Independence Bank v. Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation et al
Rhode Island District Court | |
Judge: | John J Mcconnell, Jr |
Referred: | Patricia A Sullivan |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-00447 |
Nature of Suit | 430 Other Statutes - Banks and Banking |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Oct 27, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jan 16, 2025 |
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 6:47 AM EDT |
Defendant
Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Independence Bank
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago |
Thursday, January 16, 2025 | ||
order
Order Entering Stipulation
Thu 01/16 10:59 AM
TEXT ORDER Entering37 STIPULATION re12 Amended Complaint filed by All Parties. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/16/2025. (Simoncelli, Michael) |
||
Wednesday, January 15, 2025 | ||
37 | 37
![]() STIPULATION re12 Amended Complaint filed by All Parties. (Gemma, Richard) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Tue 11/26 1:05 PM
TEXT ORDER granting36 Motion to Stay up to and including 1/21/2025. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/26/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Friday, November 22, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 60 Days filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 12/6/2024. (Bond, Erik) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Stay
Thu 09/19 9:23 AM
TEXT ORDER granting35 Motion to Stay up to and including 11/18/24. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 9/19/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() Consent MOTION to Stay Proceedings for 60 Days filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 10/2/2024. (Bond, Erik) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() REPLY to Response re31 Response to Motion filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. (Bond, Erik) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Wed 08/21 1:52 PM
TEXT ORDER granting33 Motion for Extension of Time to File Cross-Reply re:28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation; Replies due by 9/11/2024 . So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 8/21/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Tuesday, August 20, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memoranda of Law filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 9/3/2024. (Bond, Erik) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Independence Bank re30 Statement of Undisputed Facts. (McDermott, Travis) |
|
31 | 31
![]() RESPONSE In Opposition to28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memoranda of Law filed by Independence Bank. Replies due by 8/14/2024. (McDermott, Travis) |
|
Monday, July 15, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re28 Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memoranda of Law . (Bond, Erik) |
|
29 | 29
![]() STATEMENT OF DISPUTED FACTS by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation re26 Statement of Undisputed Facts. (Bond, Erik) |
|
28 | 28
![]() Cross MOTION for Summary Judgment and Memoranda of Law filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 7/29/2024.(Bond, Erik) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations.(Gemma, Richard) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Fri 06/28 1:10 PM
TEXT ORDER denying15 Motion to Dismiss: The Court DENIES Defendant Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations' ("DBR") Motion to Dismiss. ECF No. 15. The Plaintiff Independence Bank ("Independence") has sufficiently and plausibly alleged that DBR's decision not to approve the plan of liquidation has caused them real injury (e.g., "until and unless DBR acts on the Plan of Liquidation, Independence must remain a going concern, but forcing Independence to continue operating is itself the harm that the instant suit seeks to remedy" ( Id . at 4); "Independence has alleged particularized harm (ongoing costs to stay in business without any significant income or cash flow) that it has suffered as a direct result of DBR's refusal to act on the Plan of Liquidation" ( Id. ); "here the plan of liquidation submitted to DBR did not require anything from the FDIC. The DBR cannot convert its own responsibilities into those of a federal agency by fiat. The FDIC has no role to play in the liquidation of a state-chartered entity, and thus the harm resulting from DBR's refusal to proceed with Independence's Plan of Liquidation is entirely the result of DBR's own inaction" ( Id. at 6); "liquidation of a state-chartered financial institution under R. I. Gen. Laws §19-10-1 et seq. provides no role for the FDIC, and that it was and is DBR's inaction on the Plan of Liquidation that is currently preventing Independence from closing its doors and avoiding further financial damage" ( Id. at 8). And so, Independence has standing, and this Court has subject-matter jurisdiction over these claims. They are entitled to attempt to prove their claims in this litigation. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 6/28/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Monday, June 24, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() STATEMENT OF UNDISPUTED FACTS by Independence Bank re25 MOTION for Summary Judgment and supporting Memorandum of Law . (McDermott, Travis) |
|
25 | 25
![]() MOTION for Summary Judgment and supporting Memorandum of Law filed by Independence Bank. Responses due by 7/8/2024.(McDermott, Travis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Jason Charles Benton on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Benton, Jason) |
|
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 05/10 1:48 PM
TEXT ORDER granting23 Joint MOTION for Entry of a Stipulated Scheduling Order : Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 6/24/24; FDIC's Opposition and Cross Motion due by 7/15/24; Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition to the Cross Motion due by 8/7/24; and, FDIC's Cross Reply due by 8/28/24. Other deadlines entered as proposed. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 5/10/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Wednesday, May 08, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Joint MOTION for Entry of a Stipulated Scheduling Order filed by Independence Bank. Responses due by 5/22/2024. (McDermott, Travis) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() REPLY to Response re20 Response to Motion filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations. (Gemma, Richard) |
|
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation of Filing of Index of Administrative Record (Bond, Erik) |
|
Tuesday, March 26, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() RESPONSE In Opposition to15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Independence Bank. Replies due by 4/2/2024. (McDermott, Travis) |
|
Wednesday, March 20, 2024 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/20 1:58 PM
TEXT ORDER Entering19 Stipulation filed by Independence Bank, and setting deadline for Response to15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ; Responses due by 3/26/2024 ). So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/20/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Tuesday, March 19, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION re15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Independence Bank. (McDermott, Travis) |
|
Wednesday, March 13, 2024 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Wed 03/13 2:47 PM
TEXT ORDER Entering18 Stipulation for Extension of Time to Respond to15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint ; Responses due by 3/19/2024 ). So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/13/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Tuesday, March 12, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION re15 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Independence Bank. (McDermott, Travis) |
|
Friday, March 01, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Protective Order
Fri 03/01 11:42 AM
TEXT ORDER granting16 Motion for Protective Order. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/1/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
order
Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief
Fri 03/01 11:46 AM
TEXT ORDER granting17 Joint MOTION Entry of a Stipulated Scheduling Order. Deadlines set as follows: Plaintiff's motion for summary judgment due by 5/15/24; FDIC's Opposition and Cross Motion due by 6/5/24; Plaintiff's Reply and Opposition to the Cross Motion due by 6/28/24; and, FDIC's Cross Reply due by 7/19/24. All other deadlines as described in the Motion are also granted. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 3/1/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Wednesday, February 28, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() Joint MOTION Entry of a Stipulated Scheduling Order filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 3/13/2024. (Bond, Erik) |
|
16 | 16
![]() Joint MOTION for Protective Order Concerning Confidentiality filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 3/13/2024. (Bond, Erik) |
|
Tuesday, February 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations. Responses due by 3/12/2024.(Gemma, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, February 13, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation.(Bond, Erik) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 02/06 4:49 PM
TEXT ORDER Entering13 Stipulation to Extend Time to Respond filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations; Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations answer due 2/29/2024. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 2/6/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Monday, February 05, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() STIPULATION re12 Amended Complaint filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations. (Gemma, Richard) |
|
Wednesday, January 31, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction
Wed 01/31 10:50 AM
TEXT ORDER denying as moot without prejudice10 Motion to Dismiss and11 Motion to Dismiss in light of the filing of an12 Amended Complaint. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 1/31/2024. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT against Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations, filed by Independence Bank.(McDermott, Travis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Tuesday, January 16, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations. Responses due by 1/30/2024.(Gemma, Richard) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
10 | 10
![]() MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation. Responses due by 1/30/2024.(Bond, Erik) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, December 15, 2023 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer
Fri 12/15 1:54 PM
TEXT ORDER granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer; Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation answer due 1/16/2024; Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations answer due 1/16/2024. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 12/15/2023. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Wednesday, December 13, 2023 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Consent MOTION for an Extension of Time to File Answer or Respond to the Complaint filed by All Defendants. Responses due by 12/27/2023. (Bond, Erik) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Erik B. Bond on behalf of Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation (Bond, Erik) |
|
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Second STIPULATION re1 Complaint filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations. (Gemma, Richard) |
|
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Richard L. Gemma on behalf of Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations (Gemma, Richard) |
|
Friday, November 17, 2023 | ||
order
Order ~Util - Set Deadlines
Fri 11/17 10:54 AM
TEXT ORDER Entering5 Stipulation filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations; Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations answer due 12/15/2023. So Ordered by Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. on 11/17/2023. (Jackson, Ryan) |
||
Thursday, November 16, 2023 | ||
5 | 5
![]() STIPULATION re1 Complaint filed by Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations. (Shaw, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, November 09, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew I. Shaw on behalf of Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations (Shaw, Matthew) |
|
Friday, October 27, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation, Rhode Island Department of Business Regulations.(Hill, Cherelle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
2 | 2
![]() CASE OPENING NOTICE ISSUED (Hill, Cherelle) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT ( filing fee paid $ 402.00, receipt number ARIDC-1925770 ), filed by Independence Bank.(McDermott, Travis) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 10/27 4:20 PM
Case assigned to Chief Judge John J. McConnell, Jr. and Magistrate Judge Patricia A. Sullivan. (Hill, Cherelle) |