California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:23-cr-02268
Case Filed:Nov 02, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 04, 2023 12:24 AM PDT
Defendant
Jose Roberto Castro-Simental (1)
Represented By
Mayra L Garcia
Law Offices Of Mayra L Garcia
contact info
Rafael Bustamante Laue
Law Office Of Rafael Bustamante Laue
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Julie A. Bauman
United States Attorney'S Office
contact info

GPO May 24 2024
JUDGMENT as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental (1), Count(s) 1, Custody of the BOP for 36 months, 3 years supervised release, $100 special assessment remitted, and fine waived. Signed by District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro (jpp)

Docket last updated: 11/04/2023 1:14 AM PDT
Thursday, October 05, 2023
Arrest of Jose Roberto Castro-Simental (no document attached) (vyc) [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental. (Copies provided to Counsel in Court). Initial Appearance set for 10/6/2023 in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/19/2023 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 11/2/2023 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr..(vyc) [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 info sheet
2 2 ***Spanish Interpreter needed as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental (no document attached) (cxl) [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Initial Appearance as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental held on 10/6/2023. Proffer, Appointed Attorney Mayra L Garcia,Rafael Bustamante Laue for Jose Roberto Castro-Simental., Detention Hearing as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental held on 10/6/2023. USA oral motion for detention (RF); motion granted as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental. Defendant ordered detained without prejudice. Order of detention to be submitted by AUSA by COB 10/10/2023. Preliminary Hearing set for 10/19/2023 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. Arraignment set for 11/2/2023 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. As required by Rule 5(f), the US is ordered to produce all exculpatory evidence to the defendant pursuant to Brady v. Maryland and its progeny. Not doing so in a timely manner may result in sanctions, including exclusion of evidence, adverse jury instructions, dismissal of charges and contempt proceedings.(Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 10/6/2023 LR2023 10:02-10:18). (Plaintiff Attorney Rosario Gonzalez). (Defendant Attorney James Johnson). (cxl) [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 10/6/2023. (cxl) [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 10, 2023
5 5 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Julie A. Bauman appearing for USA. (Bauman, Julie)Attorney Julie A. Bauman added to party USA(pty:pla) (rxc). [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
Friday, October 13, 2023
6 6 WAIVER of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 by Jose Roberto Castro-Simental (Laue, Rafael)(stn). [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
Monday, October 16, 2023
7 7 NOTICE of Vacated Hearing(s): Preliminary Hearing set for 10/19/2023 01:00 PM in El Centro before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez Jr.. is VACATED. re6 Waiver of Preliminary Hearing Rule 5.1 (no document attached) (aum) [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 31, 2023
8 8 NOTICE of Lodgment of Information by USA (Bauman, Julie) (rxc). [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 02, 2023
9 9 FINDINGS OF FACT AND ORDER OF DETENTION as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr on 11/2/2023. (cxl) [2:23-mj-08768-LR]
Related: [-]
10 10 INFORMATION as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental (1) count(s) 1. (vyc)
Related: [-]
11 11 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Lupe Rodriguez, Jr: Arraignment on Information as to Jose Roberto Castro-Simental (1) Count 1 held on 11/2/2023. Not Guilty plea entered. Defendant waived Indictment in open court. Motion Hearing/Trial Setting set for 12/13/2023 09:00 AM before District Judge Ruth Bermudez Montenegro. (Interpreter Maria Cruz). (CD# 11/2/2023 lr:23-1:13-1:19). (Plaintiff Attorney Daniel Casillas). (Defendant Attorney Rafael Bustamante Laue). (tar)
Related: [-]