New Jersey District Court
Judge:Julien Xavier Neals
Referred: Andre M Espinosa
Case #: 2:23-cv-21680
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1983 Civil Rights
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:45 AM EDT
Defendant
PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT
577 VALE ROAD
PARSIPPANY, NJ 07054
Represented By
PATRICK F. CARRIGG
Lenox Socey Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
CELENA SPENCER
Represented By
DRAKE P. BEARDEN, JR.
Javerbaum Wurgaft Hicks Kahn Wickstrom & Sinins, P.C.
contact info

GPO Jul 14 2024
OPINION. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/14/2024. (mxw, )

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
24 24 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/23 9:36 AM
TEXT ORDER - The Court has reviewed Plaintiffs' letter re23 requesting an adjournment of the Rule 16 initial scheduling conference. The initial conference is rescheduled to June 23, 2025, at 10:00 AM. To join the conference, dial 973-437-5535, access code 134 234 798#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/23/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
23 23 misc Letter Tue 04/22 2:16 PM
Letter from Drake P. Bearden, Jr., Esq. (BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
22 22 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 04/09 1:40 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Rule 16 initial scheduling conference set for April 23, 2025, will commence at 11:00 AM instead. To join the conference, dial 973-437-5535, access code 134 234 798#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 4/9/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
21 21 discov Joint Discovery Plan Mon 03/31 10:44 AM
Joint Discovery Plan by All Defendants.(CARRIGG, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Mon 03/31 9:59 AM
TEXT ORDER - Due to Counsel's failure to file a Joint Discovery Plan, as ordered in text order D.E. 19, this morning's Rule 16 conference is rescheduled to April 23, 2025, at 2:00 PM. The parties shall meet and confer to prepare a Joint Discovery Plan, which shall be filed by April 17, 2025 . To join the conference, dial 973-437-5535, access code 134 234 798#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 3/31/2025. (jd, ) Modified on 3/31/2025 (jd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
19 19 order Text Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 02/18 12:21 PM
TEXT ORDER - The Court will hold a Rule 16 initial scheduling conference, by telephone, on March 31, 2025 at 11:30 AM. The parties shall meet and confer to prepare a Joint Discovery Plan, which shall be filed by March 26, 2025. To join the conference, dial 973-437-5535, access code 134 234 798#. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 2/18/2025. (jd, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
18 18 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 12/17 4:14 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's16 Motion for Leave to File a Second Amended Complaint. Signed by Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa on 12/17/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
17 17 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Wed 08/28 3:14 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by All Defendants re16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint (CARRIGG, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/14 9:20 AM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint . Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
16 16 motion Amend/Correct Tue 08/13 2:16 PM
MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by CELENA SPENCER.(BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification Certification of Counsel,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service,
Att: 4 Exhibit A
Monday, July 15, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Mon 07/15 4:33 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's10 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/14/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 14, 2024
14 14 10 pgs order Opinion Mon 07/15 4:32 PM
OPINION. Signed by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 7/14/2024. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Monday, March 11, 2024
13 13 respm Reply Brief to Opposition to Motion Mon 03/11 4:50 PM
REPLY BRIEF to Opposition to Motion filed by All Defendants re10 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Amended Complaint (CARRIGG, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 04, 2024
12 12 respm Brief in Opposition to Motion Mon 03/04 4:59 PM
BRIEF in Opposition filed by CELENA SPENCER re10 MOTION to Dismiss (BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order,
Att: 2 Certificate of Service,
Att: 3 Exhibit A
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 02/21 10:57 AM
Reset Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/18/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
11 11 respm Letter Rule 7.1 Tue 02/20 4:42 PM
Rule 7.1(d)(5) Letter for an automatic extension of the return date of a dispositive motion filed by CELENA SPENCER re10 MOTION to Dismiss (BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/02 11:33 AM
Set Deadlines as to10 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 3/4/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
10 10 motion Dismiss Thu 02/01 3:40 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT.(CARRIGG, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Brief,
Att: 4 Certification,
Att: 5 Table of Contents,
Att: 6 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 7 Exhibit A
Friday, January 19, 2024
9 9 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 01/19 5:49 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT, filed by CELENA SPENCER.(BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
8 8 order Order Fri 01/12 10:55 AM
TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the Court upon Defendants letter requesting a pre-motion conference (ECF No. 6). Having read the submissions of the parties, including Plaintiffs response thereto (ECF No.7 ), the Court determines it will not hold a pre-motion conference in this matter. By January 19, 2024, Plaintiff may file an amended complaint to cure the deficiencies raised in the parties letters (ECF Nos.6 -7 ). Defendant may file a motion to dismiss within the time prescribed by the rules of court to answer or otherwise plead, thereafter. So Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 1/12/2024. (kd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
7 7 misc Letter Thu 01/11 4:46 PM
Letter from Plaintiff in response to pre-motion filing re6 Letter. (BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 04, 2024
6 6 misc Letter Thu 01/04 4:53 PM
Letter from Defendant Requesting Pre-Motion Conference. (CARRIGG, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
5 5 order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 01/04 2:39 PM
TEXT ORDER - This matter comes before the Court upon Defendants Motion to Dismiss (ECF No4 ). Pursuant to the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures, IV(A), "[i]n an effort to resolve cases expeditiously, before bringing a motion to dismiss,... a party must submit a letter" described therein. Defendant did not comply with this rule. Accordingly, the Motion is hereby ADMINISTRATIVELY TERMINATED. Defendant shall submit its pre-motion letter and Plaintiff shall have 7 days to respond pursuant to Rule IV(A) of the Court's Individual Rules and Procedures. Ordered by Judge Julien Xavier Neals on 1/4/2024. (kd)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/03 10:12 AM
Set Deadlines as to4 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 2/5/2024 before Judge Julien Xavier Neals. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
4 4 motion Dismiss Tue 01/02 4:58 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT.(CARRIGG, PATRICK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Brief,
Att: 2 Certification cert of counsel,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit exhibit a,
Att: 5 Certificate of Service
Monday, November 13, 2023
3 3 service Waiver of Service Executed Mon 11/13 9:10 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by CELENA SPENCER. PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT waiver sent on 11/2/2023, answer due 1/1/2024. (BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 11/02 9:40 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (mxw, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Thu 11/02 10:39 AM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (kd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/31 1:37 PM
COMPLAINT against PARSIPPANY-TROY HILLS TOWNSHIP SCHOOL DISTRICT ( Filing and Admin fee $ 402 receipt number ANJDC-14834662) with JURY DEMAND, filed by CELENA SPENCER.(BEARDEN, DRAKE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Wed 11/01 10:36 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Julien Xavier Neals and Magistrate Judge Andre M. Espinosa. (ak, )
Related: [-]