Utah District Court
Judge:David Barlow
Referred: Cecilia M Romero
Case #: 2:23-cv-00783
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Case in other court:USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00787-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00792-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00797-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00799-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00800-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00813-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00821-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00823-DBB USDC District of UT, 2:23-cv-00837-DBB
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 5:14 AM MDT
Consol Plaintiff
Joey Diaz
Represented By
Jason R. Hull
Marshall Olson & Hull PC
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Melanie Williams
Represented By
Jason R. Hull
Marshall Olson & Hull PC
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Tyler Whitmore
Represented By
Kenneth J. Grunfeld
Kopelowitz Ostrow Ferguson Weiselberg Gilbert
contact info
Jared D. Scott
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Laura Robinson
Represented By
Jason R. Hull
Marshall Olson & Hull PC
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Nazia Pierce
Represented By
Ashton J. Hyde
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Joseph M. Lyon
The Lyon Firm
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Ralph Maddox
Represented By
Jason R. Hull
Marshall Olson & Hull PC
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Stephen Hawes
Represented By
Ashton J. Hyde
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Richard Guzman
Represented By
Mark D. Patronella
Migliaccio & Rathod LLP
contact info
Jason S. Rathod
Migliaccio & Rathod LLP
contact info
Rachel L. Sykes
Pearson Butler PLLC
contact info
Nicholas Migliaccio
Migliaccio & Rathod LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Dawn Davis
Represented By
Jared D. Scott
Anderson & Karrenberg
contact info
Richard Elgar Lyon, III
Dover & Luner LLP
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Chad Boyd
Represented By
Justin M. Galvez
Galvez Law PLLC
contact info
Ryan D. Maxey
Maxey Law Firm PA
contact info
Patrick A. Barthle
Morgan And Morgan Complex Litigation Group
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Jodi Bell
Represented By
Ashton J. Hyde
Younker Hyde Macfarlane PLLC
contact info
Philip Joseph Krzeski
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info
Bryan L. Bleichner
Chestnut Cambronne PA
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Marty Alexander
Represented By
William B. Federman
Federman & Sherwood
contact info
Charles H. Thronson
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant
Prog Leasing, LLC
Represented By
Corey N. Barnes
Baker Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jason D. Boren
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Defendant
Progressive Leasing LLC
256 W. Data Dr.
Draper, UT 84020
Represented By
Corey N. Barnes
Baker Hostetler LLP
contact info
Jason D. Boren
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Lisa M Ghannoum
Baker Hostetler LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Raymond Dreger
Represented By
Daniel Srourian
Srourian Law Firm PC
contact info
Steven A. Christensen
Christensen Young & Associates PLLC
contact info
Cameron Steven Christensen
Christensen Young & Associates
contact info
Cameron S Christensen
Christensen Young & Associates
contact info

GPO Jan 10 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION & Order: Granting 19 Motion to Consolidate Cases. 1. Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 42, the court hereby consolidates the ten related actions into the case styled In re Progressive Leasing Breach Litigation, Case No. 2:23-cv-00783 (the Consolidated Action). 2. No further filings shall be made in the following cases: No. 2:23-cv-00787, No. 2:23-cv-00792, No. 2:23-cv-00797, No. 2:23-cv-00799, No. 2:23-cv-00800, No. 2:23-cv-00813, No. 2:23-cv-00821, No. 2:23-cv-00823, and No. 2:23-cv-00837. The clerk of court shall administratively close these nine cases. All pleadings therein maintain their legal relevance until the filing of the Consolidated Class Action Complaint (the Consolidated Complaint). 3. All papers previously filed and served to date in the Related Actions are deemed part of the record in the Consolidated Action. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 01/10/2024. (kpf)
GPO Mar 29 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION and ORDER: granting 32 Motion to Consolidate Cases. Case No. 2:24-cv-00134, styled Davis v. Prog Leasing LLC, with Case No. 2:23-cv-00783. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 03/29/2024. (kpf)
GPO Jan 16 2025
MEMORANDUM DECISION and Order: It is hereby Ordered that Prog's 56 Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Complaint is granted in part and denied in part. The court further orders that Counts II and III are DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by Judge David Barlow on 01/16/2025. (kpf)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, March 28, 2025
78 78 notice Notice of Change of Address Fri 03/28 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address by Jason D. Boren (Boren, Jason)
Related: [-]
77 77 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/28 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Service by Richard Guzman (Rathod, Jason)
Related: [-]