Hawaii District Court
Judge:Micah WJ Smith
Referred: Wes Reber Porter
Case #: 1:23-cv-00439
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Oct 30, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Apr 27, 2024 12:45 AM HST
Defendant
AM2 Freight Operations, Inc.
Represented By
John P. Duchemin
Cades Schutte LLP
contact info
Defendant
Great Silk Road Transportation Inc.
Defendant
V2 Logistics Corp.
Represented By
John P. Duchemin
Cades Schutte LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
John Luke Lyons
Email: johnlukelyons@gmail.com 4872 Halwell Dr
Virginia Beach, VA 23464
Plaintiff
Louise L. Tuttle
Email: tuttlelou35@gmail.com 4872 Halwell Dr
Virginia Beach, VA 23464
Plaintiff
Craig W. Walsh
350 Ward Ave, #106-8
Honolulu, HI 96814

GPO Apr 22 2024
s any such claims (solely as to Walsh) under Rule 12(b)(1) without prejudice. Finally, the V2 Defendants' motion for judicial notice, which they filed in support of their motion to dismiss, is DENIED as moot. (eta)COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - John Luke Lyons and Louise L. Tuttle have been served by First Class Mail to the address of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) on April 22, 2024. Craig W. Walsh has been served electronically to the email address listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF). Registered Participants of CM/ECF received the document electronically to the email addresses listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Modified on 4/22/2024 (eta). ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS' MOTION FOR PARTIAL DISMISSAL OF COMPLAINT re 22 - Signed by JUDGE MICAH W.J. SMITH on 4/22/2024. Accordingly, the Court elects to decide the motion without a hearing, see Local Rule 7.1(c), and GRANTS the V2 Defendants' motion to dismiss the Lanham Act and trademark (or other trademark-related) claims under Rule 12(b)(6). This dismissal is directed, specifically, at paragraphs 43 through 47, 50, and 51 of the complaint and any related attached exhibits. And because those claims could not be saved by amendment of the complaint, this dismissal is with prejudice. See Eminence Cap., LLC v. Aspeon, Inc., 316 F.3d 1048, 1052 (9th Cir. 2003). Furthermore, to the extent Walsh purported to join the complaint's other claims - that is, the SCRA and substantial emotional distress claims - the Court agrees with the V2 Defendants that he lacked standing to do so. The Court therefore GRANTS the motion to dismis

Docket last updated: 05/19/2025 11:59 PM HST
Tuesday, April 15, 2025
69 69 minutes 3 - Set Ripe Deadline Tue 04/15 11:50 AM
EO: Regarding Plaintiffs'68 Motion for Entry of Default Judgment, the Court SETS the following briefing schedule: any opposition shall be filed by 5/6/2025; any reply shall be filed by 5/27/2025. (MAGISTRATE JUDGE WES REBER PORTER) (jo) COURT'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE - Non-Registered CM/ECF Participants have been served by First Class Mail to the addresses of record listed on the Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF). Pro Se (Non-Prisoner) Litigants that have consented to receive documents and Notices of Electronic Filings by email, have been served electronically at the e-mail address listed on the (NEF)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 11, 2025
68 68 motion Default Judgment Fri 04/11 4:39 PM
MOTION for Entry of Default Judgment - by Plaintiffs John Luke Lyons, Louise L. Tuttle. (jni)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit in Support