Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Jeremy D Kernodle
Case #: 6:23-cv-00537
Nature of Suit150 Contract - Recovery of Overpayment & Enforcement of Judgment
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 12, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 3:30 AM CDT
Defendant
American State Bank
Represented By
Nathaniel J Higgins
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Veronica T. Hunter
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Brandon Steele
Represented By
Nathaniel J Higgins
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Veronica T. Hunter
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Steele Bancshares, Inc.
Represented By
Nathaniel J Higgins
Jackson Lewis P.C.
contact info
Veronica T. Hunter
Jackson Lewis, P.C.
contact info
Mediator
Ken Rubenstein
Burdin Mediations 6333 East Mockingbird Lane, Suite 147-471
Dallas, TX 75205
Plaintiff
James Nichols
The Hartmann Firm 400 N. St. Paul Suite 1420
Dallas, TX 75201
Represented By
Clay Alfred Hartmann
The Hartmann Firm, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 55 minutes ago
Tuesday, November 12, 2024
20 20 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 11/12 2:50 PM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 11/12/2024. (gsm)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 11/12 10:03 AM
JOINT STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by American State Bank, Steele Bancshares, Inc., Brandon Steele. (Higgins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
18 18 notice Notice (Other) Tue 08/13 11:56 AM
NOTICE Defendant's Designation of Expert Witnesses by American State Bank, Brandon Steele, Steele Bancshares, Inc. (Hunter, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
17 17 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/15 2:43 PM
NOTICE of Expert Designation by James Nichols (Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 10, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order Referring Case to Mediator Wed 04/10 11:52 AM
ORDER Appointing Mediator. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 4/10/2024. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 09, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Designation of Mediator Tue 04/09 9:33 PM
NOTICE of Designation of Mediator, Ken Rubenstein, filed by James Nichols.(Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, March 27, 2024
14 14 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Wed 03/27 8:08 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by American State Bank, Brandon Steele, Steele Bancshares, Inc. (Higgins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 07, 2024
13 13 8 pgs order Order 1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Thu 03/07 10:25 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER. Amended Pleadings due by 5/20/2024. Discovery due by 9/18/2024. Joinder of Parties due by 5/20/2024. Joint Pretrial Order due by 2/18/2025. Bench Trial set for 3/17/2025 at 09:00 AM in Tyler Courthouse before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 3/6/2024. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
12 12 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting Fri 03/01 2:08 PM
JOINT REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Higgins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 21, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/21 11:56 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by Brandon Steele.(Higgins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Mon 02/12 1:17 PM
ORDER granting5 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint . Defendants' answers (Docket Nos. 7, 8) are accepted as timely. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 2/12/2024. (esw)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 08, 2024
9 9 7 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Fri 02/09 9:29 AM
ORDER GOVERNING PROCEEDINGS. Telephonic Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2024 at 10:00 AM before District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle. Signed by District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle on 2/8/2024. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/26 5:08 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by Steele Bancshares, Inc..(Higgins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 01/26 4:38 PM
Defendant's ANSWER to1 Complaint by American State Bank.(Higgins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 24, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Wed 01/24 1:15 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Veronica T. Hunter on behalf of American State Bank, Brandon Steele, Steele Bancshares, Inc. (Hunter, Veronica)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
5 5 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/23 3:16 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by American State Bank, Brandon Steele, Steele Bancshares, Inc..(Higgins, Nathaniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, December 28, 2023
4 4 notice Notice (Other) Thu 12/28 10:08 AM
NOTICE of Rule 11 on Service and Answer Date of Defendants by James Nichols (Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Wed 11/08 10:19 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to American State Bank, Brandon Steele, and Steele Bancshares, Inc.(ndc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons,
Att: 2 Summons
Thursday, November 02, 2023
utility Add and Terminate Judges Thu 11/02 12:22 PM
District Judge Jeremy D. Kernodle added. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
2 2 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Tue 10/31 10:07 PM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) AND (2) Disclosure Statement filed by James Nichols (Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 10/31 8:30 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ATXEDC-9785681.), filed by James Nichols.(Hartmann, Clay)
Related: [-]