Utah District Court
Judge:Dustin B Pead
Case #: 2:23-cv-00790
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 2:39 AM MDT
Defendant
KPC Promise Healthcare LLC
Defendant
KPC Promise Hospital of Salt Lake LLC
Plaintiff
GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC
Represented By
Mark C. Rose
Mckay Burton & Thurman PC
contact info
Jamie L. Nopper
Mckay Burton & Thurman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM MDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
notice Notice From the Court Fri 09/13 11:26 AM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT. On 09/11/2024, Plaintiff filed a Notice of Dismissal Without Prejudice12 . Under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(i), the dismissal is self-effectuating. The case is dismissed without prejudice. No order will follow. (mjw)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Fri 09/13 11:35 AM
Civil Case Terminated without prejudice per notice 13 . (alf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal (Atty) Wed 09/11 10:42 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
11 11 misc Response to Order to Show Cause Mon 06/10 9:08 AM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE filed by GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC. (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 05/28 4:26 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE - Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause why the above captioned case should not be dismissed for failure to prosecute. Plaintiff is directed to respond in writing within 14 days from the date of this order and inform the Court of the status of the case and intentions to proceed. Failure to do so will result in dismissal of the case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 5/28/2024. (mh)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 17, 2023
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/17 1:11 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC as to KPC Promise Hospital of Salt Lake LLC served on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Fri 11/17 1:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC as to KPC Promise Healthcare LLC served on 11/10/2023, answer due 12/1/2023. (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
7 7 5 pgs order Order to Propose Schedule Wed 11/01 10:34 AM
ORDER TO PROPOSE SCHEDULE - See order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead on 11/1/2023. (alf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Electronically Tue 10/31 4:55 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to KPC Promise Healthcare LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Electronically Tue 10/31 4:54 PM
Summons Issued Electronically as to KPC Promise Hospital of Salt Lake LLC. Instructions to Counsel: 1. Click on the document number. 2. If you are prompted for an ECF login, enter your 'Attorney' login to CM/ECF. 3. Print the issued summons for service. (sg)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Tue 10/31 3:58 PM
Civil Cover Sheet (JS44) Civil Summons may be issued electronically. Prepare the summons using the courts[LINK:PDF version] and email it to utdecf_clerk@utd.uscourts.gov for issuance, filed by GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC. (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
3 3 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 The Civil Cover Sheet is missing. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately.(sg)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Rule 7 Corporate Disclosure Statement (Atty) Tue 10/31 2:34 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT under FRCP 7.1 filed by Plaintiff GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC. (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Atty) Tue 10/31 1:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AUTDC-4859968) filed by GA HC REIT II Salt Lake LTACH LLC. (Rose, Mark)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Tue 10/31 3:47 PM
Magistrate Judge Dustin B. Pead added. Case number will now read 2:23-cv-00790-DBP. Please make changes to document captions accordingly. (sg)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 10/31 3:53 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY re1 The Civil Cover Sheet is missing. All civil actions presented for filing must be accompanied by a completed Civil Cover Sheet. See Local Rule DUCivR3-4. Counsel must file a completed Civil Cover Sheet JS44 immediately.(sg)
Related: [-]