Virgin Islands District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-00074
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Last checked: Thursday Nov 02, 2023 3:20 AM AST
Defendant
Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone (1)
Represented By
Melanie Lark Turnbull
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Matthew A. Campbell
Office Of The Federal Public Defender
contact info
Defendant
Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III (2)
Represented By
Robert Millan
Millan Law Office
contact info
Carl R Williams
Smithwilliams, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Yasir Sadat
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info
Delia L. Smith
U.S. Attorney
contact info

GPO Jul 23 2024
ORDER (RAM) Defendant Emma Vanessa Dilone's Unopposed Motion to Continue Trial, ECF68, is GRANTED. The Jury Selection and Trial in this matter previously scheduled for August 12, 2024, are CONTINUED to commence promptly at 9:00 A.M. on December 9, 2024, in St. Thomas Courtroom 1. The parties SHALL adhere to the deadlines set forth in this Order. (SZ)
GPO Nov 19 2024
ORDER (RAM) Defendant Pedro Negron Rodriguez III's Motion for Continuance of Trial, ECF104, is GRANTED. The time beginning from the date of this order granting an extension through February 24, 2025, shall be excluded in computing the time within which the trial in this matter must be initiated pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161. The parties SHALL adhere to the deadlines set forth in this Order. The Jury Selection and Trial in this matter previously scheduled for December 9, 2024, are CONTINUED to commence promptly at 9:00 A.M. on February 24, 2025, in St. Thomas Courtroom 1. (SZ)ORDER (RAM) Defendant Pedro Negron Rodriguez III's Motion for Continuance of Trial, ECF104, is GRANTED. The time beginning from the date of this order granting an extension through February 24, 2025, shall be excluded in computing the time within which the trial in this matter must be initiated pursuant to 18 U.S.C. § 3161. The parties SHALL adhere to the deadlines set forth in this Order. The Jury Selection and Trial in this matter previously scheduled for December 9, 2024, are CONTINUED to commence promptly at 9:00 A.M. on February 24, 2025, in St. Thomas Courtroom 1. (SZ)

Docket last updated: 11/02/2023 3:37 AM AST
Monday, October 02, 2023
1 1 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller:Initial Appearance as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III held on 10/2/2023 (Court Reporter FTR GOLD RECORDER.) (Interpreter Adoracion Miller present.) (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
2 2 COMPLAINT as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone (1), Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III (2). (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
3 3 ORDER (RM) APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone Matthew A. Campbell for Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone appointed. (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER (RM) APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL as to Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III Robert Millan for Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III appointed. (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER (RM) as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
6 6 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III Detention Hearing set for 10/3/2023 03:30 PM in STT Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. Preliminary Examination set for 10/3/2023 03:30 PM in STT Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
7 7 MOTION To Allow Third-Party Custodian Appearance Via Videoconference -Unopposed by Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Turnbull, Melanie) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Melanie Lark Turnbull appearing for Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone (Turnbull, Melanie) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 03, 2023
9 9 ORDER (RM) granting7 unopposed Motion for proposed third party custodian to appear by video conference as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone (1). Conference link will be provided to counsel via email.(This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
10 10 MOTION for Detention or, in the alternative, set conditions of bail by USA as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III. Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (Payne, Kyle) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller:Preliminary Examination as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III held on 10/3/2023, Detention Hearing as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III held on 10/3/2023 (Court Reporter FTR GOLD RECORDER.) (Interpreter Laura Garcia Hein (TIP SPANISH) present.) (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER (RM) Setting Conditions of Release (TRH) (Main Document 12 replaced on 10/4/2023) (TRH). [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
13 13 RELEASED ON BOND (APPEARANCE BOND unsecured $25,000.00) as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER (RM) Setting Conditions of Release (TRH) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
15 15 RELEASED ON BOND (APPEARANCE BOND unsecured $25,000.00) as to Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III (TRH) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/4/2023) (TRH). [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 04, 2023
16 16 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Carl R Williams appearing for Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III (Williams, Carl) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
17 17 NOTICE of Filing by Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone (Turnbull, Melanie) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement
Friday, October 13, 2023
18 18 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Yasir Sadat appearing for USA. (Sadat, Yasir) [3:23-mj-00078-RAM-RM]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
19 19 INFORMATION as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone (1) count(s) 1, 2, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III (2) count(s) 1, 2. (TRH)
Related: [-]
20 20 NOTICE OF HEARING as to Emma Vanessa Mueses Dilone, Pedro Miguel Negron Rodriguez III Arraignment set for 11/15/2023 09:30 AM in STT Courtroom 2 before US Magistrate Judge Ruth Miller. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (TRH)
Related: [-]