North Carolina Middle District Court
Judge:Loretta C Biggs
Referred: Joe L Webster
Case #: 1:14-cv-00935
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2014
Terminated:Mar 29, 2017
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 9:40 PM EDT
Defendant
UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL, THE
103 South Building
Chapel Hill, NC 27599
Defendant
THE UNIVERSITY OF NORTH CAROLINA AT CHAPEL HILL
Represented By
STEPHANIE A. BRENNAN
N. C. Department Of Justice
contact info
LISA M. GILFORD
Skadden Arps Slate Meagher & Flom, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael McAdoo
8021 Georgia Avenue Apt. 821
Silver Spring, MD 20910
Represented By
GERALDINE SUMTER
Ferguson, Chambers & Sumter, P.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
MICHAEL MCADOO
Represented By
GERALDINE SUMTER
Ferguson, Chambers & Sumter, P.A.
contact info
CYRUS B. MEHRI
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
NWAMAEGWU JEREMI DURU
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
DANIELLE E. DAVIS
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
KENYA MCBEE
Represented By
GERALDINE SUMTER
Ferguson, Chambers & Sumter, P.A.
contact info
CYRUS B. MEHRI
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
NWAMAEGWU JEREMI DURU
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info
DANIELLE E. DAVIS
Mehri & Skalet, PLLC
contact info

GPO Mar 29 2017
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 3/29/2017, that UNC-Chapel Hill's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No. 14) is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion to file Second Amended Complaint (ECF No. 19) and UNC-Chapel Hill's Motion to Strike (ECF No. 31) are DENIED AS MOOT.(Daniel, J)
Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, March 29, 2017
60 60 order Judgment Wed 03/29 12:56 PM
JUDGMENT. Signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 3/29/2017. For the reasons set out in the Memorandum Opinion and Order filed contemporaneously with this Judgment, UNC-Chapel Hill's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.14 ) is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion to file Second Amended Complaint (ECF No.19 ) and UNC-Chapel Hill's Motion to Strike (ECF No.31 ) are DENIED AS MOOT.(Daniel, J)
Related: [-]
59 59 order Memorandum and Opinion Order Wed 03/29 12:48 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER. Signed by JUDGE LORETTA C. BIGGS on 3/29/2017, that UNC-Chapel Hill's Motion to Dismiss (ECF No.14 ) is GRANTED, and this action is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. FURTHER that Plaintiffs' Motion to file Second Amended Complaint (ECF No.19 ) and UNC-Chapel Hill's Motion to Strike (ECF No.31 ) are DENIED AS MOOT.(Daniel, J)
Related: [-]