MAPAY, LLC v. METZ et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Renee Marie Bumb |
Referred: | Elizabeth A Pascal |
Case #: | 1:23-cv-21678 |
Nature of Suit | 880 Civil Rights - Defend Trade Secrets Act of 2016 (DTSA) |
Cause | 18:1836(a) Injunction against Misappropriation of Trade Secrets |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2023 |
Terminated: | Jun 11, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:44 AM EDT |
Defendant
NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BRANDOMINANCE, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ROBERT METZ
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NATALIE ALLMAN, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
MICHAEL SULLIVAN
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
ABC CORPS. 1-10
|
|
Defendant
ARMOUR OPS, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN DOES 1-10
|
|
Plaintiff
MAPAY, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Tuesday, June 11, 2024 | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Tue 06/11 2:39 PM
***Civil Case Terminated. (dmw) |
||
Friday, June 07, 2024 | ||
37 | 37
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal by MAPAY, LLC. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2024 | ||
36 | 36
![]() Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice Anthony D. Pesce to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. ( Pro Hac Vice fee $ 250 receipt number ANJDC-15421004.) (DAVIS, ANTHONY) (Main Document 36 replaced on 6/5/2024) (sms2) |
|
qc
QC - Fillable PDF
Wed 06/05 11:36 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The36 Notice of Request filed by ANTHONY J. DAVIS on 6/5/2024 was uploaded prior to being flattened. Before uploading fillable forms to ECF you must flatten the file to prevent other users from manipulating or editing the information. The easiest way to flatten a PDF form is by selecting Print to PDF and saving the flattened form, other PDF software may differ. Please visit our[LINK:website] under Flattening PDF Forms for guidance. Your document has been corrected. This message is for informational purposes only. (sms2) |
||
notice
Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added
Wed 06/05 11:39 AM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ANTHONY D. PESCE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (sms2) |
||
Tuesday, May 28, 2024 | ||
35 | 35
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME, Plaintiff shall file its opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint until on or before June 7, 2024. Reply due 6/28/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 5/28/2024. (js) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() STIPULATION and Proposed Order for Extension of Time by MAPAY, LLC. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Monday, May 20, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() ORDER Granting32 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Anthony D. Pesce, Esquire. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 5/20/2024. (dmr) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/20 9:43 AM
Set Deadlines as to32 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony D. Pesce . Motion set for 6/17/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Friday, May 17, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony D. Pesce by MAPAY, LLC.(DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Monday, May 13, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Mon 05/13 11:25 AM
Set Deadlines as to31 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer . Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Friday, May 10, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF, ARMOUR OPS, LLC, BRANDOMINANCE, INC., KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND, ROBERT METZ, NATALIE ALLMAN, INC., MICHAEL SULLIVAN. Responses due by 6/17/2024.(KRAUSE, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Friday, May 03, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
order
Order
Fri 05/03 9:13 AM
TEXT ORDER: The Court has received and reviewed Plaintiff's request to withdraw its Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice , ECF No. 28. The request is GRANTED . The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate the Motion; however, the entry shall remain on the docket. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 5/3/2024. (bda) |
|
Thursday, May 02, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
![]() Letter from Anthony J. Davis, Esq. re28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony D. Pesce . (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
qc
QC - Document contains an Electronic Signature of a Non-Attorney
Thu 05/02 8:34 AM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Declaration of Anthony D. Pesce attached to the Motion for Pro Hac Vice28 submitted by Anthony J. Davis on 5/1/2024 contains an improper signature. Only Registered Users are permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE DOCUMENT WITH A PROPER SCANNED SIGNATURE using the "Exhibit to Document" event (found under Other Documents) and link it to the Motion. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (dmr) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Thu 05/02 8:35 AM
Set Deadlines as to28 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony D. Pesce . Motion set for 6/3/2024 before Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (dmr) |
||
Wednesday, May 01, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Anthony D. Pesce by All Plaintiffs.(DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Friday, April 26, 2024 | ||
27 | 27
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by PAUL SALVATORIELLO on behalf of MAPAY, LLC (SALVATORIELLO, PAUL) |
|
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME: Defendants shall file their motion to dismiss the Amended Complaint on or before May 10, 2024. Plaintiff's opposition to Defendants' motion to dismiss is due on or before May 28, 2024. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/23/2024. (jab) |
|
Monday, April 22, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() STIPULATION re21 Amended Complaint Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time by NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF, ARMOUR OPS, LLC, BRANDOMINANCE, INC., KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND, ROBERT METZ, NATALIE ALLMAN, INC., MICHAEL SULLIVAN. (KRAUSE, JONATHAN) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order
Fri 04/19 10:02 AM
TEXT ORDER: This matter comes before the Court upon renewed pre-motion letters, [Docket Nos. 22, 23], concerning a proposed motion to dismiss the amended complaint by Defendants. Having read those letters, the Court does not believe that a pre-motion conference would be productive at this time. Therefore, Defendants may proceed with filing their proposed motion if they choose to do so. The Clerk of Court is directed to administratively terminate Defendants' March 14, 2024 motion to dismiss, [Docket No. 20], as moot. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 4/19/24. (ar1, ) |
|
Friday, April 12, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() Letter from Anthony J. Davis. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Friday, April 05, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() Letter from Jonathan S. Krause. (KRAUSE, JONATHAN) |
|
Monday, April 01, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT Verified with Exhibits against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by MAPAY, LLC.(DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 03/15 11:36 AM
Set Deadlines as to20 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer . Motion set for 4/15/2024 before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (jab) |
||
Thursday, March 14, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint, or in the Alternative, Motion to Transfer by NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF, ARMOUR OPS, LLC, BRANDOMINANCE, INC., KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND, ROBERT METZ, NATALIE ALLMAN, INC., MICHAEL SULLIVAN. Responses due by 4/1/2024.(KRAUSE, JONATHAN) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Thursday, February 22, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() STIPULATION AND ORDER Granting an extension for Defendants to file their motion to dismiss the Complaint until on or before 3/14/2024. Signed by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 2/22/2024. (jab) |
|
18 | 18
![]() STIPULATION re1 Complaint, Stipulation and Proposed Order for Extension of Time by NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF, ARMOUR OPS, LLC, BRANDOMINANCE, INC., KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND, ROBERT METZ, NATALIE ALLMAN, INC., MICHAEL SULLIVAN. (KRAUSE, JONATHAN) |
|
Wednesday, February 21, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order
Wed 02/21 1:33 PM
TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion letters from Defendants and Plaintiff, [Docket Nos. 12, 15], concerning a proposed motion to dismiss by Defendants. Having read those letters, the Court does not believe that a pre-motion conference would be productive at this time. Therefore, Defendants may proceed with filing their proposed motion if they choose to do so. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 02/21/2024. (Costigan, Roberta) |
|
Tuesday, February 20, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() Letter from MAPAY Clarifying Response to Defendants Premotion Letter. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Friday, February 09, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() Letter from Anthony J. Davis, Esq.. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Tuesday, February 06, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order
Tue 02/06 4:52 PM
TEXT ORDER This matter comes before the Court upon the pre-motion letter filed by Defendants on January 25, 2024. [Docket No. 12.] Plaintiff has failed to address Defendants' letter within seven (7) days as required by Rule I.A of this Courts Individual Rules and Procedures, available at https://www.njd.uscourts.gov/sites/njd/files/ProceduresJudgeReneeMarieBumb.pdf. It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff shall show cause by no later than February 13, 2024, why it has failed to timely respond AND why the relief Defendants seek in their pre-motion letter should not be granted. If no response is filed, the Court will likely grant Defendants the relief their motion seeks. So Ordered by Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb on 02/06/2024. (Costigan, Roberta) |
|
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by STEPHANIE D WOLBRANSKY on behalf of NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF, ARMOUR OPS, LLC, BRANDOMINANCE, INC., KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND, ROBERT METZ, NATALIE ALLMAN, INC., MICHAEL SULLIVAN (WOLBRANSKY, STEPHANIE) |
|
Thursday, January 25, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() Letter from Jonathan S. Krause. (KRAUSE, JONATHAN) |
|
Friday, December 08, 2023 | ||
11 | 11
![]() CONSENT ORDER Extending the time in which Defendants may answer, move, or otherwise respond to the Verified Complaint to February, 2, 2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal on 12/8/2023. (jab) |
|
Wednesday, December 06, 2023 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Proposed Order to Extend Time to Answer, Move, or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by All Plaintiffs. (FIALKOFF, CARA) |
|
9 | 9
![]() Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Robert Metz, Armour Ops, LLC d/b/a Amour Life Sciences, LLC, Kathryn Mertes-Egeland, BRANDominance, Inc., Natalie Allman Dumstorff, Natalie Allman, Inc. and Michael Sullivan. Attorney JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE for NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF,JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE for ARMOUR OPS, LLC,JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE for BRANDOMINANCE, INC.,JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE for KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND,JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE for ROBERT METZ,JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE for NATALIE ALLMAN, INC.,JONATHAN SPELLS KRAUSE for MICHAEL SULLIVAN added. (FIALKOFF, CARA) |
|
qc
QC - Incorrect Event Selected
Wed 12/06 4:23 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Proposed Consent Order9 filed by CARA FIALKOFF on 12/6/2023 was submitted incorrectly as a Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Proposed Consent Order USING *Proposed Order*. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (jab) |
||
Monday, December 04, 2023 | ||
8 | 8
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAPAY, LLC. NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF served on 11/7/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
7 | 7
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAPAY, LLC. NATALIE ALLMAN, INC. served on 11/7/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Wednesday, November 29, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAPAY, LLC. ROBERT METZ served on 11/7/2023, answer due 11/28/2023. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS Returned Executed by MAPAY, LLC. KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND served on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
4 | 4
![]() SUMMONS ISSUED as to NATALIE ALLMAN DUMSTORFF, ARMOUR OPS, LLC, BRANDOMINANCE, INC., KATHRYN MERTES-EGELAND, ROBERT METZ, NATALIE ALLMAN, INC., MICHAEL SULLIVAN. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (jab) |
|
notice
Notice of Judicial Preferences
Wed 11/01 10:05 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (jab) |
||
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Exhibit to1 Complaint, by MAPAY, LLC. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by MAPAY, LLC. (DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14834652), filed by MAPAY, LLC.(DAVIS, ANTHONY) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Tue 10/31 4:47 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Elizabeth A. Pascal added. (mmb, ) |