Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:John F Murphy
Case #: 2:23-cv-04301
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:Nov 03, 2023
Terminated:Mar 21, 2024
Last checked: Friday May 03, 2024 6:22 AM EDT
Plaintiff
SALIMA TOURKI
Represented By
MARK R. NATALE
Malamut & Associates
contact info
KURT J. JUNG
Malamut & Associates, LLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
INSIGHT GLOBAL, LLC
Terminated: 01/25/2024
Defendant
PENN MEDICINE
Terminated: 03/21/2024
Represented By
Karen L. Odash
Fisher Phillips
contact info
TODD ALAN EWAN
Fisher Phillips LLP
contact info
MICHAEL R. GALEY
Fisher & Phillips
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, March 21, 2024
23 23 1 pgs order Order Thu 03/21 11:10 AM
ORDER THAT STIPULATION BE GRANTED AND CLERK OF COURT SHALL DISMISS PENN MEDICINE WITH PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE JOHN F MURPHY ON 3/21/24. 3/21/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
22 22 3 pgs misc Stipulation of Dismissal Thu 03/21 8:32 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiff and by PENN MEDICINE.(EWAN, TODD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 27, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/27 2:05 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Karen L. Odash on behalf of PENN MEDICINE with Certificate of Service(Odash, Karen)
Related: [-]
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 02/27 12:01 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by MICHAEL R. GALEY on behalf of PENN MEDICINE with Certificate of Service(GALEY, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 20, 2024
19 19 2 pgs order Order Tue 02/20 12:25 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER THAT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT IS DUE BY 3/27/24. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 2/20/24. 2/20/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 15, 2024
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 02/15 3:53 PM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by PENN MEDICINE. (EWAN, TODD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 31, 2024
misc Returned Mail Wed 01/31 3:46 PM
Copy of Order/Notice dated 1/8/24 (Document # 8) and envelope returned from the U.S. Postal Service addressed to PENN MEDICINE for the following reason: NOT DELIVERABLE AS ADDRESSED, UNABLE TO FORWARD. (JL)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 26, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order Setting Answer Deadline Stipulation and Order Fri 01/26 3:21 PM
STIPULATION AND ORDER FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 1/26/24. 1/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Stipulation Fri 01/26 10:26 AM
STIPULATION for Extension of Time by PENN MEDICINE. (EWAN, TODD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 25, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Fri 01/26 8:32 AM
ORDER THAT WE CONSTRUE THE STIPULATION ATTACHED TO DI 14 AS A RULE 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) REQUEST FOR VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL AND THE CLERK OF COURT SHALL DISMISS DEFENDANT INSIGHT GLOBAL, LLC WITHOUT PREJUDICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 1/25/24. 1/26/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Letter Thu 01/25 11:09 AM
Letter dated 1 25-2024 by SALIMA TOURKI. (NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 17, 2024
misc Remark Wed 01/17 8:56 AM
COPY OF DOC. NO. 13 HAS BEEN MAILED TO UNREP. (bw)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 16, 2024
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Tue 01/16 3:37 PM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS LETTER REQURST IS GRANTED; SHOW CAUSE RESPONSE DUE BY 1/26/2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 1/16/24. 1/16/24 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREP AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 11, 2024
12 12 misc Letter Thu 01/11 3:51 PM
Letter dated 01/11/2024 by SALIMA TOURKI. (NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 08, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 01/08 9:13 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFF SHALL, NO LATER THAN 1/12/24, SHOW CAUSE AS TO WHY THE ACTION AGAINST DEFENDANT INSIGHT GLOBAL, LLC SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FROM THE CASE FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 1/5/24. 1/8/24 ENTERED & E-MAILED. NOT MAILED TO UNREP.(fdc)
Related: [-]
misc Remark Mon 01/08 9:52 AM
DOC. NO. 10 MAILED TO UNREP (ems)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 05, 2024
11 11 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings Mon 01/08 9:14 AM
ORDER THAT SHOW CAUSE RESPONSE DUE BY 1/12/2024. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 1/5/24. 1/8/24 ENTERED AND COPIES MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 06, 2023
9 9 1 pgs service Acceptance of Service Wed 12/06 10:48 AM
ACCEPTANCE OF SERVICE Re: accepted summons and complaint for INSIGHT GLOBAL, LLC on 11/8/2023, answer due 11/29/2023. (NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 29, 2023
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Wed 11/29 4:35 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by SALIMA TOURKI. PENN MEDICINE waiver sent on 11/27/2023, answer due 1/26/2024. (NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 09, 2023
misc Remark Thu 11/09 7:24 AM
DOC 7 MAILED TO PENN MEDICINE (rf, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/08 10:07 AM
ORDER granting6 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 11/8/23.11/8/23 ENTERED AND COPIES NOT MAILED TO UNREPS AND E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
6 6 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/07 2:56 PM
Second MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Kurt Jung, Esq. filed by SALIMA TOURKI.certificate of service.(NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 11/07 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to INSIGHT GLOBAL, LLC, PENN MEDICINE. (rf, )
Related: [-]
4 4 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Tue 11/07 10:58 AM
ORDER denying2 MOTION FOR PRO HAC VICE. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOHN F MURPHY ON 11/7/23.11/7/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(rf, )
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 11/06 11:29 AM
NOTICE by SALIMA TOURKI re1 Complaint (Attorney) Related [+] (NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-] vised designation form
misc Attorney Required Forms Mon 11/06 11:16 AM
Attorneys are required by local rule to complete and file both a Civil Cover Sheet and a Designation Form. PLAINTIFF's counsel is directed to file COMPLETED DESIGNATION FORM in this case using the Notice (Other) docket event located in the Notices category. The Certification Question asking if the case is/is not related needs to be answered. (sbt)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 03, 2023
2 2 motion Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 11/03 4:48 PM
MOTION for Pro Hac Vice admission of Kurt Jung, Esq. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-17052015.) filed by SALIMA TOURKI.Affidavit (Ex. A), Certificate of Service.(NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 6 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Fri 11/03 4:41 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number APAEDC-17051987.), filed by SALIMA TOURKI.(NATALE, MARK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 2 pgs Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form