Florida Middle District Court
Case #: 8:23-cr-00394
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Terminated:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Nov 02, 2023 3:22 AM EDT
Defendant
Shelly Gallagher (2)
Defendant
Janet Pettyjohn (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Gregory Davis Pizzo
Us Attorney'S Office - Flm
contact info


Docket last updated: 10/10/2024 4:45 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
1 1 11 pgs INDICTMENT returned in open court as to Janet Pettyjohn (1) count(s) 1, 2-22, Shelly Gallagher (2) count(s) 1, 2-10. (AM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Restricted Unredacted Indictment