41 notice Notice to Counsel of Local Rule Wed 04/23 12:58 PM
NOTICE of Local Rule 1.11(e), which provides that, unless an order states another time, a seal under Rule 1.11 expires ninety days after a case is closed and all appeals are exhausted. To prevent the content of a sealed item from appearing on the docket after the seal expires, a party or interested non-party must move for relief before the seal expires. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (LSS)
Related: [-]
40 40 order Judgment Wed 04/23 12:58 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Mayo Clinic against DeAnna Adamson. Signed by Deputy Clerk on 4/23/2025. (LSS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
39 39 15 pgs order Order on Motion for Summary Judgment Tue 04/22 12:01 PM
ORDER DENYING 26 Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgment; GRANTING 28 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment. This case is REMOVED from the Court's trial calendar. The Clerk shall enter judgment in favor of Defendant, terminate all pending motions and close this file. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/22/2025. (AMP)
Related: [-]
38 38 motion Appear Telephonically / Video Tue 04/22 9:51 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Certain Witnesses Residing in Minnesota to appear by video to Testify at Trial by Mayo Clinic. (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
37 37 misc Pretrial statement Wed 04/16 5:46 PM
PRETRIAL statement by Mayo Clinic.(Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Trial Exhibits,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Defendant's Exhibit List,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Defendant's Witness List
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
36 36 motion In Limine Wed 04/09 7:05 PM
MOTION In Limine by Mayo Clinic.(Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript
35 35 motion In Limine Wed 04/09 3:00 PM
REQUEST for MOTION In Limine by DeAnna Adamson. (JDR)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 03, 2025
34 34 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 04/03 4:08 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mayo Clinic. (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
33 33 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Mon 03/24 4:01 PM
ENDORSED ORDER denying as moot 29 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Motion for Summary Judgement. Defendant's Response in Opposition 31 is accepted as filed. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 3/24/2025. (JRC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 20, 2025
32 32 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 03/21 10:37 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re28 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by DeAnna Adamson.(JDR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit I
Monday, March 17, 2025
31 31 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/17 7:11 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re26 MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Mayo Clinic.(Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Plaintiff's Deposition Transcript,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - October 13, 2021 Email,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - October 28, 2021 Email
30 30 notice Notice (Other) Mon 03/17 1:46 PM
NOTICE by Mayo Clinic of Updating 3.01(g) Conferral Regarding Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time [Dkt.29] (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
29 29 motion Extension of Time to File Response / Reply Thu 03/13 5:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to26 MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mayo Clinic. (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
28 28 motion Summary Judgment Fri 02/28 6:31 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Mayo Clinic.(Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Roshanak Didehban,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Declaration of A Palaj,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - CDC Museum COVID-19 Timeline,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Declaration of Samantha Halverson,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Declaration of Keri Slegh,
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Declaration of Alisha Schuch,
Att: 7 Exhibit G - 11-21-21 Email,
Att: 8 Exhibit H - Declaration of Matthew McNally,
Att: 9 Exhibit I - Declaration of Dr. Garrison,
Att: 10 Exhibit J - -Interrogatory Excerpt,
Att: 11 Exhibit K - Adamson Deposition Transcript
27 27 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 02/28 5:17 PM
ENDORSED ORDER: 25 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Page Limit is GRANTED. On or before March 7, 2025, Defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment not to exceed thirty-five (35) substantive pages. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 2/28/2025. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
26 26 motion Summary Judgment Thu 02/27 4:02 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by DeAnna Adamson.(JDR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits 1 to 9
25 25 motion Leave to File Document Mon 02/24 5:00 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Motion for Summary Judgment in Excess of Page Limit by Mayo Clinic. (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
24 24 adr Mediation report Thu 11/14 3:17 PM
MEDIATION report Hearing held on November 13, 2024. Hearing outcome: Impasse.. (Burruezo, Carlos)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
23 23 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Tue 10/22 11:09 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 22 Joint Motion for Extension of Discovery Deadline and Remaining Deadlines in Case Management and Scheduling Order. The discovery deadline is extended to January 30, 2025, and the dispositive and Daubert motion deadline is extended to February 28, 2025. All other terms and deadlines in 16 the Case Management and Scheduling Order shall remain intact. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 10/22/2024. (JRC)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Thu 10/17 4:52 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery and for Extension of Remaining Deadlines in Case Management and Scheduling Order by Mayo Clinic. (Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of mediation conference/hearing Thu 08/08 3:01 PM
NOTICE of mediation conference/hearing to be held on November 13, 2024 at 10:00am ET before Carlos J. Burruezo. (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 08, 2024
20 20 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/08 4:09 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Mayo Clinic. (Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 05/08 1:06 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement re16 Case Management Scheduling Order by DeAnna Adamson. (BD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order to Strike Wed 05/01 3:02 PM
ORDER to strike 17 Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by DeAnna Adamson, 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement filed by Mayo Clinic. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 5/1/2024. (JRC)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 26, 2024
17 17 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 04/29 9:48 AM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by DeAnna Adamson. (BD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
16 16 order Case Management Scheduling Order Tue 04/16 4:02 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Discovery due by 11/1/2024; Conduct mediation hearing by 11/15/2024; Dispositive motions due by 12/6/2024; Pretrial statement due by 4/16/2025; Final Pretrial Conference set for 4/23/2025 at 10:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Senior Judge Brian J. Davis; Bench Trial set for trial term commencing on 5/5/2025 at 9:00 AM in Jacksonville Courtroom 12 C before Senior Judge Brian J. Davis. Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 4/15/2024.(AMP)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Mediation Report Form,
Att: 2 Docket Sheets
utility Set/reset scheduling order deadlines - PUBLIC Wed 04/17 11:26 AM
Set scheduling order deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 5/30/2024 Joinder of Parties due by 5/30/2024 All other motions due by 4/16/2025 Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 8/16/2024 Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 7/12/2024 (AJS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 04, 2024
15 15 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 04/04 4:34 PM
CORPORATE Disclosure Statement by Mayo Clinic. (Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 04/04 4:22 PM
DEFENDANT'S AMENDED ANSWER and affirmative defenses to Complaint TO PLAINTIFF'S AMENDED COMPLAINT FOR EMPLOYMENT DISCRIMINATION (Dkt. No. 6) by Mayo Clinic.(Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Case Management Report Thu 04/04 3:59 PM
UNILATERAL CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Scott, Justin)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 25, 2024
12 12 answer Answer to amended complaint Mon 03/25 5:04 PM
ANSWER and affirmative defenses to 6 Amended Complaint by Mayo Clinic.(Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 15, 2024
11 11 2 pgs order Order on Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 03/15 5:23 PM
ORDER FINDING AS MOOT 5 Report and Recommendation; DENYING AS MOOT 2 Plaintiff's Application to Proceed in District Court Without Prepaying Fees or Costs (Long Form). Signed by Senior Judge Brian J. Davis on 3/15/2024. (AMP)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 02/21 12:09 PM
CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Mayo Clinic. (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Notice of a Related Action Wed 02/21 12:03 PM
NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Mayo Clinic. Related case(s): Yes (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice of Lead Counsel Designation Wed 02/21 11:59 AM
NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jessica Theresa Travers on behalf of Mayo Clinic. Lead Counsel: Jessica T. Travers. (Travers, Jessica)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
7 7 service Proof of service Wed 01/24 1:19 PM
PROOF of service by DeAnna Adamson (BGR)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/22 3:31 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Mayo Clinic filed by DeAnna Adamson.(BGR)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 15, 2023
misc Fees Paid Fri 12/15 2:04 PM
FEES Paid by DeAnna Adamson (Filing fee $405.00, Receipt Number 36946). (BD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
5 5 motion Report and Recommendations Wed 11/29 4:36 PM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re 2 MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis filed by DeAnna Adamson. Signed by Magistrate Judge Monte C. Richardson on 11/29/2023. (HW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
4 4 utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 11/07 8:41 AM
Case Reassigned to Judge Brian J. Davis. New case number: 3:23-cv-1284-BJD-MCR. Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger no longer assigned to the case. (MDC)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
3 3 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Mon 11/06 4:01 PM
ORDER: The Clerk of Court shall randomly reassign Case No. 3:23-cv-1284-HES-MCR. Signed by Senior Judge Harvey E. Schlesinger on 11/6/2023. (TPL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 10/27 3:43 PM
MOTION to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by DeAnna Adamson. (BD)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/27 3:40 PM
COMPLAINT against Mayo Clinic filed by DeAnna Adamson. (No service copies) (BD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1