Maryland District Court
Judge:Stephanie A Gallagher
Case #: 1:23-cv-02980
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Terminated:Apr 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 4:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Southwest Airlines
Represented By
Daniel E Farrington
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Bianca A. Hughley
P.O. Box 24763
Middle River, MD 21220

GPO Apr 18 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/18/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
GPO Jun 25 2024
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/25/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)

Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Friday, December 13, 2024
28 28 appeal USCA Mandate Fri 12/13 1:11 PM
MANDATE of USCA as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Bianca A. Hughley (jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
27 27 appeal USCA Judgment Thu 11/21 10:33 AM
JUDGMENT of USCA (certified copy) Affirming the judgment of the District Court as to24 Notice of Appeal filed by Bianca A. Hughley(jh6s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Opinion
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
appeal Record to 4cca Tue 07/23 11:45 AM
Assembled Electronic Record Transmitted to Fourth Circuit -- Initial(av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
26 26 appeal USCA Case Number Fri 07/19 3:52 PM
USCA Case Number 24-1667 for24 Notice of Appeal filed by Bianca A. Hughley. Case Manager - Ashley Brownlee (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
25 25 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Fri 07/19 2:52 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re24 Notice of Appeal. IMPORTANT NOTICE: To access forms which you are required to file with the United States Court of Appeals for the Fourth Circuit please go to http://www.ca4.uscourts.gov and click on Forms & Notices.(av4s, Deputy Clerk) (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/19/2024) IFP
24 24 appeal Notice of Appeal Fri 07/19 2:46 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to23 Order on Motion for Leave to File by Bianca A. Hughley. Fee Status: IFP. (av4s, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 06/25 4:10 PM
ORDER Denying20 Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/25/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Tue 06/25 4:08 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 6/25/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
21 21 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 06/04 8:54 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re20 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint for Plaintiff's Breach of Contract Claim filed by Southwest Airlines.(Farrington, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2024
20 20 motion Leave to File Document Wed 05/22 9:50 AM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaiint by Bianca A. Hughley(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3,
Att: 5 Exhibit 4,
Att: 6 Exhibit 5
Thursday, April 18, 2024
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Thu 04/18 11:03 AM
ORDER Granting12 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/18/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
18 18 12 pgs order Memorandum Opinion Thu 04/18 11:00 AM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 4/18/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Wed 03/20 12:16 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Southwest Airlines.(Farrington, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/05 1:21 PM
ORDER granting15 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 Response in Opposition to Motion, ; Setting Defendant's deadline to file a reply brief in support of its Motion to Dismiss is extended to March 21, 2024. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 3/5/2024. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 03/05 8:55 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to14 Response in Opposition to Motion, Defendant's Motion to Dismiss by Southwest Airlines(Farrington, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Thursday, February 22, 2024
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 02/23 8:19 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re12 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Bianca A. Hughley.(bas, Deputy Clerk) (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 (2/23/2024) Exhibit 5,
Att: 6 (2/23/2024) Exhibit 6
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
13 13 misc Rule 12/56 Tue 01/30 7:58 AM
Rule 12/56 notice mailed to Bianca A. Hughley (c/m 1/30/2024 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
12 12 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 01/29 1:51 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Southwest Airlines(Farrington, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 to Memorandum in Support,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 to Memorandum in Support,
Att: 4 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 01/16 12:20 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by Southwest Airlines(Farrington, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 01/16 5:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting10 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Southwest Airlines answer due 1/29/2024. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 1/16/2024. (vals, Chambers)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/08 11:21 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bianca A. Hughley. Southwest Airlines served on 12/18/2023, answer due 1/8/2024.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 12/21 1:34 PM
ORDER granting7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Defendant's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint Southwest Airlines answer due 1/22/2024.. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 12/21/2023. (bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/21 9:22 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint Defendant's Opposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Southwest Airlines(Farrington, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Wednesday, November 22, 2023
6 6 service Summons Issued Wed 11/22 2:49 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to Southwest Airlines.(c/s USM 11/22/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
5 5 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/16 3:43 PM
ORDER Granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; Granting Plaintiff 21 days complete the U.S. Marshal forms and return them to the Clerk. Signed by Judge Stephanie A. Gallagher on 11/16/2023. (c/m 11/16/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
4 4 misc New Case Notification Letter Wed 11/01 3:51 PM
New Case Notification Letter sent to Bianca A. Hughley. (c/m 11/1/2023 bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Consent to Receive Electronic Notice Wed 11/01 3:47 PM
Consent to receive notice and service electronically by Bianca A. Hughley. The Court recommends that all documents received electronically be printed or saved for future reference.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Wed 11/01 3:46 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Bianca A. Hughley(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
1 1 8 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 11/01 3:45 PM
COMPLAINT against Southwest Airlines, filed by Bianca A. Hughley.(bas, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment 1,
Att: 2 Attachment 2,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 4 Summons