New York Northern District Court
Case #: 1:23-cr-00384
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 01, 2023 3:19 AM EDT
Defendant
Eric Ross (1)
Represented By
Matthew E. Trainor
Office Of The Federal Public Defender - Albany Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Rachel L Williams
Doj-Usao
contact info
Elizabeth A. Conger
U.S. Attorney'S Office, Northern District Of New York
contact info
Joseph Hartunian
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/01/2023 4:57 AM EDT
Monday, November 08, 2021
Text Minute Entry for proceedings (1:36PM-1:44PM) held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Initial Appearance as to Eric Ross held on 11/8/2021. Appearances: AUSA Rachel Williams and AFPD Matt Trainor. A Financial Affidavit is submitted and approved. The Court appoints the Office of the Federal Public Defender for representation. Defendant is advised of his rights, charges, maximum penalties and given a copy of the Complaint. Government moves for detention based upon the Defendant being a risk of flight and a danger to the community. A Detention Hearing is set for 11/10/2021 at 2:00 PM in Albany, NY before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The Court will address the Preliminary Hearing at the next scheduled proceeding. Government is advised of their obligations under Brady v. Maryland. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Court Reporter: Jacqueline Stroffolino/CRD: Maria Blunt). (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Eric Ross (1). (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Eric Ross. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Eric Ross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/8/2021. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Eric Ross: This Order is entered, pursuant to Federal Rule of Criminal Procedure 5(f) and the Due Process Protections Act, to confirm the Government's disclosure obligations under Brady v. Maryland , 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny, and to summarize the possible consequences of violating those obligations. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/8/2021. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 09, 2021
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Matthew E. Trainor appearing for Eric Ross (Trainor, Matthew) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
6 6 PRETRIAL SERVICES INVESTIGATION REPORT - [LODGED] as to Eric Ross. [This document has been electronically lodged with the Court and is viewable by ONLY the attorney for the government, the attorney for the defendant, and the presiding judge. Any further distribution or dissemination is prohibited.] (anp, ) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 10, 2021
7 7 Text Minute Entry for proceedings (3:03PM-3:11PM) held before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart: Detention Hearing as to Eric Ross held on 11/10/2021. Appearances: AUSA Rachel Williams and AFPD Matt Trainor. Defendant is reminded of his rights. Government moves for continued detention. Atty Trainor advised that Defendant is prepared to withdraw his request for a hearing so that he can explore the option of a mental health evaluation and deal with any issues concerning his prescribed medication. Defendant waives a Detention Hearing and a Preliminary Hearing, but reserves the right request such hearings if circumstances change. Defendant is remanded to the custody of the USMS. (Court Reporter: Lisa Tennyson/CRD: Maria Blunt). (mab)[1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER APPROVING WAIVER OF DETENTION HEARING as to Eric Ross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/10/2021. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
9 9 ORDER APPROVING WAIVER OF PRELMINARY HEARING as to Eric Ross. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/10/2021. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Sunday, November 14, 2021
10 10 STIPULATION by USA to Exclude Speedy Trial Time(Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
Monday, November 15, 2021
11 11 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 11/15/2021 until 1/14/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/15/2021. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, January 07, 2022
12 12 STIPULATION by USA to Exclude Speedy Trial Time(Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
Wednesday, January 12, 2022
13 13 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 1/11/2022 until 3/12/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/11/2022. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 10, 2022
14 14 STIPULATION by USA to Exclude Speedy Trial Time(Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
Friday, March 11, 2022
15 15 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 3/11/2022 until 5/10/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/11/2022. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
16 16 STIPULATION by USA to Exclude Speedy Trial Time(Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
Wednesday, May 11, 2022
17 17 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 5/9/2022 until 7/8/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 5/9/2022. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, July 01, 2022
18 18 STIPULATION by USA to Exclude Speedy Trial Time (Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 05, 2022
19 19 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 7/5/2022 until 9/3/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 7/5/2022. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 08, 2022
20 20 STIPULATION by USA to Order for Enlargement of Time (Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, September 09, 2022
21 21 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 9/8/2022 until 11/7/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 9/8/2022. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, November 07, 2022
22 22 STIPULATION by USA to exclude Speedy Trial Act time (Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 08, 2022
23 23 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 11/8/2022 until 1/7/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 11/8/2022. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 29, 2022
24 24 STIPULATION by USA to exclude Speedy Trial Act time (Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 03, 2023
25 25 STIPULATION and ORDER FOR ENLARGEMENT OF TIME as to Eric Ross. Time excluded from 1/3/2023 until 3/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 1/3/2023. (mab) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 07, 2023
26 26 STIPULATION by USA to exclude Speedy Trial Act time (Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
27 27 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Eric Ross. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 30 days. Time excluded from 3/7/2023 until 4/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 3/7/2023. (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 05, 2023
28 28 STIPULATION by USA to exclude Speedy Trial Act time (Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, April 07, 2023
29 29 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Eric Ross. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 60 days. Time excluded from 4/6/2023 until 6/5/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 4/7/2023. (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 05, 2023
30 30 STIPULATION by USA to exclude Speedy Trial Act time (Williams, Rachel) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 06, 2023
NOTICE OF HEARING as to Eric RossA Status Conference is set for 6/9/2023 02:00 PM in Albany before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Friday, June 09, 2023
Text Minute Entry for a Status Conference as to Eric Ross held on 6/9/2023 before Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart. The Court reminds defendant of their rights. Counsel advises the court on the status of the case. Appearances: Rachel L. Williams, Esq., AUSA; Matthew E. Trainor, Esq., (FPD) for defendant.[Digitally Recorded]. Time: 2:03 PM 2:05 PM. (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 12, 2023
32 32 LETTER REQUEST filed by Eric Ross. (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 13, 2023
31 31 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Eric Ross. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 60 days. Time excluded from 6/9/2023 until 8/8/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 6/13/2023. (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 14, 2023
33 33 LETTER re32 Letter Request filed by Eric Ross (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 28, 2023
34 34 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Joseph Hartunian appearing for USA as substituted counsel for Attorney Rachel L. Williams (Hartunian, Joseph) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, August 07, 2023
35 35 STIPULATION by USA to exclude Speedy Trial Act time (Hartunian, Joseph) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 08, 2023
36 36 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Eric Ross. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 60 days. Time excluded from 8/7/2023 until 10/6/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 8/7/2023.(gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 28, 2023
Notice of Case Assignment - Waiver of Indictment: Case Caption: USA v. Eric Ross; Case Number Assigned: 1:23-CR-384; Assigned Judge: Hon. Mae A. D'Agostino; (ztc) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 02, 2023
TEXT NOTICE SETTING WAIVER AND PLEA HEARING as to Eric Ross (1:23-cr-384 MAD): The Waiver and Plea Hearing as to Eric Ross is set for 10/11/2023 at 12:00 PM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (ban) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
37 37 STIPULATION by USA to a Pre-Indictment Exclusion of Speedy Trial Time(Hartunian, Joseph) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order/Judgment
Thursday, October 05, 2023
38 38 ORDER TO CONTINUE - Ends of Justice as to Eric Ross. The time within which an Indictment must be filed is enlarged 30 days. Time excluded from 10/5/2023 until 11/4/2023. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel J. Stewart on 10/5/2023. (gmd) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
TEXT NOTICE RE-SETTING WAIVER AND PLEA HEARING as to Eric Ross (1:23-cr-384 MAD): At the request of the defense, the Waiver and Plea Hearing as to Eric Ross is reset for 10/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in Albany before U.S. District Judge Mae A. D'Agostino. (ban) [1:21-mj-00531-DJS]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
39 39 WAIVER OF INDICTMENT as to Eric Ross. (ban)
Related: [-]
40 40 FELONY INFORMATION as to Eric Ross (1) counts 1, 2, 3 with First and Second Forfeiture Allegations. (ban)
Related: [-]
42 42 PLEA AGREEMENT as to Eric Ross. (ban)
Related: [-]
43 43 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Elizabeth A. Conger appearing for USA as co-counsel with Attorney Joseph Hartunian for the forfeiture aspect of the case (Conger, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]