Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Case #: 0:23-cv-62092
Nature of Suit950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes
Cause28:2201 Constitutionality of State Statute(s)
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2023
Terminated:Dec 04, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 30, 2024 4:24 AM EDT
Defendant
Broward County
Defendant
Allison Carden Sackett
Florida Office of the State Courts Administrator Florida Office of the State Courts 500 South Duval Street
Tallahassee, FL 32399
Defendant
Ann Coffin
Florida Department of Revenue 5050 West Tennessee Street
Tallahassee, FL 32399
Defendant
Abby Cynamon
Lawson E Thomas Courthouse 175 NW 1st Ave Section FC 8
Miami, FL 33128
Defendant
Katherine Fernandez Rundle
Miami Dade State Attorney Office of the Attorney General 1350 NW 12th Ave
Miami, FL 33136
Defendant
Florida Department of Revenue Child Support Department
Defendant
Wiltrice Davay Jackson
Defendant
Miami Dade County
Defendant
Pascal Michel-Esquire
14 NE 1st Ave Suite 600
Miami, FL 33132
Defendant
Eric Swenson
2601 West Broward Blvd.
Ft. Lauderdale, FL 33312
Defendant
Sheriff Gregory Tony
Broward Sheriff's Office 2601 West Broward Boulevard
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33312
Defendant
Joanna Maria Veloz
Assistant Attorney Florida Department of Revenue, Child Support Program 601 NW 1st Court 12th Floor
Miami, FL 33136
Defendant
Jim Zingales
5050 West Tennessee Street
Tallahassee, FL 32399
Plaintiff
Antonio Tavaris Brown
3600 Estate Oak Circle
Ft Lauderdale, FL 33312


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Monday, December 04, 2023
8 8 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 12/04 10:04 AM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case (Without Prejudice). Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/4/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 18, 2023
7 7 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Sat 11/18 2:12 PM
ORDER dismissing1 Complaint filed by Antonio Tavaris Brown; Amended Complaint due by 11/30/2023. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/18/2023. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 15, 2023
6 6 24 pgs misc Memorandum Wed 11/15 2:30 PM
Constitutional Memorandum of Law in Support for the Bill of Equity re1 Complaint by Antonio Tavaris Brown. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
5 5 misc Consent to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Thu 11/09 3:06 PM
ESTOPPEL TO DECLINE TO PROCEED BEFORE A UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION. Filed by Antonio Tavaris Brown. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
4 4 service Certificate of Service Mon 11/06 9:59 AM
VERIFIED AFFIDAVIT OF DELIVERY by Antonio Tavaris Brown re1 Complaint. (ebz)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
3 3 misc Clerk's Receipt (combines Filing Fee and Partial Filing Fee) Fri 11/03 11:28 AM
Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 11/2/2023 in the amount of $ 402.00, receipt number 17566. (ebz)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Thu 11/02 4:18 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/02 4:17 PM
COMPLAINT against Broward County, Miami Dade County. Filing fees $ 402.00 (DUE), filed by Antonio Tavaris Brown.(pc)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet