Illinois Northern District Court
Judge:Nancy L Maldonado
Case #: 1:23-cv-15630
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2023
Terminated:Dec 12, 2023
Case in other court:Circuit Court of Cook County Illinois, Chancery, 2023-CH-08524
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 5:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Zap Solutions, Inc.
Represented By
Kathleen Mary Ryan
Shook, Hardy & Bacon L.L.P.
contact info
Amy Yongmee Cho
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Matthew C. Wolfe
Shook, Hardy & Bacon LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Candice Wilhelm
Represented By
James L Simon
Simon Law Co.
contact info
Michael L Fradin
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/03/2023 2:53 PM CDT
Friday, November 03, 2023
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Nancy L. Maldonado. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Young B. Kim. Case assignment: Random assignment. (Civil Category 1). (jxm, )
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE of Removal from Circuit Court of Cook County, Illinois, Chancery Division, case number (2023-CH-08524) filed by Zap Solutions, Inc. Filing fee $ 402, receipt number AILNDC-21295131. Summons and Complaint(Wolfe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Declaration of Paul Santiago
2 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Wolfe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
3 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zap Solutions, Inc. by Matthew C. Wolfe (Wolfe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Zap Solutions, Inc. (Wolfe, Matthew)
Related: [-]
5 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zap Solutions, Inc. by Amy Yongmee Cho (Cho, Amy)
Related: [-]
6 6 ATTORNEY Appearance for Defendant Zap Solutions, Inc. by Kathleen Mary Ryan (Ryan, Kathleen)
Related: [-]