Pennsylvania Western District Court
Judge:Mark R Hornak
Case #: 2:23-cv-01897
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Oct 31, 2023
Terminated:Nov 03, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Apr 28, 2024 4:39 AM EDT
Defendant
CARLA BOYD
Defendant
INDIANA COUNTY
Defendant
INDIANA SHERIFFS DEPARTMENT
Defendant
JUDGE GINA R JOYCE
Defendant
DET. MICHAEL SCHMIDT
Plaintiff
HIPPIETOWN, LLC
2104 Chalfant St.
Pittsburgh, PA 15221


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Friday, November 03, 2023
3 3 utility Remark Fri 11/03 12:07 PM
Remark: A copy of2 Memorandum Order and ECF filing receipt filed on 11/3/23 were mailed via regular mail to Joshua Boone 11/3/23. Text-only entry. No PDF document will issue. This text-only entry constitutes the Order of the Court or Notice on the matter. (jad)
Related: [-]
2 2 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 11/03 11:44 AM
MEMORANDUM ORDER. For the reasons as set forth herein, For the reasons as set forth herein, this matter is hereby DISMISSED with prejudice as duplicative of the substance of the filing at 23-cv-1895, and any Amended Complaint or other documents shall be filed at 23-cv-1895 only.Any legally-conforming Amended Complaint shall be filed at 23-cv-1895 on or before November 30, 2023. Should such not occur, then the dismissal without prejudice at 23-cv-1895 shall become a dismissal with prejudice without further notice or Order. Signed by Chief Judge Mark R. Hornak on 11/3/23. (jad)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
1 1 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 11/02 1:04 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by HIPPIETOWN, LLC. (ept)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Complaint lodged pending disposition of IFP Motion,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet