California Northern District Court
Judge:Yvonne Gonzalez Rogers
Case #: 3:23-cv-05701
Nature of Suit790 Labor - Other Labor Litigation
Cause05:704 Labor Litigation
Case Filed:Nov 06, 2023
Last checked: Sunday May 05, 2024 3:49 AM PDT
Defendant
Alaska Airlines, Inc.
Represented By
Aaron S. Markel
Jones Day - Detroit
contact info
Amanda C. Sommerfeld
Jones Day
contact info
Chelsea Ann Till
Jones Day
contact info
Plaintiff
Johnathan Vigil
Represented By
Aparajit Bhowmik
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Andrew Gavin Ronan
Blumenthal, Nordrehaug, Bhowmik, De Blouw, LLP
contact info
Norman B. Blumenthal
Blumenthal, Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Nicholas J. De Blouw
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Christine T. LeVu
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw
contact info
Kyle R Nordrehaug
Blumenthal Nordrehaug And Bhowmik
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Tuesday, November 14, 2023
16 16 oth_evt Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination Tue 11/14 7:30 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff/Defendant shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge by 11/21/2023 . Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at: [LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . Consent/Declination due by 11/21/2023. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (mkl, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 13, 2023
15 15 motion Dismiss Mon 11/13 1:28 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc.. Motion to Dismiss Hearing set for 12/18/2023 09:30 AM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. Responses due by 11/27/2023. Replies due by 12/4/2023.(Sommerfeld, Amanda)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
14 14 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/13 9:27 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 12 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(sklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/13 9:26 AM
Order by Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim granting 11 Motion for Pro Hac Vice.(sklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 08, 2023
12 12 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/08 4:32 PM
Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18812669.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/07/2023 filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc..(Till, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
11 11 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/08 4:28 PM
Amended MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18818215.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/8/2023 filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc..(Markel, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/08 4:09 PM
ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim denying 8 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Without Prejudice; denying 9 Motion for Pro Hac Vice Without Prejudice. (sklc1, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/08 10:45 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Aaron Markel) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18818215.) Filing fee previously paid on 11/08/2023 filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Markel, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 07, 2023
8 8 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 11/07 8:28 AM
MOTION for leave to appear in Pro Hac Vice (Chelsea Till) ( Filing fee $ 317, receipt number ACANDC-18812669.) filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Till, Chelsea)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 06, 2023
7 7 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 11/06 2:58 PM
Certificate of Interested Entities by Alaska Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group for Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Certificate of Interested Entities, Corporate Disclosure Statement, or Rule 7.1 Disclosures Mon 11/06 2:50 PM
Rule 7.1 Disclosures by Alaska Airlines, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Alaska Air Group for Alaska Airlines, Inc.. (Sommerfeld, Amanda)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/06 1:42 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew Gavin Ronan (Ronan, Andrew)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines Mon 11/06 12:22 PM
Initial Case Management Scheduling Order with ADR Deadlines: This case may fall within the Initial Discovery Protocols for Employment Cases Alleging Adverse Action. See [LINK:General Order 71] . Parties and Counsel are directed to review General Order 71 to determine whether it applies to this case, and to comply with that General Order if applicable. Case Management Statement due by 1/29/2024. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/5/2024 01:30 PM in San Francisco, Courtroom C, 15th Floor. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
3 3 utility ~Util - Case Assigned by Intake Mon 11/06 12:18 PM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Sallie Kim. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 11/20/2023. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 11/06 11:55 AM
Civil Cover Sheet by Alaska Airlines, Inc. . (Sommerfeld, Amanda)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 11/06 11:32 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL With Plaintiff Jury Demand from Superior Court for the State of California for San Francisco County. Their case number is CGC-23-609451. (). Filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc..(Sommerfeld, Amanda) Modified on 11/6/2023 (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit 1 - Complaint and Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit 2 - State Court Documents,
Att: 4 Exhibit 3 - Notice to State Court of Removal
utility Electronic Filing Error Mon 11/06 11:37 AM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Civil Cover Sheet missing Section IX Divisional Assignment. No judge assignment will be made until the amended civil covers sheet is e-filed. Submit your amended civil cover sheet using Civil Events > Other Filings > Other Documents > Civil Cover SheetThis filing will not be processed by the clerks office. Re:1 Notice of Removal, filed by Alaska Airlines, Inc. (bar, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]