Juliano v. Lancaster Central School District
New York Western District Court | |
Judge: | Richard J Arcara |
Referred: | Michael J Roemer |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00939 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Nov 06, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2016 |
Last checked: Monday May 11, 2015 10:40 PM EDT |
Defendant
Lancaster Central School District
|
Represented By
|
Mediator
Randolph C. Oppenheimer
|
|
Plaintiff
Mary Juliano
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, August 04, 2016 | ||
22 | 22
order
Text Order
Thu 08/04 7:50 AM
-CLERK TO FOLLOW UP-TEXT ORDER: Upon receipt of the parties' stipulation of dismissal, the Clerk of the Court shall take all steps necessary to close this matter. SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. Richard J. Arcara on August 4, 2016 (CMK) |
|
Wednesday, August 03, 2016 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Wed 08/03 2:38 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Mary Juliano.(Sanders, Harvey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
20 | 20
order
Text Order
Wed 08/03 9:12 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Plaintiff has filed a notice of voluntarily dismissal19 . Because the Defendant has filed an answer, the Plaintiff may not unilaterally dismiss this case. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). If both parties stipulate to dismissal, this case will be dismissed without an order from the Court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii). If, however, the Plaintiff seeks to unilaterally dismiss this case after the Defendant has filed an answer, the case "may be dismissed... only by court order, on terms that the court considers proper." Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(2). "Such an order approving a dismissal should be obtained by motion." Wright & MIller, Fed. Prac. & Proc. sec. 2364. If the parties do wish to dismiss this case, then on or before August 12, 2016, either (1) the parties shall file a stipulation of dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), or (2) the Plaintiff shall file a motion seeking dismissal pursuant to Rule 41(a)(2). SO ORDERED. Issued by the Hon. Richard J. Arcara on August 3, 2016 (CMK) |
|
Tuesday, August 02, 2016 | ||
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Tue 08/02 2:40 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Mary Juliano(Sanders, Harvey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Tuesday, June 07, 2016 | ||
18 | 18
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 06/08 12:45 PM
THIRD CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Discovery completed by 9/15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 12/15/2016. Mediation To End by 12/15/2016. If no pretrial dispositive motions are filed, the parties shall contact the chambers of the Hon. Richard J. Arcara by December 22, 2016 to schedule a trial date. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 6/7/2016. (RAZ) |
|
Wednesday, March 02, 2016 | ||
17 | 17
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 03/02 11:35 AM
SECOND AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Motions to Compel Discovery due by 5/13/2016. Discovery completed by 6/15/2016. Dispositive Motions due by 9/15/2016. Mediation To End by 9/15/2016. If no pretrial dispositive motions are filed, the parties shall contact the chambers of the Hon. Richard J. Arcara by September 22, 2016 to schedule a trial date. Signed by Hon. Michael J. Roemer on 2/26/2016. (RAZ) |
|
Wednesday, December 23, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Wed 12/23 4:11 PM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Michael J. Roemer. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on December 23, 2015.(JMM) |
|
Wednesday, October 28, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Scheduling Order
Wed 10/28 4:11 PM
AMENDED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Dispositive Motions due by 5/23/2016. If no dispositive motions are filed, a Trial Date Status Conference is set for 5/27/2016 at 09:00AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 10/28/15. (DAZ) |
|
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 10/28 4:12 PM
*** MOTION TERMINATED ***14 Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery granted in part and denied in part per15 . (DAZ) |
||
Tuesday, October 27, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Wed 10/28 1:06 PM
Joint Motion for Extension of Case Management Order deadlines (Brendan P. Kelleher, Esq.) (Filed with permission of Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy).(DAZ) |
|
Tuesday, August 04, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
adr
Mediation Certification
Tue 08/04 9:49 AM
Mediation Certification by Randolph C. Oppenheimer(Oppenheimer, Randolph) |
|
Friday, April 03, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
adr
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator
Fri 04/03 4:18 PM
Stipulation-Selection of Mediator by Lancaster Central School District. (Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Monday, March 16, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 03/16 7:28 AM
TEXT ORDER : With good cause shown, the joint motion10 for an extension of the initial mediation deadline is granted. The initial mediation deadline is extended to 4/3/2015. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 3/16/15. (DAZ) |
|
Friday, March 13, 2015 | ||
10 | 10
motion
Extension of Time to Complete Discovery
Mon 03/16 7:25 AM
Defendant's Motion for an Extension of the Initial Mediation Deadline (Brendan P. Kelleher, Esq.)(Filed with permission of Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy).(DAZ) |
|
Thursday, February 26, 2015 | ||
9 | 9
order
Scheduling Order
Thu 02/26 12:37 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER (Please Note: This docket text may not contain the entire contents of the attached Order. It is your responsibility to read the attached Order and download it for future reference. Direct any questions to the Chambers of the Judge who entered this Order.) Dispositive Motions due by 3/31/2016. In the event no dispositive motions are filed, a Trial Date Status Conference is set for 4/4/2016 at 09:30AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 2/26/15. (DAZ) |
|
Wednesday, February 25, 2015 | ||
8 | 8
minutes
1 - Terminate Hearings Scheduling Conference
Wed 02/25 12:30 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy: In Chambers Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 2/25/2015. Discussed/set Case Management Order deadlines. CMO to follow. APPEARANCES: Harvey P. Sanders for Plaintiff; Brendan Patrick Kelleher for Defendant. (DAZ) |
|
Thursday, February 12, 2015 | ||
7 | 7
misc
Proposed Pretrial Order
Thu 02/12 8:50 AM
Proposed Pretrial Order Scheduling Order by Lancaster Central School District.(Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order ~Util - Set Hearings
Tue 01/20 3:41 PM
ORDER OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE set for 2/25/2015 at 11:00 AM before Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. Signed by Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy on 1/20/2015. (CMD) |
|
5 | 5
order
Text Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Tue 01/20 11:11 AM
TEXT ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Hon. Jeremiah J. McCarthy. The Magistrate Judge is hereby designated to act in this case as follows: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(A) and (B), all pre-trial matters in this case are referred to the above-named United States Magistrate Judge, including but not limited to: (1) conduct of a scheduling conference and entry of a scheduling order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16, (2) hearing and disposition of all non-dispositive motions or applications, (3) supervision of discovery, and (4) supervision of all procedural matters involving the aforementioned or involving the preparation of the case or any matter therein for consideration by the District Judge. The Magistrate Judge shall also hear and report upon dispositive motions for the consideration of the District Judge pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(b)(1)(B) and (C). All motions or applications shall be filed with the Clerk and made returnable before the Magistrate Judge. The parties are encouraged to consider the provisions of 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) governing consent to either partial or complete disposition of the case, including trial if necessary, by the Magistrate Judge. Consent forms are available from the office of the Magistrate Judge or the office of the Clerk of Court. IT IS SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. Richard J. Arcara on 1/20/15. (LAS) |
|
adr
ADR Plan
Tue 01/20 10:05 AM
ADR Plan electronically forwarded to attorneys. The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution (DLC) |
||
Friday, January 16, 2015 | ||
4 | 4
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 01/16 4:14 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Lancaster Central School District.(Kelleher, Brendan) |
|
Thursday, December 11, 2014 | ||
3 | 3
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Thu 12/11 4:55 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Mary Juliano. Lancaster Central School District waiver sent on 11/12/2014, answer due 1/12/2015.(Sanders, Harvey) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 Summons Issued as to Lancaster Central School District. (DZ) | |
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Verified against Lancaster Central School District ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0209-2142049.), filed by Mary Juliano.(Sanders, Harvey) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Case assigned to Hon. Richard J. Arcara. (DZ) | ||
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at http://www.uscourts.gov/forms/AO085.pdf (DZ) | ||
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL to Mediation ; The ADR Plan is available for download at http://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/alternative-dispute-resolution(DZ) |