New York Southern District Court
Judge:Philip M Halpern
Case #: 1:23-cv-09655
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 30, 2024 4:33 AM EDT
Defendant
Edmund Coletti
Represented By
Daniel S Moretti
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Daniel Tarolli
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Yvonne Evans
15 Maple Road
Central Valley, NY 10917
Represented By
Daniel S Moretti
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Daniel Tarolli
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
M.D. Glenn Seliger
Represented By
Daniel S Moretti
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Daniel Tarolli
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
M.D. Marjorie King
23592 Windsong Apartment 40E
Aliso Viejo, CA 92656
Represented By
Daniel S Moretti
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Daniel Tarolli
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Kathleen Martucci
213 La Pasada Circle East
Ponte Vedra Beach, FL 32082
Represented By
Daniel S Moretti
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Daniel Tarolli
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Defendant
Jacqueline Velez
3 Pinehurst Circle
Monroe, NY 10950
Represented By
Daniel S Moretti
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Daniel Tarolli
Landman Corsi Ballaine & Ford PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Edna Silas Marungo
Represented By
Thuy Q. Pham
The Law Office Of Thuy Q. Pham
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, November 03, 2023
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification Fri 11/03 12:04 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney Thuy Q. Pham. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Edmund J Coletti, Glenn M. Seliger. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: middle initial removed. (vf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney Regarding Case Opening Statistical Error Correction Fri 11/03 12:10 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING CIVIL. CASE OPENING STATISTICAL ERROR CORRECTION: Notice to attorney Thuy Q. Pham. The following case opening statistical information was erroneously selected/entered: Office code White Plains; Cause of Action code 28:1331cv Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights; County code Westchester. The following correction(s) have been made to your case entry: the Office code has been modified to Foley Square; the Cause of Action code has been modified to 42:1983 Civil Rights Act; the County code has been modified to Queens. (vf)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Fri 11/03 12:12 PM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Analisa Torres. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designation Fri 11/03 12:13 PM
Magistrate Judge Robert W. Lehrburger is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (vf)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Fri 11/03 12:13 PM
Case Designated ECF. (vf)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(Pham, Thuy)
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against Edmund J Coletti, Yvonne Evans, Marjorie King, Kathleen Martucci, Glenn M. Seliger, Jacqueline Velez. (Filing Fee $ 402.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-28514967)Document filed by Edna Silas Marungo.(Pham, Thuy)
Related: [-]