Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Donald M Middlebrooks
Referred: William Matthewman
Case #: 9:23-cv-81450
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:0451 Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2023
Terminated:Jan 10, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 6:12 AM EDT
Defendant
DIVE BAR RESTAURANT, LLC
a Florida Limited Liability Company c/o Foster & Fuchs, P.A. 4425 Military Trail Suite 109
Jupiter, FL 33458
Plaintiff
Janice Fox
3825 PGA Blvd
Palm Beach Gardens, FL 33410
Represented By
Gregory Steven Sconzo
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info
Samantha Lyn Simpson
Sconzo Law Office, P.A.
contact info


Docket last updated: 58 minutes ago
Wednesday, January 10, 2024
6 6 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 01/10 1:55 PM
ORDER Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/10/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal - aty Mon 01/08 10:24 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Janice Fox (Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
4 4 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Fri 01/05 3:36 PM
ORDER REFERRING CASE AND SETTING TRIAL DATE: (Jury Trial set for 7/1/2024 09:00 AM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks., Calendar Call set for 6/26/2024 01:15 PM in West Palm Beach Division before Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge William Matthewman to conduct a Scheduling Conference with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Signed by Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks on 1/5/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 11/03 3:23 PM
Summons Issued as to DIVE BAR RESTAURANT, LLC. (pc)
Related: [-]
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 11/03 3:19 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Donald M. Middlebrooks. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge William Matthewman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 11/03 1:39 PM
COMPLAINT against DIVE BAR RESTAURANT, LLC. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number BFLSDC-17047201, filed by Janice Fox.(Sconzo, Gregory)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s),
Att: 3 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination,
Att: 4 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter