Utah District Court
Judge:Ted Stewart
Case #: 2:23-cv-00785
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Fiduciary Duty
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2023
Terminated:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 5:15 AM MDT
Defendant
Judge Robert Faust
Represented By
Darin B. Goff
contact info
Lora E. Cooper
Utah Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Kirton McConkie
Defendant
Adam Mow
Represented By
Darin B. Goff
contact info
Lora E. Cooper
Utah Attorney General
contact info
Defendant
Parsons Behle and Latimer
Represented By
Hannah J. Ector
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Alex B. Leeman
Parsons Behle & Latimer
contact info
Defendant
Robert Shelby
Represented By
Jasmine M. Peters
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Defendant
The Corporation of the President of the Church of Jesus Christ of Latter Day Saints
Defendant
Sharadee Fleming
Represented By
Mark A. Nickel
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Office of Professional Conduct and Ethics and Discipline Committee
Represented By
Mark A. Nickel
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
The Utah State Bar
Represented By
Mark A. Nickel
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Defendant
Billy L Walker
Represented By
Mark A. Nickel
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Plaintiff
Brett L. Eliason
The Estate of Max and Joyce Eliason and Max D Eliason who is a protected person ME 43 S FAIRWAY DR
NORTH SALT LAKE, UT 84054

GPO Jan 23 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER granting 16 Motion to Stay and granting 22 Motion to Stay ; denying 25 Motion to Deny Stay and Restricting Filings. In addition to the above-referenced Motions to Dismiss (ECF 3, 4), there are twelve motions currently pending that were filed by Plaintiff (ECF 8, 9, 11, 13, 17, 21, 23, 26, 27, 34, 36, 37). In order to allow the court to resolve the pending motions, the court hereby notifies Plaintiff that the court will not accept any new motions or filings as of the date of this order. Any document that is filed will be lodged and will not be considered. Once the existing motions have been decided, the court will, if needed, lift the ban on filings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Cecilia M. Romero on 1/23/2024. (mh)
GPO May 29 2024
MEMORANDUM DECISION AND ORDER GRANTING MOTIONS TO DISMISS AND ENTERING VEXATIOUS LITIGANT ORDER - granting 42 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; granting 3 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction ; granting 3 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; granting 4 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ; re 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support , 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM ; ORDER re 42 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Robert Shelby, 3 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and Memorandum in Support MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and Memorandum in Support filed by Parsons Behle and Latimer, 4 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Adam Mow, Robert Faust. See Order for details. Signed by Judge Ted Stewart on 5/29/24. (jrj)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
124 124 utility Lodged Document Thu 02/13 9:58 AM
DOCUMENTS LODGED consisting of Motion to Reopen. Note: attached document lodged for reference purposes only; no response required unless specifically ordered by the court. (jrj)
Related: [-]