Louisiana Eastern District Court
Judge:Susie Morgan
Referred: Janis Van Meerveld
Case #: 2:23-cv-06640
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Insurance Contract
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2023
Terminated:Jan 26, 2024
Case in other court:21st JDC, Tangipahoa Parish, 23-0003217 Div. A
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 30, 2024 3:28 AM CDT
Defendant
Mt. Hawley Insurance Company
Represented By
Julie Schwartzwald Meaders
Fishman Haygood LLP
contact info
Seth Andrew Schmeeckle
Lugenbuhl, Wheaton, Peck, Rankin & Hubbard (new Orleans)
contact info
Interested Party
Hurricane Ida Program Administrator
Represented By
Francis Joseph Lobrano
Carver, Darden, Koretzky, Tessier, Finn, Blossman & Areaux
contact info
Plaintiff
Carter's Loop Apartments, LLC
Represented By
John Mark Fezio
Pandit Law Firm
contact info
Peter Newton Freiberg
Pandit Law Firm
contact info
Matthew M. Mize
Robichaux, Mize, Wadsack & Richardson, LLC
contact info
Rajan Pandit
Pandit Law Firm, Llc (new Orleans)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 21 pgs order Order Thu 01/16 1:28 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS: ORDER Regarding Settlement of Former MMA Cases. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/19/2024.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
12 12 misc Receipt Fri 02/02 11:22 AM
Receipt of Transfer Case to the Southern District of New York (my)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
11 11 order Case Transferred Out - District Fri 01/26 1:48 PM
ORDER GRANTING10 MOTION to Transfer Venue. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that this case is hereby transferred to the Southern District of New York. Signed by Judge Susie Morgan on 1/26/2024.(pp)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
10 10 motion Transfer Case Tue 01/02 12:58 PM
MOTION to Transfer Case Venue by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company. Motion(s) will be submitted on 1/31/2024.(Meaders, Julie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support,
Att: 2 Proposed Order,
Att: 3 Notice of Submission,
Att: 4 Exhibit A Certified Policy,
Att: 5 Exhibit B In re Mt Hawley Insurance Company,
Att: 6 Exhibit C Starlight Studios,
Att: 7 Exhibit D Brown's Village Plaza,
Att: 8 Exhibit E Brooks & Brooks,
Att: 9 Exhibit F SR Hospitality,
Att: 10 Exhibit G Canal@Camp,
Att: 11 Exhibit H Esplanade 2018 Partners,
Att: 12 Exhibit I Domingue,
Att: 13 Exhibit J William B. Coleman, Inc.,
Att: 14 Exhibit K Burk Holding,
Att: 15 Exhibit L UMMIID,
Att: 16 Exhibit M SR Hospitality,
Att: 17 Exhibit N Storm Damage Solutions,
Att: 18 Exhibit O Capital One First Management,
Att: 19 Exhibit P Valdes,
Att: 20 Exhibit Q Krishiv,
Att: 21 Exhibit R Smith,
Att: 22 Exhibit S Ninora,
Att: 23 Exhibit T Recovery Performance,
Att: 24 Exhibit U 421 NW 12 St,
Att: 25 Exhibit V Oasis Beauty,
Att: 26 Exhibit W La Teresita,
Att: 27 Exhibit X Murray Hill Presbyterian,
Att: 28 Exhibit Y Storm Damage Solutions,
Att: 29 Exhibit Z Summerwind,
Att: 30 Exhibit AA Doral City,
Att: 31 Exhibit BB Pinto,
Att: 32 Exhibit CC New Hope Missionary Baptist Church,
Att: 33 Exhibit DD US Rubber,
Att: 34 Exhibit EE Davilyn,
Att: 35 Exhibit FF La Porte,
Att: 36 Exhibit GG Amusam
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint - Notice of Removal Tue 01/02 12:46 PM
ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal, and Affirmative Defenses by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.(Meaders, Julie)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 27, 2023
8 8 30+ pgs order Order Wed 12/27 12:04 PM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Fourth Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 12/12/2023.(lag)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order of Recusal Fri 11/03 11:46 AM
ORDER OF RECUSAL. IT IS ORDERED that the Clerk of Court reallot this matter to another Section of this Court. Judge Wendy B Vitter recused. Case reassigned to Judge Susie Morgan. Signed by Judge Wendy B Vitter on 11/3/2023.(mmv) (NEF: J. Morgan, Case Mgr.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
6 6 1 pgs order Order Thu 11/02 10:37 AM
DIRECTIVE PURSUANT TO 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) re1 Notice of Removal. By Clerk.(mmv)
Related: [-]
5 5 30+ pgs order Order Thu 11/02 10:32 AM
HURRICANE IDA CLAIMS Third Amendment to CMO No. 1. Signed by Chief Judge Nannette Jolivette Brown on 9/14/2023.(mmv)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Initial Case Assignment Thu 11/02 10:01 AM
Initial Case Assignment to Judge Wendy B Vitter and Magistrate Judge Janis van Meerveld. (mb)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Statement of Corporate Disclosure Thu 11/02 9:40 AM
Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Black Rock, Inc., Corporate Parent Vanguard Group, Inc., Corporate Parent RLI Corp., Corporate Parent RLI Insurance Company, Corporate Parent State Street Corporation for Mt. Hawley Insurance Company (Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 11/2/2023 (mmv)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice (Other) Thu 11/02 9:38 AM
Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company Diversity Jurisdiction . (Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 11/2/2023 (mmv)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Thu 11/02 9:37 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from 21st JDC, Tangipahoa Parish, case number 23-0003217 Div. A (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ALAEDC-10251956) filed by Mt. Hawley Insurance Company.Attorney Julie Schwartzwald Meaders added to party Mt. Hawley Insurance Company(pty:dft).(Meaders, Julie) Modified text on 11/2/2023 (mmv)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Certified Copy of State Court Record,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Notice to State Court,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Listing and Notice of Compliance