New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Referred: Valerie Figueredo
Case #: 1:23-cv-09714
Nature of Suit410 Other Statutes - Antitrust
Cause28:1331at Fed. Question: Anti-trust
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2023
Case in other court:Florida Middle, 8:23-cv-01721
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 6:20 AM EDT
Defendant
Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc.
Represented By
Michael G. Tanner
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
William J. Schifino, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA
contact info
Derek L. Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Christopher S Yates
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Amanda P Reeves
Latham & Watkins Llp (dc)
contact info
Christopher G. Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Lawrence Edward Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael B. Carlinsky
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Lawrence E. Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fanatics Holdings, Inc.
Represented By
Michael G. Tanner
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
William J. Schifino, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA
contact info
Derek L. Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Christopher S Yates
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Amanda P Reeves
Latham & Watkins Llp (dc)
contact info
Christopher G. Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Lawrence Edward Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael B. Carlinsky
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Lawrence E. Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fanatics SPV, LLC
Represented By
Michael G. Tanner
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
William J. Schifino, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA
contact info
Derek L. Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Christopher S Yates
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Amanda P Reeves
Latham & Watkins Llp (dc)
contact info
Christopher G. Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Lawrence Edward Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael B. Carlinsky
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Lawrence E. Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fanatics, Inc.
Represented By
Michael G. Tanner
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
William J. Schifino, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA
contact info
Derek L. Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Christopher S Yates
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Amanda P Reeves
Latham & Watkins Llp (dc)
contact info
Christopher G. Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Lawrence Edward Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael B. Carlinsky
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Lawrence E. Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Defendant
Fanatics, LLC
Represented By
Michael G. Tanner
Gunster, Yoakley & Stewart
contact info
William J. Schifino, Jr.
Gunster Yoakley & Stewart PA
contact info
Derek L. Shaffer
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Christopher S Yates
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Amanda P Reeves
Latham & Watkins Llp (dc)
contact info
Christopher G. Michel
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart Sullivan
contact info
Lawrence Edward Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Michael B. Carlinsky
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart & Sullivan LLP
contact info
Lawrence E. Buterman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Panini America, Inc.
Represented By
Sean Phillips Rodriguez
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
Stuart Harold Singer
Boies, Schiller & Flexner Llp (fl)
contact info
John Ernest Clabby
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
David Boies, II
Boies, Schiller & Flexner Llp (armonk)
contact info
Sarah Jane Barney
Carlton Fields
contact info
David Boies
Boies Schiller And Flexner
contact info
Sabria McElroy
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Gary Lee Sasso
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
James P. Denvir, III
Boies, Schiller & Flexner Llp (dc)
contact info
Jesse Michael Panuccio
contact info
Richard A. Feinstein
Boies, Schiller & Flexner LLP
contact info
James Peter Denvir, III
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
Ursula Mancusi Ungaro
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info
David Matthew Allen
Carlton Fields, PA
contact info
Jason H Hilborn
Boies Schiller Flexner LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 49 minutes ago
Thursday, May 01, 2025
174 174 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Thu 05/01 3:35 PM
ORDER: On or before May 13, 2025, Fanatics, Inc. will produce its six licensing agreements with the major sports leagues and players associations, as discussed at the conference on May 1. By May 13, 2025, Fanatics, Inc. will produce documents responsive to Document Request No. 3 in Paninis document requests served on January 8, 2025specifically, Fanatics' agreements with GC Packaging, LLC. As discussed at the May 1 conference, if after a meet and confer there is still a dispute concerning the production of documents responsive to Request No. 4, the parties can raise it with the Court at the June conference. Below is a schedule for the completion of fact and expert discovery. March 13, 2025 Deadline for providing mandatory initial disclosures. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1).October 31, 2025 Deadline for moving to join a party or amend the pleadings. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 14, 15(a), 19, 20. February 20, 2026 Deadline for the substantial completion of document productions. June 5, 2026 Deadline for completion of fact discovery and filing any motion to compel. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. Deadlines for serving expert disclosures under Rule 26(a)(2), including any report required by Rule 26(a)(2)(B). Plaintiff: July 31, 2026. Defendant: October 2, 2026. Rebuttal: November 13, 2026. December 30, 2026 Deadline for the completion of expert discovery and filing any motion to compel expert discovery. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 37. ( Amended Pleadings due by 10/31/2025., Expert Discovery due by 12/30/2026., Fact Discovery due by 6/5/2026., Motions due by 6/5/2026.) (Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo on 5/1/2025) (rro)
Related: [-]
minutes Discovery Hearing Thu 05/01 11:33 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo: Discovery Hearing held on 5/1/2025. (sjo)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
173 173 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 04/30 11:20 PM
ANSWER to69 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Fanatics Collectibles Intermediate Holdco, Inc., Fanatics Holdings, Inc., Fanatics SPV, LLC, Fanatics, Inc., Fanatics, LLC..(Buterman, Lawrence)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
172 172 8 pgs misc Letter Thu 04/24 10:23 PM
JOINT LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Valerie Figueredo from David Boies and Lawrence E. Buterman dated April 24, 2025 re: status of case in advance of May 1 status conference. Document filed by Panini America, Inc...(Boies, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Fanatics' Am. Reps. Objs. to Panini's First Set of Reqs. for Prod