New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 7:23-cv-09685
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 30, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
CleanChoice Energy, Inc.
1055 Thomas Jefferson St. NW
Washington, D.C., DC 20007
Represented By
Michael D Matthews, Jr
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Diane S. Wizig
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Louise Root
Mcdowell Hetherington LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Joanne Sudakow
Represented By
J. Burkett McInturff
Wittels Mcinturff Palikovic
contact info
Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP
contact info
Erin Kelley
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Brenner
Wittels Mcinturff Palikovic
contact info
Plaintiff
Robert Sudakow
Represented By
J. Burkett McInturff
Wittels Mcinturff Palikovic
contact info
Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP
contact info
Erin Kelley
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Brenner
Wittels Mcinturff Palikovic
contact info
Plaintiff
Eric Weinberg
Represented By
J. Burkett McInturff
Wittels Mcinturff Palikovic
contact info
Douglas Gregory Blankinship
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber, LLP
contact info
Erin Kelley
Finkelstein, Blankinship, Frei-Pearson & Garber LLP
contact info
Daniel J. Brenner
Wittels Mcinturff Palikovic
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
43 43 appeal Notice of Appeal Wed 07/24 3:38 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL from42 Memorandum & Opinion,,,,,,,,. Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc.. Filing fee $ 605.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29650972. Form C and Form D are due within 14 days to the Court of Appeals, Second Circuit..(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Wed 07/24 4:25 PM
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Certified Copy of Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re:43 Notice of Appeal.(km)
Related: [-]
appeal Appeal Record Sent to USCA - Electronic File Wed 07/24 4:26 PM
Appeal Record Sent to USCA (Electronic File). Certified Indexed record on Appeal Electronic Files for43 Notice of Appeal, filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc. were transmitted to the U.S. Court of Appeals. (km)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
42 42 25 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 07/17 3:08 PM
OPINION AND ORDER re:39 MOTION to Dismiss . filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc.,18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc. For the foregoing reasons, the Court GRANTS Defendants motion to compel arbitration with respect to Plaintiff Eric Weinberg and DENIES the motion to compel arbitration with respect to Plaintiffs Robert Sudakow and Joanne Sudakow. Mr. Weinbergs claims are STAYED pending the conclusion of the arbitration proceedings. The Court GRANTS Defendants motion to dismiss Plaintiff Robert Sudakow for lack of standing under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1). The Court GRANTS Defendant's motion to dismiss the request for injunctive relief under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(1) on consent. The Court DENIES Defendants motion to dismiss for improper venue under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(3). The Court GRANTS Defendants motion to dismiss for failure to state a claim under Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(b)(6) with respect to the seventh (unjust enrichment) claim against Plaintiff Joanne Sudakow and DENIES the motion with respect to Plaintiff Joanne Sudakows first (breach of contract), second (breach of the implied covenant of good faith and fair dealing), third (violation of N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law § 349), fourth (violation of N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law § 349-d(3)), fifth (violation of N.Y. Gen. Bus. Law § 349-d(7)), and sixth (violation of state consumer protection statutes) claims for relief. The following claims shall proceed to discovery with respect to Plaintiff Joanne Sudakow: the first, second, third, fourth, fifth, and sixth claims for relief. Defendant shall file its Answer to the Complaint within ten (10) days of the issuance of this Opinion & Order. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate Plaintiff Robert Sudakow as a party to this action and terminate the motions pending at Doc. 18 and Doc. 39. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 7/17/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 15, 2024
41 41 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Wed 05/15 7:17 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:39 MOTION to Dismiss . . Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
40 40 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Wed 05/15 7:15 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:39 MOTION to Dismiss . Plaintiffs' Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss . Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
39 39 35 pgs motion Dismiss Wed 05/15 7:11 PM
MOTION to Dismiss . Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Defendant CleanChoice Energy Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss
Friday, April 12, 2024
38 38 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Fri 04/12 5:09 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (authorized sur-reply, see ECF No. 35) . Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 29, 2024
37 37 misc Transcript Fri 03/29 3:44 PM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings re: Pre-motion conference held on 2/26/2024 before Judge Philip M. Halpern. Court Reporter/Transcriber: Darby Ginsberg, (914) 390-4102. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/19/2024. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 4/29/2024. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 6/27/2024..(Ginsberg, Darby)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Notice of Filing Transcript Fri 03/29 3:43 PM
NOTICE OF FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a Pre-motion conference proceeding held on 2/226/2024 has been filed by the court reporter/transcriber in the above-captioned matter. The parties have seven (7) calendar days to file with the court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. If no such Notice is filed, the transcript may be made remotely electronically available to the public without redaction after 90 calendar days....(Ginsberg, Darby)
Related: [-]
35 35 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 03/29 3:30 PM
ORDER granting32 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Plaintiffs are granted leave to file a sur-reply to Defendant's reply in support of the motion to compel arbitration (Doc. 31). Plaintiffs shall file their sur-reply by April 12, 2024. The Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to terminate the motion pending at Doc. 32. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/29/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/29 3:30 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Surreplies due by 4/12/2024. (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 28, 2024
34 34 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Thu 03/28 6:49 PM
LETTER RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael D. Matthews, Jr. dated March 28, 2024 re:32 LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply or to Strike New Evidence and Arguments from Defendant's Reply 31 addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from J. Burkett McInturff dated March 21, 2024. . Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 22, 2024
33 33 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Document Fri 03/22 11:36 AM
ORDER with respect to32 Letter Motion for Leave to File Document. Defendant is directed to file a response, by March 28, 2024, to Plaintiffs' March 21, 2024 letter motion (Doc. 32) seeking to strike portions of Defendant's reply in support of their motion to compel arbitration or for leave to file a sur-reply. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 3/22/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 03/22 11:37 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses due by 3/28/2024 (jca)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 21, 2024
32 32 motion Leave to File Document Thu 03/21 11:22 AM
LETTER MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply or to Strike New Evidence and Arguments from Defendant's Reply 31 addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from J. Burkett McInturff dated March 21, 2024. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 29, 2024
31 31 respm Reply Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Thu 02/29 7:20 PM
REPLY MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Exhibit B-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit B-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit B-3,
Att: 5 Exhibit B-4,
Att: 6 Exhibit B-5,
Att: 7 Exhibit B-6,
Att: 8 Exhibit B-7,
Att: 9 Exhibit B-8,
Att: 10 Exhibit B-9,
Att: 11 Exhibit B-10,
Att: 12 Exhibit B-11,
Att: 13 Exhibit B-12,
Att: 14 Exhibit B-13,
Att: 15 Exhibit C,
Att: 16 Exhibit C-1,
Att: 17 Exhibit C-2,
Att: 18 Exhibit C-3
Monday, February 26, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 02/26 9:33 AM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Erin Kelley on behalf of Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(Kelley, Erin)
Related: [-]
minutes Pre-Motion Conference Mon 02/26 12:52 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Philip M. Halpern: Pre-Motion Conference held on 2/26/2024. Counsel for all parties appeared by telephone. The Court granted defendant leave to move to dismiss and set the following briefing schedule: motion to dismiss shall be served, not filed, on 4/3/2024; opposition shall be served, not filed, on 5/1/2024; reply shall be served on 5/15/2024; and all papers shall be filed on the reply date, 5/15/2024. (Court Reporter AT&T teleconference) (mf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
29 29 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/15 10:54 PM
DECLARATION of J. Burkett McInturff in Opposition re:18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
28 28 respm Declaration in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/15 10:53 PM
DECLARATION of Robert Sudakow in Opposition re:18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration .. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
27 27 30+ pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Opposition to Motion Thu 02/15 10:53 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re:18 MOTION to Compel Arbitration . . Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 01, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Adjourn Conference Thu 02/01 4:36 PM
ORDER granting25 Letter Motion to Adjourn Conference. Application granted. The telephonic pre-motion conference scheduled for February 8, 2024 is adjourned to February 26, 2024 at 11:30 a.m. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. Telephone Conference set for 2/26/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Philip M. Halpern.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 2/1/2024) (rro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
25 25 motion Adjourn Conference Wed 01/31 12:08 PM
LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from D. Greg Blankinship dated January 31, 2024. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(Blankinship, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 30, 2024
24 24 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 01/30 6:34 PM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re23 LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from J. Burkett McInturff dated January 29, 2024. Application granted. Plaintiffs shall file their opposition to the motion to compel arbitration on February 15, 2024 and Defendant shall file its reply on February 29, 2024. The Court will not grant any further extension requests to this briefing schedule. SO ORDERED. Responses due by 2/15/2024 Replies due by 2/29/2024.. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 1/30/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 29, 2024
23 23 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Mon 01/29 3:57 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply To Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration (Unopposed) addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from J. Burkett McInturff dated January 29, 2024. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
22 22 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 01/29 3:42 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting21 MOTION for Louise B. Root to Appear Pro Hac Vice. The motion of Louise B. Root, for admission to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above captioned action is granted. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 1/29/2024) (jca)
Related: [-]
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 01/29 9:19 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 21 MOTION for Louise B. Root to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+]. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (laq)
Related: [-] ceipt Number ANYSDC-28866999
Friday, January 26, 2024
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/26 5:14 PM
MOTION for Louise B. Root to Appear Pro Hac Vice Related [+] . Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Root, Louise)
Related: [-] ceipt Number ANYSDC-28866999
Att: 1 Affidavit of Louise B. Root,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing,
Att: 3 Proposed Order Order
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
20 20 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 01/23 6:38 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting19 Motion for Diane S. Wizig to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 1/23/2024) (vfr)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
19 19 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 01/19 1:56 PM
MOTION for Diane S. Wizig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28833429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Wizig, Diane)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit of Diane S. Wizig,
Att: 2 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Georgia,
Att: 3 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing - Supreme Court of Texas,
Att: 4 Proposed Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice
misc Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion Fri 01/19 2:52 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 19 MOTION for Diane S. Wizig to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-28833429. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 18, 2024
18 18 motion Compel Arbitration Thu 01/18 7:45 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit A-1,
Att: 3 Exhibit A-2,
Att: 4 Exhibit A-3,
Att: 5 Exhibit A-4,
Att: 6 Proposed Order Granting Motion to Compel Arbitration
Sunday, January 14, 2024
17 17 6 pgs order Order on Motion for Conference Tue 01/16 10:07 AM
ORDER granting11 Letter Motion for Conference re:11 LETTER MOTION for Conference on CleanChoice's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael D. Matthews, Jr. dated January 3, 2024. Application granted for a pre-motion conference on Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss is granted. The Court will hold a telephonic pre-motion conference on Defendants' anticipated motion to dismiss on February 8, 2024 at 4:00 p.m. At the time of the scheduled conference, all parties shall call the following number: (888) 398-2342; access code 3456831. SO ORDERED. ( Telephone Conference set for 2/8/2024 at 04:00 PM before Judge Philip M. Halpern.) (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 1/12/24) (yv)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 12, 2024
16 16 6 pgs respm Response to Motion Fri 01/12 12:36 PM
LETTER RESPONSE to Motion addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from D. Greg Blankinship dated January 12, 2024 re:11 LETTER MOTION for Conference on CleanChoice's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael D. Matthews, Jr. dated January 3, 2024. . Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(Blankinship, Douglas)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
15 15 order Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 01/11 11:33 AM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:13 Letter filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc., ENDORSEMENT: Defendant's application for a stay of the motion to dismiss briefing is denied. Plaintiffs are directed to file a letter in response to Defendant's pre-motion letter regarding its anticipated motion to dismiss (Doc. 11) by January 12, 2024. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 1/11/2024) ( Responses due by 1/12/2204) (ks)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 09, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Tue 01/09 9:51 AM
LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from J. Burkett McInturff dated January 9, 2024 re: Scheduling of Initial Conference. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
13 13 misc Letter Mon 01/08 5:14 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael D. Matthews, Jr. dated January 8, 2024 re: Plaintiffs' Letter Requesting Initial Conference. Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Letter Mon 01/08 3:51 PM
LETTER addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from J. Burkett McInturff dated January 8, 2024 re: Scheduling of Initial Conference. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 03, 2024
11 11 motion Conference Wed 01/03 12:53 PM
LETTER MOTION for Conference on CleanChoice's Motion to Dismiss addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael D. Matthews, Jr. dated January 3, 2024. Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 30, 2023
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Thu 11/30 6:26 PM
ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time. Application granted. The deadline for Defendant to file its pre-motion letter is extended to January 3, 2024. The deadline for Plaintiffs to file their response to Defendant's pre-motion letter is extended to January 11, 2024. No further extension requests to this deadline will be granted. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Philip M. Halpern on 11/30/2023) (jca)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
9 9 motion Extension of Time Wed 11/29 5:49 PM
CONSENT LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time for Pre-Motion Letter Schedule addressed to Judge Philip M. Halpern from Michael D. Matthews, Jr. dated 11/29/2023. Document filed by CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(Matthews, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 16, 2023
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/16 2:19 PM
SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. Service was accepted by Jennifer Spinosa, General Counsel. Document filed by Eric Weinberg, Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow..(Blankinship, Douglas)
Related: [-]
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 11/16 2:03 PM
FILING ERROR - DEFICIENT DOCKET ENTRY - (SEE DOCUMENT#8) SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED Summons and Complaint served. CleanChoice Energy, Inc. served on 11/6/2023, answer due 11/27/2023. Service was accepted by Jennifer Spinosa, General Counsel. Document filed by Eric Weinberg; Joanne Sudakow; Robert Sudakow..(Garber, Todd) Modified on 11/16/2023 (lb)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 11/03 12:59 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Douglas Gregory Blankinship on behalf of Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(Blankinship, Douglas)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Fri 11/03 11:10 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to CleanChoice Energy, Inc...(jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 11/03 11:04 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney J. Burkett McInturff. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Cause of Action code 28:1453;. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Cause of Action code has been modified to 28:1332;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 11/03 11:06 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney J. Burkett McInturff. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Eric Weinberg; Robert Sudakow; Joanne Sudakow. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: party text was omitted;. (jgo)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 11/03 11:07 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Philip M. Halpern. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 11/03 11:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Judith C. McCarthy is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 11/03 11:09 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 11/02 6:47 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Daniel J. Brenner on behalf of Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(Brenner, Daniel)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Request for Issuance of Summons Thu 11/02 6:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to CleanChoice Energy, Inc., re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow, Eric Weinberg..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Thu 11/02 6:38 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
1 1 64 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 11/02 6:35 PM
COMPLAINT against CleanChoice Energy, Inc.. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28518032)Document filed by Eric Weinberg, Joanne Sudakow, Robert Sudakow..(McInturff, J. Burkett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Marketing Materials