Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 0:21-bk-21361

Florida Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter D Russin
Case #: 0:23-ap-01237
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2023
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Unique Funding Solutions LLC
71 S. Central Avenue, 2nd Floor
Valley Stream, NY 11580
Represented By
Unique Funding Solutions LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee
P.O. Box 15580
Plantation, FL 33318
Represented By
Zachary Malnik
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
30 30 court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/26 12:20 PM
Adversary Case 0:23-ap-1237 Closed. Complaint Dismissed (Weldon, Melva)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
29 29 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 08/24 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 08/23/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
28 28 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/21 10:42 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Bonacquisti, Mark)
Related: [-] 27 Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding
27 27 2 pgs order Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding Wed 08/21 10:36 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding. . (Rodriguez, Lorenzo)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
26 26 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 08/20 12:47 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Slott, Sonya)
Related: [-]
25 25 notice Notice to Withdraw Document Tue 08/20 12:44 PM
Notice to Withdraw Document Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Slott, Sonya)
Related: [-] 24 Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee. filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee
24 24 notice Notice of Dismissal [Adversary] Tue 08/20 12:30 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Slott, Sonya)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Filing Mon 07/01 1:41 PM
Notice of Filing , Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Bonacquisti, Mark)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 22, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Fri 02/23 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 02/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice (Re: 13 ) (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
21 21 order Appear pro hac vice Order Tue 02/20 7:52 AM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice Related [+] (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] # 13
Wednesday, February 14, 2024
20 20 ordertext Order Denying (TEXT ONLY) Wed 02/14 3:57 PM
Order Denying as Moot 19 Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Hearing on February 14, 2024 filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC. Movant is directed to serve copies of this text-only order upon required parties and file a certificate of service with the court pursuant to Local Rule 2002-1(F). SO ORDERED by Judge Peter D Russin . (**This is a text-only order with no underlying PDF image entered pursuant to Local Rule 5005-4(F) and Local Rule 9021-1(A)**). (Wiener, Casey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 13, 2024
19 19 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 02/13 11:58 AM
Ex Parte Motion for Leave to Appear Remotely at the Hearing on February 14, 2024 Filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 02, 2024
18 18 misc Initial Disclosure (Rule 26) Fri 02/02 1:55 PM
Initial Disclosure per FRCP 26 Required by the Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee. (Malnik, Zachary)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Certificate of Service Fri 02/02 9:45 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC Related [+]. (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Shanna M. Kaminski [Fee Paid $200] filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC,16 Notice of Hearing
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
16 16 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 01/31 8:38 AM
Notice of Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 02/14/2024 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Weldon, Melva)
Related: [-] 13 Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Shanna M. Kaminski [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC (Attachments: # 1 Affidavit Affidavit- Shanna M. Kaminski) filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC
Sunday, January 28, 2024
15 15 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/29 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Denying As Moot Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely At The Status Conference On January 17, 2024 (Re: 8 ) (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Friday, January 26, 2024
14 14 order Miscellaneous Motion Order Fri 01/26 4:18 PM
Order Denying As Moot Ex Parte Motion For Leave To Appear Remotely At The Status Conference On January 17, 2024 Related [+] (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] # 8
Thursday, January 25, 2024
13 13 motion Appear pro hac vice Thu 01/25 2:39 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice by Shanna M. Kaminski [Fee Paid $200] Filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit- Shanna M. Kaminski
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Thu 01/25 2:41 PM
Receipt of Motion to Appear pro hac vice([LINK 23-01237 PDR] ) [motion,mprohac] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A43677123. Fee amount 200.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 22, 2024
12 12 misc Certificate of Service Mon 01/22 4:40 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Malnik, Zachary)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial
Sunday, January 21, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Mon 01/22 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - PDF Document Related [+] Notice Date 01/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee). Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Friday, January 19, 2024
10 10 5 pgs order Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial Fri 01/19 2:42 PM
Order Setting Filing and Disclosure Requirements for Pretrial and Trial. Related [+]. Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2024 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 01/16 5:10 PM
Answer and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint Filed by Unique Funding Solutions LLC.(Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
8 8 motion Miscellaneous Motion Tue 01/16 8:42 AM
Ex Parte Motion Appear Remote at Status Conference on January 17, 2023 Filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service Tue 01/16 8:36 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service by Lauren G Raines Filed by Defendant Unique Funding Solutions LLC. (Raines, Lauren)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/09 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Unique Funding Solutions LLC Answer Due 12/6/2023 (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 11/09 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 11/08/2023. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines (Re: 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee). Scheduling Conference to be held on 01/17/2024 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Monday, November 06, 2023
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Mon 11/06 11:33 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee Related [+]. (Malnik, Zachary)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee,2 Summons in an Adversary Proceeding,3 Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines
3 3 6 pgs order Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 11/06 9:02 AM
Order Setting Scheduling Conference and Establishing Procedures and Deadlines Related [+]. Scheduling Conference to be held on 01/17/2024 at 10:00 AM U.S. Courthouse, 299 E Broward Blvd Courtroom 301 (PDR), Fort Lauderdale, FL. (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee
2 2 court Summons and Notice of Scheduling Conference in an Adversary Proceeding [Post Dec 1 2020] Mon 11/06 9:00 AM
Summons in an Adversary Proceeding. Summons Issued on Unique Funding Solutions LLC Answer Due 12/6/2023 (Cifuentes Esteban, Zoila)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 11/03 11:19 AM
Adversary case 23-01237 Complaint by Sonya S. Slott, Chapter 7 Trustee against Unique Funding Solutions LLC. Filing Fee Paid. Nature of Suit:,(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)) (Malnik, Zachary)
Related: [-]