Oregon District Court
Judge:Adrienne Nelson
Case #: 3:23-cv-01584
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Mar 28, 2024
Case in other court:Multnomah County Circuit Court, 23CV38081
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 4:25 AM PDT
Defendant
Belfor USA Group, Inc.
a Foreign Business Company 185 Oakland Ave Ste 150
Birmingham, MI 48009
Represented By
Mario R. Nicholas
Stoel Rives LLP
contact info
Defendant
Brian Prisel
Plaintiff
BSH Property, LLC
Represented By
David Thomas Wallace, I
Wallace Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Brian Hale
an individual 40 SE 146 Ave #1120
Portland, OR 97233
Represented By
David Thomas Wallace, I
Wallace Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Hale's Breakfast and Lunch, Inc.
Represented By
David Thomas Wallace, I
Wallace Law Firm
contact info

GPO Mar 28 2024
OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Belfor USA Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, ECF 7, is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 3/28/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (gw)

Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Monday, April 29, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Cost Bill Tue 04/30 7:31 AM
ORDER: On March 28, 2024, this Court entered judgment in favor of defendants Belfor USA Group, Inc. and Brian Prisel. Defendant Belfor USA Group, Inc. now moves for costs in the amount of $683.00. Bill of Costs, ECF14 . Plaintiffs did not file objections within fourteen days, thus the motion is unopposed. Local R. 54-1(b). Costs are generally allowed to the prevailing party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 54(d)(1). The requested costs are for filing fees, which are recoverable by the prevailing party under 28 U.S.C. § 1920(1). Defendant has provided the affidavit required under 28 U.S.C. § 1924. Accordingly, defendant Belfor USA Group, Inc.'s Bill of Costs, ECF14 , is GRANTED, and defendant is awarded $683.00 in costs. Signed on 4/29/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (joha)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
16 16 oth_sup Declaration Thu 04/11 3:23 PM
Declaration of Mario R. Nicholas in Support of Defendant Belfor's Memorandum in Support of Belfor's Bill of Costs . Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. Related [+] (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-] Memorandum in Support15 .
Att: 1 Exhibit A
15 15 3 pgs oth_sup Memorandum in Support Thu 04/11 3:17 PM
Memorandum in Support of Belfor's Bill of Costs . Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. Related [+] (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-] Bill of Costs14 .
14 14 motion Bill of Costs Thu 04/11 3:13 PM
Bill of Costs . Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
13 13 order Judgment - Terminate Case Thu 03/28 3:11 PM
JUDGMENT: Pursuant to this Court's Opinion & Order, it is adjudged that this case is DISMISSED with prejudice. Signed on 3/28/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (gw)
Related: [-]
12 12 10 pgs order Opinion and Order Thu 03/28 3:09 PM
OPINION AND ORDER. Defendant Belfor USA Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss, ECF7 , is GRANTED. This case is DISMISSED with prejudice. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed on 3/28/2024 by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (gw)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
11 11 resp Reply to Motion Fri 12/01 9:28 AM
Reply IN SUPPORT OF to Motion to Dismiss AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.17 . Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
10 10 resp Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 11/17 12:57 PM
Response in Opposition to Motion to Dismiss AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.17 Oral Argument requested. Filed by All Plaintiffs. (Wallace, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
oth_evt Clerks Notice of Pay.gov Refund Thu 11/09 10:56 AM
Clerk's Notice of Pay.gov Refund regarding Agency Tracking ID: AORDC-9132187. The request has been granted and the amount of $402.00 will be refunded to Mario Nicholas Related Doc6 Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically. (nd)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
8 8 oth_sup Declaration Fri 11/03 2:49 PM
Declaration of Mario R. Nicholas IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT BELFOR USA GROUP INCS MOTION TO DISMISS AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE . Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. Related [+] (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-] Motion to Dismiss7 .
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11
7 7 motion Dismiss Fri 11/03 2:34 PM
Motion to Dismiss AND REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1. Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
6 6 refund Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically Thu 11/02 3:42 PM
Request for Refund of Fees Paid Electronically regarding Notice of Removal,1 , Refund Request Due, 5 11/9/2023 . Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 30, 2023
3 3 order 3 - Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order - FORM EVENT Mon 10/30 10:20 AM
Notice of Case Assignment to Judge Adrienne Nelson and Discovery and Pretrial Scheduling Order. Discovery is to be completed by 2/27/2024. Joint Alternate Dispute Resolution Report is due by 3/28/2024. Pretrial Order is due by 3/28/2024. Ordered by Judge Adrienne Nelson. (sb)
Related: [-]
2 2 oth_doc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 10/30 8:49 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement . Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Correction of the Record Mon 10/30 10:49 AM
Notice of Correction by Clerk regarding1 Notice of Removal (attachment 2 - Civil Cover Sheet). A Clerical error has been discovered in the case record: The PDF was not flattened. The following corrections were made to the record: A corrected PDF has been uploaded to replace the incorrect one. The Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) will be regenerated to all parties. (cw)
Related: [-]
oth_evt Refund Request Due Mon 10/30 1:07 PM
A duplicate payment in the amount of $402.00 was submitted by Belfor USA Group, Inc. in the above-referenced case. For information on refund procedures, visit[LINK:Requesting a Refund of Electronically Paid Fees] on the Court's website. Refund Request is Due 11/9/2023. (lp)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 10/27 11:51 AM
Notice of Removal of Case Number 23CV38081 from Multnomah County Circuit Court. Filing Fee in amount of $402 collected. Agency Tracking ID: BORDC-9132187 issued. Filer is subject to the requirements of Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1.. Filed by Belfor USA Group, Inc.. (Nicholas, Mario)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet