California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-02259
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2023 12:23 AM PDT
Defendant
Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (1)
Represented By
Daniela Muehleisen
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Defendant
Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia (3)
Represented By
Martha McNab Hall
Law Office Of Martha M. Hall
contact info
Defendant
Geronimo Perez-Guzman (4)
Represented By
Andrew K Nietor
Law Office Of Andrew K Nietor
contact info
Defendant
Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra (2)
Represented By
Jennifer L Coon
contact info
Material Witness
Juan Carlos Hernandez Martinez
Represented By
Ray Antonio Estolano
Estolano Law
contact info
Material Witness
Jose Viviano Macias-Baez
Represented By
Ray Antonio Estolano
Estolano Law
contact info
Material Witness
Leonardo Daniel Martinez Ibarra
Represented By
Ray Antonio Estolano
Estolano Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Shivanjali A. Sewak
Doj-Usao
contact info
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info

GPO Feb 02 2024
JUDGMENT as to Geronimo Perez-Guzman (4), Count(s) 5, Custody BOP for six (6) months concurrent and three (3) months consecutive to sentence imposed in case no. 22-CR-2897-TWR. Two (2) years supervised release. $100.00 special assessment is waived. No fine. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo (ddf)
GPO Apr 22 2024
JUDGMENT as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra (2), Count(s) 1-3, 2s-3s, Government oral motion to dismiss remaining counts against defendant without prejudice is granted.; Count(s) 1s, Custody of BOP for ten (10) months. No supervised release to follow. $100.00 special assessment is waived. JVTA assessment of $5,000.00 is waived/defendant deemed indigent. No fine. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo (anh)
GPO Apr 22 2024
JUDGMENT as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (1), Count(s) 1-3, 2s-3s, Government oral motion to dismiss remaining counts against defendant without prejudice is granted.; Count(s) 1s, Custody of BOP for ten (10) months. No supervised release to follow. $100.00 special assessment is waived. JVTA assessment of $5,000.00 is waived/defendant deemed indigent. No fine. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo (anh)
GPO May 31 2024
JUDGMENT as to Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia (3), Count(s) 4, BOP custody for a term of Time Served. No supervised release to follow. Special Assessment of $100 dollars remitted. No fine. Appeal waived. Signed by Judge Cathy Ann Bencivengo (anh)

Docket last updated: 11/04/2023 1:11 AM PDT
Saturday, October 07, 2023
Arrest of Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan, Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra, Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia, Geronimo Perez-Guzman (no document attached) (fjp) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan, Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra, Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia, Geronimo Perez-Guzman.(fjp) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Minute Order. Material Witness Attorney Ray Antonio Estolano for Jose Viviano Macias-Baez,Ray Antonio Estolano for Leonardo Daniel Martinez Ibarra,Ray Antonio Estolano for Juan Carlos Hernandez Martinez appointed. Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan, Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra, Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia, Geronimo Perez-Guzman: Initial Appearance set for 10/10/2023 before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (no document attached) (mef) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
3 3 CORRECTED Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Initial Appearance as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan(1), Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra(2), Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia(3), Geronimo Perez-Guzman(4) held on 10/10/2023. Oral proffer confirmed as to each defendant. Appointed Attorney Federal Defenders for Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan(1),attorney Jennifer L Coon(n/a) for Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra (2), attorney Martha McNab Hall(n/a) for Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia (3), and attorney Andrew K Nietor(n/a) for Geronimo Perez-Guzman(4). Detention Hearing held on 10/10/2023 as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (1); Government oral motion to detain(Flight) is granted. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Bond set as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (1) No Bail. Government oral motion to detain (Flight) as to defendants 2-4; Bond set as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra (2) No Bail and Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia (3) No Bail and Geronimo Perez-Guzman (4) No Bail. **( Detention Hearing - RF set for 10/13/2023 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.)** Rule 5 advisements provided. ( Preliminary Hearing set for 10/24/23 at 2:00pm before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Arraignment set for 11/02/23 at 10:00am before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit.)(Interpreter Gabriela Sosa, Elizabeth Varela). (CD# 10/10/2023 MMP 23-1:2:17;2:36-3:34). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Marc Jacome FD-S/A). (aje) Modified on 10/11/2023 TO CORRECT DET HRG TO 10/13/23 AND NOT 10/23/23(aje). [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
4 4 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan, Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra, Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia, Geronimo Perez-Guzman (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra. (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
6 6 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight)by USA as to Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia. (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
7 7 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight) by USA as to Geronimo Perez-Guzman. (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/10/2023. (vyc) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
12 12 ORDER as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/10/23. (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
13 13 ORDER as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/10/23. (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
14 14 ORDER as to Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/10/23. (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
15 15 ORDER as to Geronimo Perez-Guzman: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/10/23. (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 11, 2023
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Daniela Muehleisen appearing for Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (Muehleisen, Daniela)Attorney Daniela Muehleisen added to party Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan(pty:dft) (rxc). [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
9 9 Notice of Assertion of Rights by Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (Muehleisen, Daniela) (rxc). [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 12, 2023
11 11 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Shivanjali A. Sewak appearing for USA. (Sewak, Shivanjali)Attorney Shivanjali A. Sewak added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc). [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
16 16 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Detention Hearing as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra held on 10/13/2023. Government oral motion for detention (RF) (ECF No. 5 ) is moot as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra. Defendant stipulates to detention and is ordered detained without prejudice pending trial. (Interpreter Juan Davila-Santiago). (CD# 10/13/2023 MMP 23:10:14-10:18). (Plaintiff Attorney Jordan Arakawa, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Jennifer Coon). (no document attached) (yem) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
18 18 DETENTION ORDER as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/13/2023. (ggv) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
19 19 DETENTION ORDER as to Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/13/2023. (ggv) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
20 20 DETENTION ORDER as to Geronimo Perez-Guzman. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/13/2023. (ggv) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
26 26 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Detention Hearing as to Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia, Geronimo Perez-Guzman held on 10/13/2023. Government oral motion for detention (ECF No. 6 ) is granted as to as to Defendant Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia (3). Government oral motion for detention (ECF No. 7 ) is moot granted as to as to Defendant Geronimo Perez-Guzman. Defendant stipulates to detention without prejudice pending trial. Preliminary Hearing not held as to Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia, Geronimo Perez-Guzman. Defense oral motion to continue hearing granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (Interpreter Juan Davila-Santiago). (CD# 10/13/2023 MMP 23:10:14-10:28). (Plaintiff Attorney Jordan Arakawa, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Martha Hall, CJA; Andrew Nietor, CJA). (no document attached) (yem) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
17 17 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan, Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra, Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia, Geronimo Perez-Guzman: Arraignment of MW Juan Carlos Hernandez Martinez, MW Leonardo Daniel Martinez Ibarra, and MW Jose Viviano Macias-Baez set for 10/16/2023 before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher. (no document attached) (mef) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
21 21 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher: Arraignment of Material Witnesses Jose Viviano Macias-Baez, Leonardo Daniel Martinez Ibarra, Juan Carlos Hernandez Martinez held on 10/16/2023. Material Witneses each consent to VTC. The Court confirms the appointment of attorney Ray Estolano(n/a). Material Witness bail set s to each at $5,000 PS secured by 1 FRA w/10% percent cash deposit. (Interpreter Mylene Green, Edith Monroy). (CD# 10/16/2023 DEB 23-1:2:14-2:20). (Plaintiff Attorney Jacqueline Jimenez AUSA). (Defendant Attorney N/A). (no document attached) (aje) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
22 22 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Leonardo Daniel Martinez Ibarra. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA, $500 cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 10/16/2023. (cxl) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
23 23 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Juan Carlos Hernandez Martinez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA, $500 cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 10/16/2023. (cxl)[3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
24 24 ORDER Setting Conditions of Release for Material Witness as to Jose Viviano Macias-Baez. Material Witness Bond set for $5,000 P/S secured by 1 FRRA, $500 cash deposit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Daniel E. Butcher on 10/16/2023. (cxl) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 23, 2023
25 25 Order on Stipulated Continuance of a Preliminary Hearing as to Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra. Preliminary Hearing continued to 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit on 10/23/2023. (yem) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 24, 2023
27 27 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Preliminary Hearing not held as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan. Defense oral motion to continue the Preliminary hearing is granted. Preliminary Hearing continued to 11/2/2023 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit. (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 10/24/2023 MMP 23:2:04-2:11). (Plaintiff Attorney Sheldon Smith, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Daniela Muehleisen, FD). (yem) [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 26, 2023
28 28 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Sewak, Shivanjali) (ggv). [3:23-mj-03671-MMP]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
29 29 INFORMATION as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (1) count(s) 1-3, Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra (2) count(s) 1-3, Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia (3) count(s) 4, Geronimo Perez-Guzman (4) count(s) 5. (yem)
Related: [-]
30 30 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Michelle M. Pettit: Arraignment on Counts 1, 2, and 3 of the Information as to Jesus Eduardo Barragan Juan (1) and Edgar Gael Verduzco Guerra (2) as to Count 4 of the Information as to Caleb Felizardo Cuadras-Garcia (3) and Count 5 of the Information as to Geronimo Perez-Guzman (4) held on 11/2/2023. Not guilty plea's entered. Defendant's waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 12/11/2023 at 9:00 AM before District Judge William Q. Hayes. (Interpreter Matias Pizarro). (CD# 11/2/2023 MMP 23:10:20-10:39). (Plaintiff Attorney Carlos Arguello, AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Veronica Portillo-Heap, FD-S/A; Jennifer Coon, CJA; Andrew Nietor, CJA). (Material Witness Attorney Frank Morrell, S/A). (yem)
Related: [-]
31 31 NOTICE of Lodgment of Plea Agreement by USA and Rule 11 (Sewak, Shivanjali) (alns).
Related: [-]