Mississippi Northern District Court
Judge:Sharion Aycock
Referred: Roy Percy
Case #: 1:23-cv-00153
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Terminated:Jun 18, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 3:42 AM CDT
Defendant
APAC-Mississippi, Inc.
Represented By
Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen
Littler Mendelson, P.C.
contact info
Matthew Gary Gallagher
Littler Mendelson
contact info
Plaintiff
Anthony Lee Wright
Represented By
Jim D. Waide, III
Waide & Associates, PA
contact info
Yance A. Falkner
Waide & Associates, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 66 minutes ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
34 34 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/15 3:40 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice . (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 08/15 3:37 PM
DISREGARD ENTRY - REFILED AT 34 STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice . (Gallagher, Matthew) Modified on 8/15/2024 (jwr)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Correction Thu 08/15 3:43 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE re33 Stipulation of Dismissal : Please disregard; Document has been refiled correctly at34 (jwr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2024
32 32 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Tue 06/18 9:43 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE without prejudice by reason of settlement. This CASE is CLOSED. Signed by District Judge Sharion Aycock on 6/18/2024. (tjw)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 17, 2024
31 31 minutes Settlement Conference Tue 06/18 9:14 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Settlement Conference held on 6/17/2024. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Conference Thu 06/06 9:35 AM
NOTICE of Conference: Settlement Conference reset for 6/17/2024 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
29 29 order Protective Order Tue 06/04 9:33 AM
AGREED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 6/4/24. (rrh)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Service Fri 05/24 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Responses to Plaintiff's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents by Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen on behalf of APAC-Mississippi, Inc. to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Notice of Service Fri 05/24 11:57 AM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Answers to Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories by Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen on behalf of APAC-Mississippi, Inc. to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
26 26 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 05/01 2:26 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Anthony Lee Wright by Matthew Gary Gallagher on behalf of APAC-Mississippi, Inc. (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
25 25 discov Notice to Take Deposition Wed 05/01 1:43 PM
NOTICE to Take Deposition of Bobby Bogue/David Farrish/Kayla Holley/Robert Holley/Eric Getz by Yance A. Falkner on behalf of Anthony Lee Wright (Falkner, Yance)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 16, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Service Tue 04/16 4:13 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Yance A. Falkner on behalf of Anthony Lee Wright to Defendant. (Falkner, Yance)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 12, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Service Fri 04/12 6:30 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Responses to Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories and Requests for Production by Yance A. Falkner on behalf of Anthony Lee Wright. (Falkner, Yance)
Related: [-]
22 22 notice Notice of Service Fri 04/12 6:29 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's First Supplemental Core Disclosures by Yance A. Falkner on behalf of Anthony Lee Wright. (Falkner, Yance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 02/29 2:56 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen on behalf of APAC-Mississippi, Inc. (Hansen, Kaitlyn)
Related: [-]
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 02/29 10:04 AM
ORDER granting19 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice; Attorney Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/29/24. (rrh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 28, 2024
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/28 2:12 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice ; Attorney Kaitlyn Abernathy Hansen,(Paid $150 PHV fee; receipt number AMSNDC-2360091) by APAC-Mississippi, Inc.. (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit-Tennessee Certificate of Good Standing
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Service Tue 02/27 3:58 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Requests for Production of Documents to Plaintiff by Matthew Gary Gallagher on behalf of APAC-Mississippi, Inc. to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
17 17 notice Notice of Service Tue 02/27 3:51 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's First Set of Interrogatories to Plaintiff by Matthew Gary Gallagher on behalf of APAC-Mississippi, Inc. to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
16 16 notice Notice of Service Tue 02/27 3:44 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Defendant's Pre-Discovery Disclosures of Core Information by Matthew Gary Gallagher on behalf of APAC-Mississippi, Inc. to Plaintiff's Counsel. (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 26, 2024
15 15 2 pgs order Order Mon 02/26 4:20 PM
ORDER Governing Pretrial Conference and Preparation of Final Pretrial Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/26/24. (rtc)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Conference Mon 02/26 4:18 PM
NOTICE of Conference: Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2025 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. (rtc)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Trial Thu 02/22 4:06 PM
NOTICE of Trial: MVD Jury Trial set for 3/24/2025 09:40 AM in Aberdeen Courtroom 1 before District Judge Sharion Aycock. (tjw)
Related: [-]
12 12 4 pgs order Order Thu 02/22 10:53 AM
ORDER REGARDING Settlement Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/22/24. (bnd)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Case Management Order Thu 02/22 10:46 AM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/24/2025 10:00 AM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Discovery due by 8/22/2024. Amendments/Joinder of Parties due by 3/22/2024. Plaintiffs Designation of Experts due by 5/22/2024. Defendants Designation of Experts due by 6/24/2024. Motions due by 9/12/2024. Settlement Conference set for 8/15/2024 02:00 PM in Judge Percy Chambers before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 2/22/23. (bnd)
Related: [-]
10 10 minutes Case Management Conference Thu 02/22 10:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy: Case Management Conference held on 2/22/2024. (bnd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Service Tue 02/13 1:45 PM
NOTICE OF SERVICE of Plaintiff's Pre-Discovery Disclosure of Core Information by Yance A. Falkner on behalf of Anthony Lee Wright to Defendant. (Falkner, Yance)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
8 8 misc Disclosure Statement Thu 02/01 12:57 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by APAC-Mississippi, Inc. . (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 02/01 12:56 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint by APAC-Mississippi, Inc.. (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
6 6 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 01/03 2:02 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jim D. Waide, III on behalf of Anthony Lee Wright APAC-Mississippi, Inc. served on 12/13/2023. (Waide, Jim)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 26, 2023
5 5 order Initial Order - Rule 16.1 Tue 12/26 1:15 PM
INITIAL ORDER - RULE 16.1 Case Management Conference set for 2/22/2024 10:00 AM in Oxford Tele-Conference before Magistrate Judge Roy Percy. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/26/23. (rtc)
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 12/26 11:44 AM
ORDER granting3 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer. Response due 2/1/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge Roy Percy on 12/26/23. (rrh)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 21, 2023
3 3 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 12/21 4:39 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint by APAC-Mississippi, Inc.. (Gallagher, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 01, 2023
notice Clerk's Notice of Incomplete Process/Past Due Answer Fri 12/01 12:38 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE of Incomplete Process as to APAC-Mississippi, Inc. (jla)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
2 2 service Summons Issued Wed 11/01 3:26 PM
Summons Issued as to APAC-Mississippi, Inc.. Counsel is instructed to download and print for service. (jla)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/01 3:25 PM
COMPLAINT, Jury Demand, Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMSNDC-2316175, filed by Anthony Lee Wright. (jla)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - EEOC Charge,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Right to Sue Letter,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Assignment Wed 11/01 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Aycock and Magistrate Judge Percy. (jla)
Related: [-]