Ohio Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-mj-00481
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Last checked: Friday Nov 03, 2023 3:25 AM EDT
Defendant
Justin Elkins (1)
Represented By
Mario Machado
contact info
F. Arthur Mullins
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brent Tabacchi
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO Nov 01 2023
ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR IN DISTRICT WHERE CHARGES ARE PENDING as to Justin Elkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 11/1/2023. (dkc)

Docket last updated: 11/03/2023 4:24 AM EDT
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c) (3) proceedings as to Justin Elkins held on 11/1/2023. Brent Tabacchi appeared for the Government. Defendant appeared and indicated he had retained counsel, Mario Machado, who appeared via video for todays hearing. FPD Arthur Mullins also appeared in court with Defendant. Lerae Anthony appeared for Pretrial Services. Defendant was informed of his rights. The Government summarized the charge and the maximum penalties. Right to identity hearing explained and waived by Defendant. The Government indicated it is not seeking detention. Defendant agrees to voluntarily surrender to the Northern District of Mississippi. The Court orders Defendant released with conditions. Related [+] (dkc)
Related: [-] corded By: CourtSmart, record number: 11/1/2023
Attorney update in case as to Justin Elkins. Attorney Brent Tabacchi for USA added. (dkc)
Related: [-]
1 1 Rule 5(c)(3) Documents Received as to Justin Elkins (pb)
Related: [-]
2 2 ORDER OF RELEASE as to Defendant Justin Elkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 11/1/2023. (tmm)
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release with attached appearance bond as to Justin Elkins - Own Recognizance with Conditions. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 11/1/2023. (dkc)
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR IN DISTRICT WHERE CHARGES ARE PENDING as to Justin Elkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 11/1/2023. (dkc)
Related: [-]
5 5 Due Process Protections Act Order as to Defendant Justin Elkins. Signed by Magistrate Judge Caroline H. Gentry on 11/1/2023. (tmm)
Related: [-]