Georgia Northern District Court
Judge:Victoria M Calvert
Case #: 1:23-cv-05037
Nature of Suit110 Contract - Insurance
Cause28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance)
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Terminated:Mar 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Apr 29, 2024 4:28 AM EDT
Defendant
Atlanta Orthopaedic Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Virtual Spine Centers of America, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Savannah, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Macon, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Columbus, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Augusta, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Atlanta West, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Atlanta Surgery Center, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Atlanta South, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Atlanta Rehabilitation & Welnnes Center, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Atlanta North, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Atlanta East, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Spine Center Athens, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ngan Mai Pham, M.D.
Represented By
Spencer Armpstead Bomar
Mcgrew Miller Bomar & Bagley, LLC
contact info
Wayne Dale McGrew, III
Mcgrew Miller Bomar & Bagley LLC
contact info
Defendant
Palisades Imaging, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Orthopaedic & Spine Surgery of Atlanta, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ortho Stem Cell Savannah, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ortho Stem Cell Atlanta, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
My Care Pax, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Integrative Wellness Atlanta, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Georgia Occ Med, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Endo Spine USA, LLC
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jerry Davis
Represented By
Alexandria Elizabeth Seay
Bird Law Group
contact info
Rishi D. Pattni
Bird Law Group
contact info
John W. Crongeyer
Crongeyer Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Eleanor Davis
Represented By
Alexandria Elizabeth Seay
Bird Law Group
contact info
Rishi D. Pattni
Bird Law Group
contact info
John W. Crongeyer
Crongeyer Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Defendant
James L. Chappuis, M.D.
Represented By
Juan Sebastian Patino Bravo
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Robert J Kaufman
Chalmers, Adams, Backer & Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Professional Solutions Insurance Company
Represented By
Robert Michael Ethridge
Ethridge Law Group, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
32 32 misc Judgment - Clerk Tue 03/04 12:01 PM
AMENDED CLERK'S JUDGMENT. It is Ordered and Adjudged that Plaintiff has no duty to defend or indemnify Dr. Chappuis and Orthopedic & Spine Surgery with respect to the claims against them in the Underlying Action. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
31 31 misc Judgment - Clerk Mon 03/03 12:52 PM
CLERK'S JUDGMENT. It is Ordered and Adjudged that judgment is entered in favor of Plaintiff. (jbu)
Related: [-]
30 30 12 pgs order Order on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 03/03 12:17 PM
ORDER granting19 Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/3/2025. (jbu)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 03/03 12:19 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (jbu)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
29 29 notice Notice (Other) Thu 01/23 2:59 PM
NOTICE by James L. Chappuis, MD of Defendants Bankruptcy Dismissals (Patino Bravo, Juan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
28 28 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 07/31 4:02 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record of Atlanta Orthopaedic Surgery Center, LLC by Atlanta Orthopaedic Surgery Center, LLC. (Patino Bravo, Juan)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 07/31 4:00 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record of James L Chppuis, MD, PC. by James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C.. (Patino Bravo, Juan)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 07/31 3:59 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record of Envision Orthopedics and Spine f/k/a Orthopaedic & Spine Surgery of Atlanta, LLC by Orthopaedic & Spine Surgery of Atlanta, LLC. (Patino Bravo, Juan)
Related: [-]
25 25 misc Suggestion of Bankruptcy Wed 07/31 2:57 PM
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY Upon the Record of James L Chppuis, MD by James L. Chappuis, MD. (Patino Bravo, Juan)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
utility Submission to District Judge Mon 06/10 11:39 AM
Submission of19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , to District Judge Victoria M. Calvert. (vs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
24 24 misc Leave of Absence Tue 06/04 12:48 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 27, July 28, July 29, July 30, July 31, August 1, August 2, August 3, August 4, August 5, August 6, August 7, August 8, August 9,August 10, August 11, August 12,August 13,August 14,August 15,August 16,August 17,August 18,August 19,August 20, by Robert J Kaufman. (Kaufman, Robert)
Related: [-]
23 23 misc Leave of Absence Tue 06/04 12:18 PM
Request for Leave of Absence for the following date(s): July 27, July 28, July 29, July 30, July 31, August 1, August 2, August 3, August 4, August 5, August 6, August 7, August 8, August 9,August 10, August 11, August 12,August 13,August 14,August 15,August 16,August 17,August 18,August 19,August 20, by Robert J Kaufman. (Kaufman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 06, 2024
22 22 respm Reply to Response to Motion Mon 05/06 11:42 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendants filed by Professional Solutions Insurance Company. (Ethridge, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 01, 2024
21 21 respm Response to Motion Wed 05/01 5:09 PM
RESPONSE re19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Eleanor Davis, Jerry Davis. (Seay, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 22, 2024
20 20 respm Response to Motion Mon 04/22 9:09 PM
RESPONSE re19 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by James L. Chappuis, MD.(Patino Bravo, Juan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Dr. Chappuis
Monday, April 08, 2024
19 19 motion Judgment on the Pleadings Mon 04/08 1:44 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings with Brief In Support by Professional Solutions Insurance Company.(Ethridge, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memo in Support
Wednesday, March 20, 2024
18 18 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Wed 03/20 3:52 PM
ORDER DENYING15 Motion to Stay. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 3/20/2024. (nmb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, March 05, 2024
17 17 discov Initial Disclosures Tue 03/05 3:38 PM
Initial Disclosures by James L. Chappuis, MD.(Patino Bravo, Juan)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 01, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 03/01 1:18 PM
Defendant Davis ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Eleanor Davis, Jerry Davis.(Seay, Alexandria)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
15 15 motion Stay Tue 02/13 10:26 AM
MOTION to Stay with Brief In Support by Professional Solutions Insurance Company.(Ethridge, Robert)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief Memo in Support of Mtn. to Stay
Friday, February 02, 2024
14 14 service Acknowledgment of Service Fri 02/02 1:12 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Professional Solutions Insurance Company. Eleanor Davis served on 2/2/2024; Jerry Davis served on 2/2/2024. (Ethridge, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 23, 2024
13 13 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/23 1:34 PM
Certificate of Interested Persons by Ngan Mai Pham, MD. (McGrew, Wayne)
Related: [-]
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/23 1:31 PM
ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Ngan Mai Pham, MD.(McGrew, Wayne)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 19, 2024
11 11 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 01/19 4:48 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Eleanor Davis. (dnb)
Related: [-]
10 10 service Electronic Summons Issued Fri 01/19 4:48 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Jerry Davis. (dnb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
9 9 service Proposed Summons Tue 01/16 3:50 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Professional Solutions Insurance Company re: Defendants Eleanor and Jerry Davis (Ethridge, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 02, 2024
8 8 service Acknowledgment of Service Tue 01/02 2:36 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE Executed filed by Professional Solutions Insurance Company. Ngan Mai Pham, MD served on 1/2/2024. (Ethridge, Robert)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 08, 2023
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 12/08 2:50 PM
Spine Center Defendants ANSWER to1 COMPLAINT by Atlanta Orthopaedic Surgery Center, LLC, James L. Chappuis, MD, James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C., Endo Spine USA, LLC, Georgia Occ Med, LLC, Integrative Wellness Atlanta, LLC, My Care Pax, LLC, Ortho Stem Cell Atlanta, LLC, Ortho Stem Cell Savannah, LLC, Orthopaedic & Spine Surgery of Atlanta, LLC, Palisades Imaging, LLC, Spine Center Athens, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta East, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta North, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta Rehabilitation & Welnnes Center, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta South, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta Surgery Center, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta West, LLC, Spine Center Augusta, LLC, Spine Center Columbus, LLC, Spine Center Macon, LLC, Spine Center Savannah, LLC, Virtual Spine Centers of America, LLC. Discovery ends on 5/6/2024.(Kaufman, Robert)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
6 6 30+ pgs order Order Tue 11/14 11:20 AM
STANDING ORDER: GUIDELINES TO PARTIES AND COUNSEL IN CASES PROCEEDING BEFORETHE HONORABLE VICTORIA M. CALVERT. Signed by Judge Victoria M. Calvert on 11/14/23. (vs)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
5 5 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Tue 11/14 10:34 AM
ORDER DECLINING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Victoria M. Calvert for all further proceedings. Judge Amy Totenberg no longer assigned to case. NOTICE TO ALL COUNSEL OF RECORD: The Judge designation in the civil action number assigned to this case has been changed to 1:23-cv-05037-VMC. Please make note of this change in order to facilitate the docketing of pleadings in this case. Signed by Judge Amy Totenberg on 11/13/2023. (tmf)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Electronic Summons Issued Mon 11/13 2:16 PM
Electronic Summons Issued as to Atlanta Orthopaedic Surgery Center, LLC, James L. Chappuis, MD, James L. Chappuis, M.D., P.C., Endo Spine USA, LLC, Georgia Occ Med, LLC, Integrative Wellness Atlanta, LLC, My Care Pax, LLC, Ortho Stem Cell Atlanta, LLC, Ortho Stem Cell Savannah, LLC, Orthopaedic & Spine Surgery of Atlanta, LLC, Palisades Imaging, LLC, Ngan Mai Pham, MD, Spine Center Athens, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta East, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta North, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta Rehabilitation & Welnnes Center, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta South, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta Surgery Center, LLC, Spine Center Atlanta West, LLC, Spine Center Augusta, LLC, Spine Center Columbus, LLC, Spine Center Macon, LLC, Spine Center Savannah, LLC, Virtual Spine Centers of America, LLC. (tmf)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
3 3 service Proposed Summons Tue 11/07 3:55 PM
PROPOSED SUMMONS filed by Professional Solutions Insurance Company (Ethridge, Robert)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
2 2 misc Certificate of Interested Persons/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 11/02 9:46 AM
Certificate of Interested Persons and Corporate Disclosure Statement by Professional Solutions Insurance Company. (dnb)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 11/02 9:44 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Professional Solutions Insurance Company. (Filing fee $402, receipt number AGANDC-13003359) Summons will not be issued because the signature page is on a separate page. Notified attorney to file the corrected summons in the open case.(dnb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Underlying Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit Forms,
Att: 3 Exhibit Policy,
Att: 4 Summons,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 6 Civil Cover Sheet