New Jersey District Court
Judge:William J Martini
Referred: Michael A Hammer
Case #: 2:23-cv-21593
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Terminated:Oct 28, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 7:09 AM EDT
Defendant
PHYSIQ INC.
Plaintiff
SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
MATTHEW STEPHEN ADAMS
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
DANIEL B. COHEN
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info

GPO Mar 18 2024
OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 3/18/2024. (qa, )
GPO Oct 28 2024
OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 10/28/2024. (dam)

Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, October 28, 2024
18 18 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Mon 10/28 12:12 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part16 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Default Judgment. Plaintiff SDSA's Motion on the first cause of action in SDSA's Complaint, Breach of Contract (Count I), is GRANTED . Plaintiff SDSA's Motion on the following causes of action in the Complaint is DENIED : Unjust Enrichment (Count II); Account Stated (Count III); and Breach of the Duty of Good Faith and Fair Dealing (Count IV). Defendant PhysIQ shall pay to SDSA $775,548.94, comprising $751,757.05 in damages, $18,895.50 in attorneys' fees, and $4,896.39 in costs. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 10/28/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
17 17 6 pgs order Opinion Mon 10/28 12:07 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 10/28/2024. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 10/28 12:17 PM
***Civil Case Terminated pursuant to18 Order. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
utility Motions Referred Fri 05/24 9:03 AM
16 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment as to Defendant Physiq, Inc. REFERRED to William J. Martini. (dam)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 05/24 9:04 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment as to Defendant Physiq, Inc. Motion set for 6/17/2024 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Fri 05/24 9:07 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The16 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment filed by Matthew Adams on 5/23/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion for Entry of Default. For future reference, please refer to the CM/ECF Event, Default Judgment , which can be found under Civil Events, Motions and Related Filings, Motions . The Clerk's Office has made the necessary changes regarding this entry. This message is for informational purposes only. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2024
16 16 motion Entry of Default Thu 05/23 6:03 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC..(ADAMS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration Matthew Adams,
Att: 3 Declaration Yuwoon Choi,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, April 24, 2024
order Clerks Entry of Default Wed 04/24 10:15 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Defendant PHYSIQ INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 23, 2024
15 15 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 04/23 3:46 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC. against PHYSIQ, INC.(COHEN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration,
Att: 2 Certification of diligent inquiry
Wednesday, April 03, 2024
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 04/03 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC.. PHYSIQ INC. served on 3/27/2024, answer due 4/17/2024. (COHEN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Certificate of Service Wed 04/03 1:19 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC. (COHEN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Wed 04/03 2:13 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The13 Summons Returned Executed filed by Daniel Cohen on 4/3/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE. Please RESUBMIT the document using the CM/ECF Event, Summons Returned Executed , which can be found under Civil Events, Initial Pleadings and Service, Service of Process . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 19, 2024
12 12 service Summons Issued Tue 03/19 4:27 PM
SUMMONS RE-ISSUED as to PHYSIQ INC.. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Tue 03/19 4:25 PM
ORDER denying without prejudice9 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment. The Clerk shall vacate its entry of default. The Clerk shall reissue the summons as to Defendant. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 3/18/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
10 10 4 pgs order Opinion Tue 03/19 4:23 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge William J. Martini on 3/18/2024. (qa, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
utility Motions Referred Tue 02/20 11:12 AM
9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to PHYSIQ INC. REFERRED to William J. Martini. (krg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Thu 02/15 5:06 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to PHYSIQ INC. by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC. (ADAMS, MATTHEW) Modified on 2/15/2024 (dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Declaration of Matthew Adams,
Att: 3 Declaration of Yuwoon Choi,
Att: 4 Memorandum
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Thu 02/15 7:19 PM
Set Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Default Judgment as to PHYSIQ INC. Motion set for 3/18/2024 before Judge William J. Martini. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk's Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
8 8 misc Request for Default Judgment by Clerk Tue 02/13 3:28 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Judgment by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC. against PhysIQ, Inc..(ADAMS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Matthew S. Adams i/s/o Request to Enter Judgment by Default against defendant, PhysIQ, Inc.,
Att: 2 Declaration of Yuwoon Choi, Esq., i/s/o Request to Enter Judgment by Default against defendant, PhysIQ, Inc.,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
qc QC - Improper Default Request Tue 02/13 11:06 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised that the8 Request for Default Judgment submitted by Matthew Adams on 2/13/2024 cannot be granted as requested because it includes a Request for Attorney's Fees, which is beyond the scope of what the Clerk's Office can grant. Counsel is advised to resubmit their Request for Default Judgment as a Motion returnable before the District Court Judge assigned in this matter. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the Court. (dam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
7 7 motion Entry of Default Tue 01/09 7:13 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC. (COHEN, DANIEL) Modified on 1/9/2024 (dam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of DBC
qc QC - Incorrect Event Selected Tue 01/09 8:39 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The7 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default filed by Daniel Cohen on 1/9/2024 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. For future reference, please refer to the CM/ECF Event, Request for Clerk's Entry of Default , which can be found under Civil Events, Other Filings, Other Documents . This message is for informational purposes, and there is no further action required. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dam)
Related: [-]
order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 01/09 8:43 PM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to PHYSIQ INC. for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (dam)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
6 6 service Affidavit of Service Thu 12/21 2:37 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons and Complaint served on Marilyn Conkright on 11/29/2023, filed by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC..(ADAMS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Affidavit of Service upon Defendant, PhysIQ, Inc.
Monday, October 30, 2023
5 5 misc Exhibit (to Document) Mon 10/30 4:20 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC.. (ADAMS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 10/30 3:33 PM
Diversity Disclosure Statement by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC.. (ADAMS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 10/30 10:18 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PHYSIQ INC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (dam)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Mon 10/30 10:17 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dam)
Related: [-]
qc QC - Blank Diversity Disclosure Statement Mon 10/30 10:17 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - Please be advised, pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(2), unless the Court orders otherwise, in any action filed or removed to this Court, in which jurisdiction is based upon diversity under 28 U.S.C. 1332(a), a party or intervenor must file a disclosure statement naming and identifying the citizenship of every individual or entity whose citizenship is attributed to that party or intervenor. A party, intervenor or proposed intervenor must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the Court.[LINK:Click here] to complete the Diversity Disclosure Statement, once complete, file it using the event Diversity Disclosure Statement. (dam)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 27, 2023
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Fri 10/27 5:57 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC. identifying SAMSUNG SDS CO., LTD. as Corporate Parent.. (ADAMS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Fri 10/27 5:36 PM
COMPLAINT against PHYSIQ, INC. ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14828087), filed by SAMSUNG SDS AMERICA, INC..(ADAMS, MATTHEW)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 10/27 6:11 PM
Case assigned to Judge William J. Martini and Magistrate Judge Michael A. Hammer. (jr)
Related: [-]