Colorado District Court
Judge:Nina Y Wang
Referred: Cyrus Y Chung
Case #: 1:23-cv-02909
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause29:1612 - FMLA: Leave Requirements
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 30, 2024 2:17 AM MDT
Defendant
Discount Tire Company of Colorado, Inc.
Represented By
Stephen E. Baumann, II
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Billie Jo May Risheim
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Schlagel
Represented By
Jacqueline Raquel Guesno
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Edward Anthony Encinias
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Claire E. Hunter
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
Andrew C. Quisenberry
Hkm Employment Attorneys LLP
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Discount Tire Co., Inc.
Terminated: 04/22/2024
Represented By
Stephen E. Baumann, II
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info
Billie Jo May Risheim
Littler Mendelson P.C.
contact info

GPO Jan 28 2025
ORDER ON MOTION TO DISMISS Upon review of the Motion and the related briefing, the applicable case law, and the entire docket, the Motion to Dismiss is respectfully GRANTED IN PART and DENIED IN PART. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 1/28/2025.(norlin, )

Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 4:49 AM MDT
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
82 82 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 04/16 3:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: THIS MATTER, having come before the Court on Parties' Third Joint Motion to Amend the Scheduling Order (the "Motion"), ECF No.80 , and the Court being fully advised, orders as follows: The Motion, ECF No.80 , is GRANTED and it is HEREBY ORDERED that the Scheduling Order be amended as follows. Entered by Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung on 4/16/2025. [Please read attached Minute Order for new dates](dgumb, )
Related: [-]
81 81 order Memorandum Wed 04/16 1:24 PM
MEMORANDUM regarding80 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify. Motion referred to Magistrate Judge Cyrus Y. Chung. By Judge Nina Y. Wang on 4/16/2025. Text Only Entry (nywlc8, )
Related: [-]
80 80 4 pgs motion Amend/Correct/Modify Wed 04/16 1:12 PM
Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify78 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify,29 Scheduling Order, Set/Clear Flags, 66 Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify, Scheduling Order by Defendant Discount Tire Company of Colorado, Inc.. (Hogan, Margaret)
Related: [-]