South Carolina District Court
Judge:Donald C Coggins, Jr
Referred: Kevin Mcdonald
Case #: 7:23-cv-05477
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1391 Personal Injury
Case Filed:Oct 27, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 7:30 AM EDT
Defendant
25350 Pleasant Valley LLC
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Autoline of VA Inc
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Babak Bayramov
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Elshan Bayramov
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Caspian Auto House Inc
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Certified Auto Deal Inc
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Flexacar LLC
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Total Auto Financing LLC
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Defendant
Total Car Protection Dre 1 Reinsurance LTD
Represented By
Fred W Trey Suggs, III
Cassidy Coates Price, PA
contact info
James Henry Cassidy
Roe Cassidy Coates And Price
contact info
Plaintiff
American Credit Acceptance LLC
Represented By
Marc P Solomon
Burr & Forman (al)
contact info
Paul D Harrill
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info
Bernie W Ellis
Burr And Forman LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Friday, May 02, 2025
206 206 3 pgs motion Extension of Time Fri 05/02 4:19 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response Brief in Opposition to Defendants' Motion for Summary Judgment by American Credit Acceptance LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/16/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Ellis, Bernie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
205 205 2 pgs notice Notice Other Fri 05/02 3:35 PM
NOTICE OF ERRATA re:196 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by Defendants Elshan Bayramov and Babak Bayramov. (agig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Envelope
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
204 204 3 pgs misc Reply Not to a Motion Wed 04/30 2:29 PM
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE AND RESPONSE TO200 Motion for Extension of Time, (Plaintiff's Allegations Regarding Formatting) by Babak Bayramov, Elshan Bayramov. (agig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Envelope
203 203 16 pgs misc Supplement - Not an attachment to main document Wed 04/30 2:24 PM
Defendants' SUPPLEMENTAL Memorandum by Babak Bayramov, Elshan Bayramov to196 Response in Opposition to Motion. (agig)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit 1: Bankruptcy Hearing Transcript,
Att: 2 68 pgs Exhibit 2: Steven Meyer's March 20, 2025 Deposition,
Att: 3 33 pgs Exhibit 3: Curt Sidden's March 17. 2015 Deposition,
Att: 4 2 pgs Exhibit 4: Table of Contradictions,
Att: 5 2 pgs Exhibit 5: Table of Contradictions Between Hearing and Deposition,
Att: 6 2 pgs Envelope
Monday, April 28, 2025
202 202 misc Document Mailed Mon 04/28 2:24 PM
***DOCUMENT MAILED 201 Text Order placed in U.S. Mail from Greenville Clerks Office to Elshan Bayramov, PO Box 566, Dumfries, VA 22026 and Babak Bayramov, PO Box 566, Dumfries, VA 22026. (agig)
Related: [-]
201 201 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 2:20 PM
TEXT ORDER granting the plaintiff's 200 motion for extension of time until May 8, 2025, to file its reply in support of its 190 motion for partial summary judgment. IT IS SO ORDERED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kevin McDonald on 4/28/25. (agig)
Related: [-]
200 200 3 pgs motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 04/28 12:53 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to190 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment on Counts I, II, VI, VII, and VIII ,196 Response in Opposition to Motion,,,,,, by American Credit Acceptance LLC. Response to Motion due by 5/12/2025. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45.No proposed order.Motions referred to Kevin McDonald.(Ellis, Bernie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Certificate of Service