Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Erik P Kimball
Case #: 9:14-bk-34729
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2014
Creditor Meeting:Mar 17, 2015
Converted:Feb 06, 2015
Dismissed:Feb 13, 2015
Terminated:Mar 13, 2015

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors50-99
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
IBI Palm Beach, LLC
1 E 11th St Ste 500
Riviera Beach, FL 33404-6921
Represented By
David L Rosendorf, Esq
contact info
Lawrence G McMichael, Esq
contact info
Catherine G Pappas
contact info
Daniel F Benavides
contact info
Erik L Coccia, Esq
contact info
Jess N. Silverman
contact info
Last checked: never
Creditor Committee
Creditor Committee
Represented By
Catherine E Douglas
contact info
David B Marks
contact info
Trustee
Robert C Furr
www.furrtrustee.com 2255 Glades Road Ste 337W
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Represented By
Robert C Furr, Esq
contact info
U.S. Trustee
Office of the US Trustee
51 S.W. 1st Ave. Suite 1204
Miami, FL 33130


1. Island Breeze casino boat operator files Chapter 11 bankruptcy (sun-sentinel.com)
Submitted Fri 11/14/2014
2. Florida Gambling Ship Files For Bankruptcy (blogs.wsj.com)
Submitted Mon 11/10/2014
Docket last updated: 08/14/2015 3:32 PM EDT
Thursday, November 06, 2014
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 11/06 6:51 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 14-34729 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 22895065. Fee amount 1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Ch 11 [ECF] Thu 11/06 6:29 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . [Fee Amount $1717] (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 List of Creditors
2 2 misc 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors Thu 11/06 6:37 PM
List of Twenty Largest Unsecured Creditors Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
3 3 attydoc Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Thu 11/06 6:39 PM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury to Accompany Petitions, Schedules and Statements Filed Electronically by Attorney David L Rosendorf Esq Related [+]. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC
4 4 misc Corporate Ownership Statement Thu 11/06 6:41 PM
Corporate Ownership Statement Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 13 pgs misc Declaration Thu 11/06 7:18 PM
Declaration re: First Day Motions Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Use Cash Collateral Thu 11/06 7:21 PM
***SEE REPLACEMENT ENTRY #12***Emergency Motion to Use Cash Collateral Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David) Modified on 11/7/2014 -to show replaced (Eisenberg, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
7 7 motion Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts Thu 11/06 7:38 PM
Motion for Maintenance of Existing Bank Accounts and to Continue Cash Management System Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Pre-Petition Wages Thu 11/06 7:40 PM
Motion for Pre-Petition Wages Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Continuation of Utility Service Thu 11/06 7:57 PM
Motion For Continuation of Utility Service [cal] Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 attydoc Disclosure of Compensation Thu 11/06 7:59 PM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor by Attorney David L Rosendorf Esq. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Employ Thu 11/06 8:07 PM
Application to Employ Dilworth Paxson LLP as Attorney for the Debtor [Affidavit Attached] [cal] Filed by Debtor IBI Palm Beach, LLC. (Rosendorf, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit
Att: 2 Proposed Order
12 12 motion Adequate Protection Fri 11/07 9:00 AM
Emergency Motion of the Debtor for Interim and Final Orders (A) Authorizing the Debtor to Use Cash Collateral Of Existing Secured Lender and Granting Adequate Protection for Use and (B) Prescribing Form and MannerOf Notice and Setting the Time for the Final Hearing. (Eisenberg, Randy) Related [+]
Related: [-] places Entry #6