Missouri Eastern District Court
Case #: 4:23-cr-00610
Case Filed:Nov 01, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2023 2:51 AM CDT
Defendant
Barry Melton (1)
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Nicholas H. Lake
United States Attorneys Office - St. Louis
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/04/2023 4:12 AM CDT
Wednesday, November 01, 2023
Warrant Issued as to Indictment in case as to Barry Melton. (DLB)
Related: [-]
Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum Issued as to defendant Barry Melton. (TMT)
Related: [-]
1 1 INDICTMENT returned in open court on November 1, 2023 to Judge Henry Edward Autrey by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins as to Barry Melton (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3. FORFEITURE ALLEGATION (DLB)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Criminal Cover Sheet
2 2 REDACTED INDICTMENT returned in open court on November 1, 2023 to Judge Henry Edward Autrey by the Foreperson of the Grand Jury. Referred to Magistrate Judge Noelle C. Collins as to Barry Melton (1): Former count 1 is now count 1r. Former count 2 is now count 2r. Former count 3 is now count 3r.. (DLB)
Related: [-]
3 3 ENTRY OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Nicholas H. Lake appearing for USA. (DLB)
Related: [-]
4 4 MOTION for Pretrial Detention and Hearing by USA as to Barry Melton. (DLB)
Related: [-]
5 5 Order for Application for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Prosequendum as to Barry Melton. Signed by District Judge Henry Edward Autrey on 11/2/2023. (TMT)
Related: [-]