Georgia Southern District Court
Judge:Lisa G Wood
Referred: Christopher L Ray
Case #: 4:23-cv-00318
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Terminated:Mar 18, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:27 AM EDT
Defendant
Cory Galloway
Defendant
Charles Marshall
Defendant
C and C Property Investments, LLC
Plaintiff
Transcendent Marketing & Development LLC
Represented By
Christopher R. Jordan
Hunter, Maclean, Exley & Dunn, P.C.
contact info
Matthew A. Grossman
Frantz, Mcconnell & Seymour, LLP
contact info
Justin G. Guthrie
Hunter Maclean
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
C & C Property Investments, LLC
Terminated: 01/24/2024


Docket last updated: 76 minutes ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
71 71 misc Costs Taxed Tue 04/08 10:32 AM
Costs Taxed in amount of $3,287.42 against C and C Property Investments, LLC, Charles Marshall, and Cory Galloway. (thb)
Related: [-]