New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Andrea K Johnstone
Case #: 1:23-cv-00482
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Jun 24, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 6:45 AM EDT
Defendant
Dudley Tucker Library
Represented By
K. Joshua Scott
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Jill Galus
Represented By
K. Joshua Scott
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Sabrina Maltby
Represented By
K. Joshua Scott
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Valerie Moore
Represented By
K. Joshua Scott
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Defendant
Raymond, NH, Town of
Represented By
David Betancourt
Friedman Feeney, PLLC
contact info
Dona Feeney
Friedman Feeney, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett
Represented By
K. Joshua Scott
Jackson Lewis PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Arlene Quaratiello
Represented By
Olivia F. Summers
American Center For Law And Justice
contact info
Geoffrey R. Surtees
American Center For Law & Justice
contact info
Nathan Jeremiah Moelker
American Center For Law And Justice
contact info
Jacob Rhodes
Cleveland Waters & Bass PA
contact info
Benjamin Paul Sisney
American Center For Law And Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, June 24, 2024
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 06/24 1:08 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (bd)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 21, 2024
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 06/21 12:18 PM
///STIPULATION of Dismissal Pursuant to F.R.C.P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Arlene Quaratiello(Moelker, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2024
notice Clerk's Notice - Filing Due Thu 06/20 1:45 PM
Clerk's Notice - No Mediation Statement Filed. The parties are directed to file a Mediation Statement within 14 days of this notice. Mediation Follow Up on 7/5/2024.(kad)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
32 32 order Consent Decree Mon 06/10 9:08 AM
CONSENT ORDER/Stipulation of Agreed Facts. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Approve Consent Decree Mon 06/10 9:06 AM
ENDORSED ORDER approving 31 Joint Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Decree and Stipulation of Settlement. Text of Order: Approved with modifications: the court will not retain jurisdiction, and therefore, the court amends the consent order by striking paragraph (G). So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
31 31 motion Approve Consent Decree Wed 05/29 1:54 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION to Approve Consent Decree and Stipulation of Settlement filed by Arlene Quaratiello.(Moelker, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order (Consent Order)
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
notice Trial Notice Wed 02/28 8:33 AM
TRIAL NOTICE: Jury Selection/Trial set for two week period beginning 3/18/2025 09:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/4/2025 10:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Pretrial Statements due 2/18/2025. JERS Statement due 2/18/2025. LR 16.2(d) Objections due 3/4/2025. (kad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
30 30 4 pgs order Order on Discovery Plan Wed 02/28 8:26 AM
ORDER approving with changes 27 Discovery Plan. PRETRIAL CONFERENCE CANCELLED. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Summary Judgment Motions due by 11/15/2024. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline 4/15/2024. Discovery deadline 10/15/2024. Joint Statement regarding the status of discovery due by 8/16/2024. Mediation Follow Up on 6/19/2024.(kad)
Related: [-]
29 29 notice Withdrawal of Motion Tue 02/27 8:23 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Motion:28 Assented to MOTION Conduct R. 26 conference eletronically .(Feeney, Dona)
Related: [-]
28 28 motion Miscellaneous Relief Tue 02/27 8:02 AM
WITHDRAWN. SEE DOC. NO. 29. Assented to MOTION Conduct R. 26 conference eletronically filed by Raymond, NH, Town of.(Feeney, Dona) Modified on 2/27/2024 to add: "WITHDRAWN. SEE DOC. NO. 29"(kad)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines PUBLIC Tue 02/27 8:09 AM
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2024 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone is cancelled. Order to issue. (kad)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
27 27 motion Discovery Plan Fri 02/02 2:48 PM
Proposed Discovery Plan filed by Arlene Quaratiello. In cases assigned to the Magistrate Judge, plaintiff, or the removing defendant if the case was initiated by a Notice of Removal, is responsible for filing a consent form on or before the deadline for filing the Discovery Plan using the Other Documents/Magistrate Judge Assignment--Consent/Objection event. (Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
26 26 notice Attorney Appearance Fri 02/02 11:11 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Benjamin Paul Sisney on behalf of Arlene Quaratiello Attorney Benjamin Paul Sisney added to party Arlene Quaratiello(pty:pla).(Sisney, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
25 25 misc Consent/Objection--Magistrate Judge Assignment Mon 01/29 4:01 PM
CONSENT to Jurisdiction by U.S. Magistrate Judge for all purposes including trial. (Moelker, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
24 24 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/26 4:25 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint - New Case,,, with jury demand filed by Raymond, NH, Town of.(Betancourt, David)
Related: [-]
23 23 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/26 2:02 PM
Defendants' ANSWER to1 Complaint - New Case,,, with jury demand filed by Dudley Tucker Library, Jill Galus, Sabrina Maltby, Valerie Moore, Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett.(Scott, K.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/26 3:37 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting: 21 MOTION for Benjamin P. Sisney to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices. (bd)
Related: [-]
notice Pretrial Conference Fri 01/26 4:46 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/28/2024 10:00 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/21/2024. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan. (bd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
22 22 misc Addendum Thu 01/25 11:38 AM
Addendum/ to21 MOTION for Benjamin P. Sisney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2469633.) by Arlene Quaratiello. (Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 01/24 1:38 PM
MOTION for Benjamin P. Sisney to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2469633.) filed by Arlene Quaratiello.Follow up on Objection on 2/7/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration in Support of Motion
notice Cure Notice - Action Requested Wed 01/24 2:36 PM
ACTION REQUIRED - NOTICE Nonconforming Document re:21 MOTION for Benjamin P. Sisney to Appear Pro Hac Vice filed by Arlene Quaratiello. The document fails to comply with LR 7.1 - No statement of concurrence was included. File statement as addendum using the Other Documents/Addendum event and link filing(s) to document no. 21. The document will remain on file. Please note that unless a document curing the defect is filed by the Notice of Compliance Deadline the matter may be referred to a judicial officer for appropriate action. If the filing party has any questions concerning this notice, please contact the judge's case manager at 603-225-1423.Compliance Deadline set for 2/5/2024.(kad)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
20 20 notice Attorney Appearance Fri 01/12 11:16 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by David Betancourt on behalf of Raymond, NH, Town of Attorney David Betancourt added to party Raymond, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Betancourt, David)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Extend Time to Answer Fri 01/12 8:11 AM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 19 Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 26, 2024. Text of Order: Granted. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone.(kad)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
19 19 motion Extend Time to Answer Thu 01/11 12:31 PM
Joint Assented to MOTION to Extend Time to Answer to January 26, 2024 filed by Dudley Tucker Library.(Scott, K.)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 01/11 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by K. Joshua Scott on behalf of Dudley Tucker Library, Jill Galus, Sabrina Maltby, Valerie Moore, Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party Dudley Tucker Library(pty:dft), Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party Jill Galus(pty:dft), Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party Sabrina Maltby(pty:dft), Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party Valerie Moore(pty:dft), Attorney K. Joshua Scott added to party Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett(pty:dft).(Scott, K.)
Related: [-]
notice Pretrial Conference Thu 01/11 12:14 PM
NOTICE OF PRETRIAL CONFERENCE. Pretrial Conference set for 2/15/2024 10:30 AM before US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. Follow up on Discovery Plan 2/8/2024. If no consent form has been filed, a consent form is due on or before the deadline for filing the discovery plan.(kad)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 18, 2023
17 17 notice Attorney Appearance Mon 12/18 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Dona Feeney on behalf of Raymond, NH, Town of Attorney Dona Feeney added to party Raymond, NH, Town of(pty:dft).(Feeney, Dona)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 12, 2023
16 16 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/12 1:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Valerie Moore by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
15 15 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/12 1:20 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Raymond, NH, Town of by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
14 14 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/12 1:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Sabrina Maltby by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/12 1:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
12 12 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/12 1:16 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/12 1:14 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Jill Galus by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 12/12 1:12 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed as to Dudley Tucker Library by Arlene Quaratiello. Served/Mailed on 11/13/2023. Answer Follow Up on 1/16/2024. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
9 9 notice Attorney Appearance Thu 11/16 9:36 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Olivia F. Summers on behalf of Arlene Quaratiello Attorney Olivia F. Summers added to party Arlene Quaratiello(pty:pla).(Summers, Olivia)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
8 8 notice Attorney Appearance Wed 11/08 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Geoffrey R. Surtees on behalf of Arlene Quaratiello Attorney Geoffrey R. Surtees added to party Arlene Quaratiello(pty:pla).(Surtees, Geoffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
7 7 notice Attorney Appearance Tue 11/07 4:19 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nathan Jeremiah Moelker on behalf of Arlene Quaratiello Attorney Nathan Jeremiah Moelker added to party Arlene Quaratiello(pty:pla).(Moelker, Nathan)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
6 6 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 11:14 AM
MOTION for Geoffrey R. Surtees to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2439579.) filed by Arlene Quaratiello.Follow up on Objection on 11/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 11:11 AM
MOTION for Olivia F. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2439566.) filed by Arlene Quaratiello.Follow up on Objection on 11/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 11:06 AM
MOTION for Nathan J. Moelker to Appear Pro Hac Vice (Filing fee $ 100, Receipt # ANHDC-2439552.) filed by Arlene Quaratiello.Follow up on Objection on 11/17/2023. The court only follow up date DOES NOT include 3 additional days that may apply per FRCP 6(d) and FRCrP 45(c).(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit (Affidavit) Declaration in Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 2:52 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 4 MOTION for Nathan J. Moelker to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The clerks office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 2:53 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 5 MOTION for Olivia F. Summers to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 11/03 2:55 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 6 MOTION for Geoffrey R. Surtees to Appear Pro Hac Vice. Text of Order: Granted. Local counsel shall comply with all obligations required by L.R. 83.2(b) absent order of the court. So Ordered by US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The clerk's office will provide the admitted attorney with instructions on how to obtain access to electronic filing by separate email. The admitted attorney must have an individual upgraded PACER account, not a shared firm account, to electronically file in the District of New Hampshire. After obtaining e-filing access, the admitted attorney must file an appearance to begin receiving electronic notices.(kad)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
3 3 service Summons - Waiver Issued Mon 10/30 8:59 AM
Notice of Lawsuit/Waivers issued electronically as to Dudley Tucker Library, Jill Galus, Sabrina Maltby, Valerie Moore, Raymond, NH, Town of, Kirsten A Rundquist Corbett. NOTICE: Counsel shall print and serve the notice/waivers and all attachments in accordance with Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. NOTICE of Assignment to Magistrate Judge attached.(ed)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice ECF,
Att: 2 Assignment to Magistrate
notice Notice - ECF Mon 10/30 8:55 AM
NOTICE. This case has been designated for Electronic Case Filing. All further submissions shall be filed in compliance with the Administrative Procedures for Electronic Case Filing. Pro se litigants are not required to file electronically and may continue to file documents in paper format. Persons filing electronically are strongly encouraged to complete the interactive training modules available on the courts website. To access these modules, click [LINK:HERE] . (ed)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
2 2 notice Magistrate Judge Assignment Mon 10/30 8:42 AM
NOTICE of Assignment to U.S. Magistrate Judge and Consent Form sent to plaintiff for service on all parties. MJ Consent Form Due 12/18/2023.(ed)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint - New Case Fri 10/27 2:46 PM
NEW CASE/ COMPLAINT with Jury Demand Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ANHDC-2437054 filed by Arlene Quaratiello.(Rhodes, Jacob)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A-Republican Club Email,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-Letter to Editor,
Att: 3 Exhibit C-Termination Letter,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Town of Raymond,
Att: 6 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Town of Raymond,
Att: 7 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Dudley Tucker Library,
Att: 8 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Dudley Tucker Library,
Att: 9 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Valerie Moore,
Att: 10 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Valerie Moore,
Att: 11 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Jill Galus,
Att: 12 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Jill Galus,
Att: 13 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Sabrina Maltby,
Att: 14 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Sabrina Maltby,
Att: 15 Summons - Waiver Notice of Lawsuit-Kirsten Rundquist Corbett,
Att: 16 Summons - Waiver Waiver-Kirsten Rundquist Corbett
utility Case Assigned Mon 10/30 8:39 AM
Case assigned to US Magistrate Judge Andrea K Johnstone. The case designation is: 1:23-cv-482-AJ. Please show this number with the judge designation on all future pleadings. (ed)
Related: [-]