North Carolina Eastern District Court
Judge:Terrence W Boyle
Referred: Robert B Jones, Jr
Case #: 5:23-cv-00628
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Terminated:Sep 26, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:55 AM EDT
Defendant
Kilolo Kijakazi
Represented By
Sharon C. Wilson
United States Attorney'S Office - Ednc
contact info
Defendant
Koniag Government Services, LLC
Represented By
Joshua D. Wilson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Benjamin L. Williams
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Koniag Technology Solutions
Represented By
Joshua D. Wilson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Benjamin L. Williams
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC
Represented By
Joshua D. Wilson
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani
contact info
Benjamin L. Williams
Gordon Rees Scully Mansukhani, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Jean D. Cenezy
3271 Calumet Drive
Raleigh, NC 27610
Represented By
Bryan M. Sumner
Hairston Lane, PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Thursday, September 26, 2024
35 35 order Judgment Thu 09/26 9:00 AM
JUDGMENT - IT IS ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that both KGS defendants' and the SSA's motions to dismiss plaintiff's complaint are GRANTED. [DE 17, 23]. Plaintiff's complaint is DISMISSED in its entirety. This case is closed. Signed by deputy clerk for Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 9/26/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
34 34 10 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 09/26 8:51 AM
ORDER granting23 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction and for Failure to State a Claim; granting17 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Signed by District Judge Terrence W. Boyle on 9/23/2024. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
33 33 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Thu 08/22 12:52 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by James E. Hairston, Jr on behalf of Jean D. Cenezy substituting for Bryan M. Sumner. (Hairston, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
notice Notice to Counsel Wed 08/21 2:58 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:32 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. The caption on the document does not match the caption of the case that it is filed in. Please correct the caption and re-file. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
32 32 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Mon 08/19 2:04 PM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by James E. Hairston, Jr on behalf of Jean D. Cenezy substituting for Bryan M. Sumner. (Hairston, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
notice Notice to Counsel Mon 08/12 10:59 AM
Notice to Counsel regarding:31 Notice of Substitution of Counsel. Mr. Hairston should file the notice of substitution using his CM/ECF credentials for the purpose of appearing on the Court's docket. Upon the filing, Mr. Sumner will be terminated as counsel of record. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
31 31 notice Notice of Substitution of Counsel Fri 08/09 11:47 AM
Notice of Substitution of Counsel filed by Bryan M. Sumner on behalf of Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Submitted Fri 08/09 11:46 AM
Motion Submitted to District Judge Terrence W. Boyle regarding23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM,17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
30 30 respm Reply to Response to Motion Fri 05/31 11:03 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Martin O'Malley. (Wilson, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2024
29 29 19 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Fri 05/17 11:21 PM
Memorandum in Opposition regarding23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 15, 2024
28 28 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 04/15 10:31 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion regarding17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 11, 2024
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Thu 04/11 3:26 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding27 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 04/11 4:19 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Second Consent Motion for Extension of Time27 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including May 17, 2024, within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss23 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/11/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
27 27 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 04/10 1:03 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, April 02, 2024
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Tue 04/02 11:54 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding25 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 04/02 1:51 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time25 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including April 15, 2024, within which respond to the Motion to Dismiss23 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 4/2/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 01, 2024
26 26 13 pgs respoth Memorandum in Opposition Mon 04/01 11:32 PM
Memorandum in Opposition regarding17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Thu 03/21 3:34 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, March 04, 2024
24 24 28 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Mon 03/04 12:08 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding23 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Wilson, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- SSA Final Agency Decision Reissued,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2- EEOC OFO Decision
23 23 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 03/04 12:03 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Alternatively , MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Wilson, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
22 22 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Fri 02/23 9:04 AM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time up to and Including March 4, 2024, in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Wilson, Sharon) Modified on 2/23/2024 to correct event to "Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer" (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Fri 02/23 10:15 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding22 Second MOTION for Extension of Time up to and Including March 4, 2024, in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond to Plaintiffs Complaint . (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 02/23 11:22 AM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant Kilolo Kijakazi's Second Motion for Extension of Time22 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that this defendant has up to and including March 4, 2024 within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/23/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 07, 2024
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Wed 02/07 3:35 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding21 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response as to17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 02/07 8:01 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time21 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Plaintiff has up to and including March 30, 2024 within which to respond to the Motion to Dismiss17 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/7/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 06, 2024
21 21 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 02/06 4:26 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 01, 2024
20 20 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 02/01 1:13 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond up to and Including February 23, 2024, filed by Kilolo Kijakazi. (Wilson, Sharon) Modified on 2/1/2024 to change to correct event (Motion for Extension of Time to Answer) (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 02/01 1:07 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Sharon C. Wilson on behalf of Kilolo Kijakazi. (Wilson, Sharon)
Related: [-]
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Thu 02/01 4:29 PM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding20 MOTION for Extension of Time in Which to Answer or Otherwise Respond up to and Including February 23, 2024, . (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/01 4:44 PM
TEXT ORDER granting Defendant's Motion for Extension of Time20 . For good cause shown, it is ordered that Defendant has up to and including February 23, 2024, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 2/1/2024. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
18 18 19 pgs respoth Memorandum in Support Wed 01/24 12:29 PM
Memorandum in Support regarding17 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Statement of Discrimination,
Att: 3 Exhibit EEOC Charge,
Att: 4 Exhibit Order,
Att: 5 Exhibit Judgment
17 17 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Wed 01/24 12:20 PM
MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 22, 2023
utility Motion Referred to Clerk Fri 12/22 11:24 AM
Motion Referred to Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court regarding16 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint. (Stouch, L.)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 12/22 1:38 PM
TEXT ORDER granting the Motion for Extension of Time16 filed by Defendants Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, and Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. For good cause shown, it is ordered that these defendants have up to and including January 24, 2024, within which to answer or otherwise respond to the Complaint1 . Signed by Peter A. Moore, Jr., Clerk of Court on 12/22/2023. (Hockaday, A.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 20, 2023
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 12/20 4:08 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer regarding1 Complaint filed by Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, December 15, 2023
15 15 notice Notice of Special Appearance Fri 12/15 1:13 PM
Notice of Special Appearance for non-district by Joshua D. Wilson on behalf of Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (Wilson, Joshua)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 12/15 10:14 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koniag Government Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Koniag, Inc. for Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 12/15 10:11 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Koniag Technology Solutions identifying Corporate Parent Koniag Government Services, LLC, Corporate Parent Koniag, Inc. for Koniag Technology Solutions. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Fri 12/15 10:00 AM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Koniag Government Services, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Koniag, Inc. for Koniag Government Services, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 12/15 9:10 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Benjamin L. Williams on behalf of Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (Williams, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
10 10 service Summons Issued as to USA Fri 12/01 9:01 AM
Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
9 9 notice Notice-other Mon 11/27 2:49 PM
Notice filed by Jean D. Cenezy Proposed Summons . (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 service Summons Issued Wed 11/15 3:19 PM
Summonses Issued as to Kilolo Kijakazi, Koniag Government Services, LLC, Koniag Technology Solutions, Tuknik Government Solutions, LLC. (*NOTICE: Counsel shall print the attached summons and serve with other case opening documents in accordance with Fed.R.Civ.P. 4.*) (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Counsel Wed 11/15 3:21 PM
Notice to Counsel regarding:5 Notice - other. Counsel has not provided proposed summons(es) for all of the necessary parties for service of this action. You must prepare and file the additional proposed summons(es) as required by Rule 4(I) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Sellers, N.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
7 7 notice Notice-other Thu 11/02 4:43 PM
Notice filed by Jean D. Cenezy . (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice-other Thu 11/02 4:11 PM
Notice filed by Jean D. Cenezy . (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice-other Thu 11/02 4:10 PM
Notice filed by Jean D. Cenezy . (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice-other Thu 11/02 4:08 PM
Notice filed by Jean D. Cenezy . (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
notice Notice to Counsel Wed 11/01 4:15 PM
Notice to Counsel - No Summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 10/31 4:54 PM
Notice of Appearance filed by Bryan M. Sumner on behalf of Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Financial Disclosure Statement Tue 10/31 4:35 PM
Financial Disclosure Statement by Jean D. Cenezy (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 10/31 4:25 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ANCEDC-7335908.), filed by Jean D. Cenezy. (Sumner, Bryan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet