Florida Middle District Court
Judge:Julie S Sneed
Referred: Daniel C Irick
Case #: 6:23-cv-02117
Nature of Suit196 Contract - Franchise
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:32 AM EDT
Defendant
Kia America, Inc.
Represented By
David B. Massey
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Jonathan R. Stulberg
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Ryan Lee Ford
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Mediator
Paul Ullom
Represented By
Paul J. Ullom
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
Plaintiff
SAG FL, LLC
Represented By
Nicholas Andrew Bader
Bass Sox Mercer
contact info
Andrew Thomas
Bass Sox Mercer
contact info
Jason Todd Allen
Bass Sox Mercer
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
91 91 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 04/30 4:18 PM
Minute Entry. In Person Proceedings held before Judge Julie S. Sneed: MOTION HEARING held on 4/30/2025 re62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAG FL, LLC and64 MOTION for Miscellaneous Relief, specifically EXCLUDE OPINIONS AND TESTIMONY OF JOSEPH ROESNER filed by Kia America, Inc. Court Reporter: Karla Hyland (GNB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
90 90 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 04/29 5:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re62 MOTION for Partial Summary Judgment filed by SAG FL, LLC.(Bader, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex 1. Placeholder for Sealed Document,
Att: 2 Ex 2. Placeholder for Sealed Document,
Att: 3 Ex 3. Emails (various) re allocation,
Att: 4 Ex 4. Expert Report of Joseph Roesner
89 89 motion Motion to Seal Tue 04/29 5:15 PM
Plaintiff's Unopposed MOTION to file DOCUMENT Exhibits 1 & 2 to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of Motion for Partial Summary Judgment under seal by SAG FL, LLC(Thomas, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1. Email string re allocation (KUS_008563-8566),
Att: 2 Exhibit 2. Email string re allocation (KUS 009229-9232)
Monday, April 28, 2025
88 88 misc Sealed Document Mon 04/28 12:50 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit D re84 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 Sealed Order on Motion to Seal by Kia America, Inc. (Stulberg, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
87 87 misc Sealed Document Mon 04/28 12:48 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit C re84 Response in Opposition to Motion, 86 Sealed Order on Motion to Seal by Kia America, Inc. (Stulberg, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
86 86 order Sealed Order on Motion to Seal Wed 04/23 3:03 PM
ENDORSED ORDER granting 83 Defendant's Unopposed Motion to Seal. Defendant may file under seal Exhibits C and D to its Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Partial Summary Judgment. Those documents shall remain under seal until the 90th day after the date this case is closed and all appeals exhausted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel C. Irick on 4/23/2025. (Irick, Daniel)
Related: [-]
85 85 misc Sealed Document Wed 04/23 12:47 PM
SEALED DOCUMENT Exhibit 2 to Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Exclude re 80 Sealed Order on Motion to Seal,79 Response in Opposition to Motion by SAG FL, LLC (Thomas, Andrew)
Related: [-]