Hyttinen, Stuart et al v. The 3M Company et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873
South Carolina District Court | |
Judge: | Richard M Gergel |
Case #: | 2:23-cv-05523 |
Nature of Suit | 240 Real Property - Torts to Land |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Torts to Land |
Case Filed: | Oct 31, 2023 |
Case in other court: | Wisconsin Western, 3:23-cv-00707 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:52 AM EDT |
Defendant
Dupont De Nemours Inc
|
|
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
|
|
Defendant
The Chemours Company
|
|
Defendant
The 3M Company
|
|
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
|
|
Defendant
EI DuPont De Nemours and Company
|
|
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Deepwater Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Corteva Inc
|
|
Defendant
Clariant Corporation
4000 Monroe Road
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Chemicals Inc
|
|
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
One Stanton Street
Marinette, WI 54143 |
|
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
|
|
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
110 Kings Road
Mountain, NC 28086 |
|
Defendant
BASF Corporation
100 Park Avenue
Florham Park, NJ 07932 |
|
Defendant
Arkema Inc
|
|
Defendant
Archroma Management LLC
Archroma Management LLC 4000 Monroe Rd.
Charlotte, NC 28205 |
|
Defendant
Amerex Corporation
|
|
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Americas Inc
55 E. Uwchlan Avenue Suite 201
Exton, PA 19341 |
|
Plaintiff
Stuart Hyttinen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tamara Hyttinen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joye Luick
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Luick
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Johnson Controls International plc
Terminated: 04/03/2024
|
Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 03, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Stuart Hyttinen, Tamara Hyttinen, Joye Luick, Richard Luick, Joy Martens, Ronald Martens, Dale Wetterling, Mary Wetterling Associated Cases: 2:18-mn-02873-RMG, 2:23-cv-05522-RMG, 2:23-cv-05523-RMG, 2:24-cv-00023-RMG, 2:24-cv-00024-RMG(Hannon, Kevin) |
|
Monday, December 18, 2023 | ||
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Tuesday, December 12, 2023 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Stuart Hyttinen, Tamara Hyttinen, Joye Luick, Richard Luick(Hannon, Kevin) |
|
Wednesday, November 01, 2023 | ||
6 | 6
misc
MDL Member Case Opened
Wed 11/01 4:22 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: Wisconsin Western (associated as of 10/31/2023), 3:23-cv-00707, Stuart Hyttinen et al v. The 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:23-cv-05523-RMG (sshe, ) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Case transferred in from District of Wisconsin Western; Case Number 3:23-cv-00707. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, October 31, 2023 | ||
3 | 3
![]() |
|
Friday, October 13, 2023 | ||
2 | 2
![]() |
|
Case directly assigned to District Judge William M. Conley and Magistrate Judge Stephen L. Crocker. Previous case 23cv706 (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 11/1/2023.] | ||
Standard attachments for Judge William M. Conley required to be served on all parties with summons or waiver of service:[LINK:NORTC] ,[LINK:Corporate Disclosure Statement] . (lak) [Transferred from Wisconsin Western on 11/1/2023.] | ||
Thursday, October 12, 2023 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |
||
Att: 12
![]() |
||
Att: 13
![]() |
||
Att: 14
![]() |
||
Att: 15
![]() |
||
Att: 16
![]() |
||
Att: 17
![]() |
||
Att: 18
![]() |
||
Att: 19
![]() |
||
Att: 20
![]() |
||
Att: 21
![]() |
||
Att: 22
![]() |
||
Att: 23
![]() |