Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Case #: 0:23-cv-62082
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Terminated:Mar 02, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 4:21 AM EDT
Defendant
MARKETPLACE PLAZA, LLC
Represented By
Michael Spoliansky
Phelan Hallinan, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Denise Payne
Represented By
Anthony Joseph Perez
Garcia-Menocal & Perez, Pl
contact info
Alfredo Garcia-Menocal
Garcia-Menocal & Perez P.L.
contact info
Beverly Virues
Garcia-Menocal & Perez P.L.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
LAUDERDALE MARKET PLACE, INC.
Terminated: 02/23/2024


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Monday, April 15, 2024
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Tue 04/16 10:36 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Dismissal with Prejudice [ECF No.30 ]. This case remains CLOSED. All pending deadlines and hearings remain TERMINATED, and any pending motions remain DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 4/15/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
30 30 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Mon 04/15 7:23 AM
JOINT STIPULATION OF FINAL DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE by Denise Payne (Virues, Beverly) Modified text on 4/15/2024 (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
29 29 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 03/29 4:45 PM
ORDER. Joint Notice of Settlement [ECF No.28 ]. This case remains CLOSED without prejudice to the parties to file a stipulation of dismissal on or before May 26, 2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 26, 2024
28 28 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Tue 03/26 3:27 PM
NOTICE of Settlement by Denise Payne (Virues, Beverly)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
27 27 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Wed 03/20 11:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has updated the address and email information as submitted through attorney's PACER account for attorney Anthony Joseph Perez. Attorney selected the option in PACER to apply address change to OPEN cases only. If Attorney wishes to update his address in closed cases, he must return to PACER and select that option. (cw)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 18, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Mon 03/18 2:13 PM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Anthony Joseph Perez (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 02, 2024
25 25 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Sat 03/02 2:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. On March 1, 2024, the parties informed us that they are "very optimistic of finalizing a settlement in [this] case and expect that such a settlement could be finalized within the next thirty days." See 24 Notice of Compliance. Accordingly, we direct the CLERK of COURT to administratively CLOSE this case and TERMINATE all deadlines. By April 2, 2024 , the parties must do one of two things: either file a joint notice of settlement on the docket, or file a joint motion asking us to re-open the case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 3/2/2024. (tbr)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Tue 03/05 10:31 AM
Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. Per DE 25 Order. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Compliance Fri 03/01 4:40 PM
NOTICE of Compliance (Joint) by Denise Payne re 20 Order, (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 02/27 10:29 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alfredo Garcia-Menocal on behalf of Denise Payne. Attorney Alfredo Garcia-Menocal added to party Denise Payne(pty:pla). (Garcia-Menocal, Alfredo)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 23, 2024
22 22 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 02/26 9:35 AM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/5/2024 Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
21 21 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Party Mon 02/26 9:34 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL OF CERTAIN DEFENDANT WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Order Dismissing Party LAUDERDALE MARKET PLACE, INC. (a Florida Corporation) This case otherwise remains OPEN. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/23/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
20 20 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 02/23 9:01 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. As discussed at the February 23, 2024, status conference, see 19 Paperless Minute Entry, we ORDER the parties to do three things by March 1, 2024 : (1) visit the property in question; (2) participate in an informal settlement conference ; and (3) file a joint notice on the docket indicating whether they have settled the case. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/23/2024. (tbr)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Status Conference Fri 02/23 6:14 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Status Conference held on February 23, 2024. Total time in court: 0 hours : 10 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Michael Spoliansky and Beverly Virues. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 305-301-3276 / mjsfcs@aol.com. (tbr)
Related: [-]
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Fri 02/23 1:38 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant LAUDERDALE MARKETPLACE, INC. by Denise Payne (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 12, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Setting/Resetting/Cancelling Hearing Wed 02/14 8:56 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING STATUS CONFERENCES. Status Conference set for 2/23/2024 04:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 2/12/2024. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Tue 01/30 12:54 PM
Plaintiff's NOTICE on Service as to Defendant, LAUDERDALE MARKETPLACE, INC. by Denise Payne re13 Order to Show Cause (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Monday, January 29, 2024
15 15 service Summons Issued Mon 01/29 9:33 AM
Summons Issued as to LAUDERDALE MARKET PLACE, INC. (scn)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) Fri 01/26 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) as to Defendant LAUDERDALE MARKET PLACE, INC. by Denise Payne (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 01, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 01/02 9:41 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Response due by 1/30/2024. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/2/2024. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 28, 2023
12 12 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 11/28 12:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address or email information for attorney Michael Spoliansky re11 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. In submitting his address change through his PACER account, Attorney selected update NONE. This means the address change will not be applied to any cases, open or closed. In addition, Attorney did not submit a request through PACER to update his email address. If Attorney wishes to update his address and email information, Attorney is instructed to return to his PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating his information. See the Court's website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] . (cw)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name Tue 11/28 9:17 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name by Michael Spoliansky (Spoliansky, Michael)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Tue 11/28 12:01 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Spoliansky on behalf of MARKETPLACE PLAZA, LLC (Spoliansky, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 27, 2023
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 11/27 11:59 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by MARKETPLACE PLAZA, LLC. Attorney Michael Spoliansky added to party MARKETPLACE PLAZA, LLC(pty:dft). (Spoliansky, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
8 8 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 11/15 11:06 AM
Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by Denise Payne identifying Other Affiliate Pablo Baez, AccessAble, Other Affiliate Meir Benzaken, Other Affiliate Laura Elena Sandrin-de Casanova, Other Affiliate Cristina Maria Bertorelli-de Sandrin, Other Affiliate Carolina Isabel Sandrin-Bertorelli for Denise Payne (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
7 7 notice Certificate of Counsel Thu 11/09 10:50 AM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re4 Order,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings, by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Denise Payne (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Exhibit A
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 11/09 8:05 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Denise Payne. MARKETPLACE PLAZA, LLC served on 11/6/2023, response/answer due 11/27/2023. (Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 11/03 2:47 PM
ORDER IN CASES WITH MULTIPLE DEFENDANTS. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-]
4 4 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Fri 11/03 2:41 PM
ORDER REQUIRING VERIFIED CERTIFICATE OF COUNSEL REGARDING ANY PRIOR FILINGS UNDER THE AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT AND VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT REGARDING VISITS TO PROPERTY. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiff's counsel shall file a verified response to this Order by November 10, 2023. Related [+] Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 11/2/2023. See attached document for full details. (nan)
Related: [-] sponses due by 11/10/2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Thu 11/02 11:17 AM
Summons Issued as to LAUDERDALE MARKET PLACE, INC., MARKETPLACE PLAZA, LLC. (nan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 11/02 11:08 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jared M. Strauss is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (nan)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 11/01 10:13 PM
COMPLAINT against LAUDERDALE MARKET PLACE, INC., MARKETPLACE PLAZA, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17042057, filed by Denise Payne.(Perez, Anthony)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Summon(s)