New York Southern District Court
Case #: 1:23-mj-06699
Case Filed:Oct 06, 2023
Terminated:Oct 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday Nov 05, 2023 2:19 AM EST
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Henry Laurence Ross
Doj-Usao
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez (1)
Terminated: 10/06/2023
Represented By
Tamara Lila Giwa
Federal Defenders Of New York Inc. (nyc)
contact info


Docket last updated: 11/05/2023 2:36 AM EST
Thursday, October 05, 2023
Arrest (Rule 5(c)(3)) of Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez. (jbo)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 06, 2023
Attorney update in case as to Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez. Attorney Tamara Lila Giwa for Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez added. (jbo)
Related: [-]
1 1 RULE 5(c)(3) AFFIDAVIT of SARAH VAN FOSSEN, being duly sworn, deposes and says that she is a Special Agent with the Federal Bureau of Investigation ("FBI"), from the United States District Court - Middle District of Florida - Orlando Division, as to Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/6/23) (jbo)
Related: [-]
2 2 CJA 23 Financial Affidavit by Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez. Tamara Giwa appointed counsel. Approved. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron) (jbo)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron: Initial Appearance in Rule 5(c)(3) Proceedings as to Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez held on 10/6/2023. Defendant present with Federal Defender Tamara Giwa. AUSA Henry Ross present for the Government. On writ. BAIL DISPOSITION: Detention; Risk of flight/danger. Identity hearing waived. Defendant to be removed. Control date for Removal: 10/20/23. See Transcript. (jbo)
Related: [-]
4 4 Medical Order as to Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez. (jbo)
Related: [-]
5 5 COMMITMENT TO ANOTHER DISTRICT as to Cristian Manuel Rodriguez Nunez. Defendant committed to the United States District Court - Middle District of Florida - Orlando Division. *The defendant is requesting court-appointed counsel. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Stewart D. Aaron on 10/6/23)(jbo)
Related: [-]