Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Paul C Huck
Case #: 1:23-cv-24178
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Terminated:Dec 06, 2023
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 4:20 AM EDT
Defendant
KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC
Represented By
Rachel Feder Daily
Kw Property Management & Consulting LLC
contact info
Matthew Harris Luttinger
Kw Property Management & Consulting
contact info
Frank Christopher Simone
Frank Simone, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Marlene Quintana
Gray Robinson 333 S.E. 2ND AVENUE Suite 3200 MIAMI
MIAMI, FL 33131
Plaintiff
ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ
Represented By
Elvis John Adan
Gallardo Law Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
12 12 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 12/06 2:46 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AND CLOSING CASE. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/6/2023. See attached document for full details. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 05, 2023
11 11 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 12/05 11:11 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ (Adan, Elvis)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
10 10 motion Dismiss More Definite Statement Mon 11/27 9:51 AM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint And/Or in the Alternative , MOTION for More Definite Statement and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC. Responses due by 12/11/2023 (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 21, 2023
9 9 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Tue 11/21 10:36 AM
Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Marlene Quintana as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 11/28/2023 at 1:30 p.m. (Simone, Frank) Modified to Add Mediation Hearing Date on 11/21/2023 (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Wed 11/15 9:21 AM
ORDER Denying7 Joint Motion for Settlement Conference Before Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres. Additionally, the parties shall select a mediator and file a notice advising the Court of their selection no later than November 29, 2023. Mediation Deadline 12/14/2023. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/14/2023. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
7 7 motion Settlement Mon 11/13 4:38 PM
Joint MOTION for Settlement Conference before Magistrate Judge Edwin Torres by KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC. Responses due by 11/27/2023(Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Order on Motion for Settlement Conference
6 6 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 11/13 4:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Rachel Feder Daily on behalf of KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC. Attorney Rachel Feder Daily added to party KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC(pty:dft). (Daily, Rachel)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 11/13 4:16 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Matthew Harris Luttinger on behalf of KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC. Attorney Matthew Harris Luttinger added to party KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC(pty:dft). (Luttinger, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 11/13 4:10 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Odevo US, Inc., Other Affiliate The Water Restoration Group, LLC for KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC (Simone, Frank)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11/02 8:44 AM
Summons Issued as to KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC. (nwn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 11/02 8:42 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nwn)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/01 5:01 PM
COMPLAINT against KW PROPERTY MANAGEMENT & CONSULTING, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17041654, filed by ROBERTO RODRIGUEZ.(Adan, Elvis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s),
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet